Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
OS: M/T JASON - Bunkering Vessel / 2021-06-16 - 2021-12-06 (6 months)
OS: MT MARLIN - Bunkering Vessel / 2020-09-05 - 2021-02-11 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: MT NEATIS - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-11-27 - 2019-12-28 (1 month)
Motorman: Skylift - 3000 - Jack-up Platform / 2021-07-19 - 2021-12-03 (4 months)
Oiler: Adnoc 226 - Sailing Vessel / 2020-03-12 - 2021-11-25 (1 year)
Oiler: Adnoc 229 - Platform Supply vessel / 2019-06-16 - 2019-12-24 (6 months)
Oiler: Adnoc 229 - Platform Supply vessel / 2018-11-25 - 2019-05-08 (5 months)
Oiler: Adnoc 223 - Platform Supply vessel / 2018-06-10 - 2018-10-22 (4 months)
Oiler: Silver soul - Other vessels / 2016-02-22 - 2016-10-14 (8 months)
AB Seaman: mv sol promise - Container Ship / 2021-03-13 - 2021-11-24 (8 months)
OS: mv cherry - Container Ship / 2019-12-31 - 2020-11-22 (11 months)
Deck Cadet: mv lily queen - Container Ship / 2018-08-20 - 2019-02-09 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: mv lily star - Container Ship / 2017-05-11 - 2018-06-11 (1 year)
Deck Cadet: mv lily queen - Container Ship / 2016-09-16 - 2017-05-10 (8 months)
Chief Officer: Sea Patris - RO-RO / 2021-02-01 - 2021-11-19 (10 months)
Chief Officer: Sea Hellinis - RO-RO / 2020-01-20 - 2020-07-25 (6 months)
Chief Officer: Sea Patris - RO-RO / 2019-05-08 - 2019-11-04 (6 months)
Chief Officer: Bahaa - RO-RO / 2017-11-11 - 2018-06-19 (7 months)
Chief Officer: City of Tokyo - RO-RO / 2016-06-22 - 2017-01-13 (7 months)
3rd Engineer: Николай Чепик - Fishing vessel / 2020-09-09 - 2021-11-18 (1 year)
3rd Engineer: Механик Брызгалин - Fishing vessel / 2018-12-07 - 2019-11-15 (11 months)
El. Eng. Assistant: JUDITH SCHULTE - Container Ship / 2021-06-09 - 2021-11-14 (5 months)
El. Eng. Assistant: Margarete Schulte - Container Ship / 2020-08-19 - 2021-02-18 (6 months)
Electric Cadet: MERIDIAN - Container Ship / 2019-06-18 - 2019-12-18 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: LA STELLA - Bulk Carrier / 2021-06-03 - 2021-11-14 (5 months)
Motorman: Akua - General cargo / 2019-12-24 - 2020-06-05 (5 months)
Motorman: Dnipro - Tug boat / 2019-03-01 - 2019-04-30 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: PRABHU VIDYA - Training Ship / 2021-08-01 - 2021-11-12 (3 months)
AB Seaman: Johanna G - Bulk Carrier / 2021-04-05 - 2021-11-05 (7 months)
3rd Officer: Beechgate - Bulk Carrier / 2020-09-14 - 2021-01-29 (4 months)
AB Seaman: KP Albatross - Bulk Carrier / 2019-10-29 - 2020-08-29 (10 months)
Deck Cadet: Neva-1 - Passenger vessel / 2021-09-01 - 2021-11-02 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: Yunyi Baltiets - Training Ship / 2021-06-01 - 2021-07-31 (2 months)
Electrician: TIBA - Livestock / 2021-01-02 - 2021-10-30 (10 months)
2nd Engineer: Jumbo Kinetic - Heavy lift vessel / 2021-07-23 - 2021-10-30 (3 months)
2nd Engineer: Fairpartner - Heavy lift vessel / 2021-02-18 - 2021-04-25 (2 months)
2nd Engineer: Jumbo Vision - Heavy lift vessel / 2020-06-16 - 2020-10-22 (4 months)
2nd Engineer: Jumbo Kinetic - Heavy lift vessel / 2019-12-01 - 2020-03-05 (3 months)
2nd Engineer: Jumbo Vision - Heavy lift vessel / 2019-06-06 - 2019-09-15 (3 months)
ETO: BLUE ONYX - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-03-25 - 2021-10-24 (7 months)
ETO: BELEMA SWEET - VLCC / 2019-12-26 - 2020-10-22 (10 months)
Electrician: MAHANANDA - AHTS / 2019-01-19 - 2019-10-22 (9 months)
Electrician: MALAVIYA THIRTY SIX - DSV (Diving Support) / 2017-07-05 - 2017-10-22 (4 months)
Electrician: MALAVIYA THIRTY SIX - DSV (Diving Support) / 2017-03-26 - 2017-05-29 (2 months)
Fitter / Welder: Orange Spirit - Reefer / 2021-08-07 - 2021-10-21 (2 months)
Fitter / Welder: First Bridge - Bulk Carrier / 2020-11-20 - 2021-05-04 (5 months)
Motorman-welder: Transocean - Bulk Carrier / 2020-01-29 - 2020-06-01 (4 months)
Motorman-welder: Transocean - Bulk Carrier / 2018-11-20 - 2019-06-14 (7 months)
Fitter / Welder: Dyna Globe - Bulk Carrier / 2018-01-19 - 2018-08-24 (7 months)
Chief Engineer: Mount ophir - Bulk Carrier / 2021-04-05 - 2021-10-12 (6 months)
OS: AS Felicia - Container Ship / 2021-06-14 - 2021-10-11 (4 months)
OS: Stellar Pacific - Bulk Carrier / 2020-08-09 - 2021-01-28 (6 months)
Motorman: Great Rus' - Cruise Liner / 2021-04-26 - 2021-10-10 (5 months)
Wiper: VOSTOCHNYY - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-08-01 - 2021-10-07 (2 months)
OS: mv "Nadine V" - Bulk Carrier / 2021-03-12 - 2021-10-06 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: Toto BR - General cargo / 2020-08-29 - 2020-11-30 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: mv "Alexo" - RO-RO / 2018-06-26 - 2018-11-28 (5 months)