Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
OS: MT AMAK - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-11-28 - 2021-06-05 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: OM-106 - Passenger vessel / 2021-04-01 - 2021-05-31 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: Aviona - Bulk Carrier / 2020-10-15 - 2021-05-29 (7 months)
Wiper: Jsw raigad - General cargo / 2021-02-05 - 2021-05-29 (4 months)
Oiler: Artic dolphin - General cargo / 2019-12-05 - 2020-12-04 (12 months)
OS: HARI LEELA - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-04-15 - 2021-05-28 (1 year)
El. Engineer: BUKHTAPREOBRAZHENIYA - Fishing vessel / 2020-05-22 - 2021-05-24 (1 year)
El. Eng. Assistant: VASILYEVSKIY OSTROV - Fishing vessel / 2019-05-16 - 2019-08-27 (3 months)
Electrician: Novoyralsk - Fishing vessel / 2017-12-27 - 2018-05-14 (5 months)
2nd Officer: Termeh - Bulk Carrier / 2021-01-19 - 2021-05-08 (4 months)
2nd Officer: Avang - Bulk Carrier / 2020-05-13 - 2020-08-03 (3 months)
2nd Officer: Behta - Container Ship / 2019-09-16 - 2020-01-27 (4 months)
2nd Officer: Arsham - Bulk Carrier / 2019-02-24 - 2019-05-29 (3 months)
2nd Officer: Zardis - Container Ship / 2017-01-20 - 2017-04-13 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: Pola Monaco - Bulk Carrier / 2020-10-30 - 2021-05-05 (6 months)
1st Officer: MV AIZDIHAR - Bulk Carrier / 2019-09-23 - 2021-04-29 (1 year)
Electric Cadet: Vostochnyy - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-12-27 - 2021-04-27 (4 months)
Electric Cadet: Hikmet K - General cargo / 2020-06-22 - 2020-12-26 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Emilia - Bulk Carrier / 2020-12-17 - 2021-04-25 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: Maykan - Dry Cargo / 2020-05-25 - 2020-12-13 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: Maersk Edison - Container Ship / 2020-12-15 - 2021-04-15 (4 months)
OS: M V RASHA 1 - General cargo / 2020-10-02 - 2021-04-13 (6 months)
Cook: Alexia I - General cargo / 2020-11-02 - 2021-04-05 (5 months)
Cook: Rich 8 - Fishing vessel / 2018-10-10 - 2019-12-04 (1 year)
Deck Cadet: Front Coral - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-09-08 - 2021-04-02 (7 months)
Messman: AXC Diamond - Container Ship / 2020-09-18 - 2021-03-23 (6 months)
2nd Engineer: Seabreeze 2 - General cargo / 2020-10-16 - 2021-03-21 (5 months)
2nd Engineer: Valeriy Platonov - General cargo / 2020-03-22 - 2020-07-05 (3 months)
2nd Engineer: Seabreeze 2 - General cargo / 2019-11-21 - 2020-02-18 (3 months)
2nd Engineer: m/v Sormovskiy119 - General cargo / 2018-08-10 - 2019-05-30 (10 months)
3rd Engineer: m/v Sormovskiy119 - General cargo / 2017-06-23 - 2018-03-30 (9 months)
Deck Cadet: Yaku Kallpa - Bulk Carrier / 2021-02-01 - 2021-03-15 (1 month)
Motorman: AP DRZIC - Bulk Carrier / 2020-07-05 - 2021-03-10 (8 months)
Wiper: Maria - Bulk Carrier / 2019-10-06 - 2020-02-16 (4 months)
Motorman: BYWARD - General cargo / 2017-02-17 - 2017-08-13 (6 months)
Motorman: Genuy - Passenger vessel / 2016-03-28 - 2016-05-27 (2 months)
OS: Ilia10 - General cargo / 2020-11-19 - 2021-02-24 (3 months)