Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Deck Cadet: MSC BERANGERE - Container Ship / 2023-06-07 - 2024-01-11 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: BBC DIAMOND - Heavy lift vessel / 2023-06-02 - 2024-01-10 (7 months)
Electric Cadet: AS PAOLA - Container Ship / 2023-11-18 - 2024-01-09 (2 months)
Electric Cadet: AS ROSALIA - Container Ship / 2023-07-20 - 2023-11-16 (4 months)
AB Seaman: Grumant - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-06-30 - 2024-01-04 (4 years)
AB Seaman: West Lynda - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-08-27 - 2019-05-31 (9 months)
AB Seaman: Grumant - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-03-28 - 2018-08-26 (1 year)
2nd Officer: Marmara Mariner - Oil Products Tanker / 2016-07-06 - 2016-08-06 (1 month)
Watchkeeping Officer: West Lynda - Oil Products Tanker / 2015-04-09 - 2016-07-01 (1 year)
Trainee OS: MERMAID 1 - General cargo / 2023-05-07 - 2024-01-03 (8 months)
Chief Officer: Eagle - Bulk Carrier / 2023-05-12 - 2024-01-01 (8 months)
Chief Officer: MLS Gemma - Bulk Carrier / 2022-08-16 - 2022-12-31 (4 months)
Chief Officer: SILOSO - Bulk Carrier / 2021-10-26 - 2022-02-16 (4 months)
Chief Officer: TOLMI - General cargo / 2020-12-08 - 2021-08-12 (8 months)
Chief Officer: TEAM ACE - General cargo / 2019-11-18 - 2020-07-24 (8 months)
OS: Chemtrans Carolina - Chemical tanker / 2023-10-14 - 2023-12-28 (2 months)
OS: Chemtrans Carolina - Chemical tanker / 2022-10-18 - 2023-05-21 (7 months)
Pumpman: alisa - Crude Oil Tanker / 2023-06-19 - 2023-12-27 (6 months)
Pumpman: new global - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-06-10 - 2022-11-20 (5 months)
Pumpman: mykonos - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-09-22 - 2022-03-30 (6 months)
Pumpman: patnos - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-04-23 - 2021-09-07 (4 months)
AB Seaman: patagonia - Chemical tanker / 2020-07-05 - 2021-01-05 (6 months)
OS: M/T GOTICA - Crude Oil Tanker / 2023-06-21 - 2023-12-26 (6 months)
Chief Officer: Thalassini Agatha - Bulk Carrier / 2023-09-11 - 2023-12-26 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Maran Horizon - Bulk Carrier / 2022-11-02 - 2023-03-21 (5 months)
Chief Officer: Maran Wisdom - Bulk Carrier / 2021-11-10 - 2022-04-13 (5 months)
Chief Officer: Genesis - Bulk Carrier / 2021-03-13 - 2021-07-06 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Menaro - Bulk Carrier / 2020-09-03 - 2020-12-16 (3 months)
2nd Engineer: NP DUDINKA - Crude Oil Tanker / 2023-07-25 - 2023-12-20 (5 months)
2nd Engineer: NP DUDINKA - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-12-21 - 2023-04-15 (4 months)
3rd Engineer: NP DUDINKA - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-03-30 - 2022-09-07 (5 months)
3rd Engineer: ODIN - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-09-18 - 2022-02-09 (5 months)
3rd Engineer: ODIN - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-03-22 - 2021-06-24 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: LCT 18 - General cargo / 2022-12-17 - 2023-12-19 (1 year)
2nd Engineer: SPARTEL TRADER - Container Ship / 2023-08-16 - 2023-12-18 (4 months)
2nd Engineer: GUANGZHOU TRAER - Container Ship / 2022-10-08 - 2023-03-03 (5 months)
3rd Engineer: GUANGZHOU TRAER - Container Ship / 2021-07-05 - 2022-05-18 (10 months)
Chief Cook: Greifswald - RO-RO / 2023-12-09 - 2023-12-16 (7 days)
Cook: Saxona - General cargo / 2020-12-10 - 2021-06-16 (6 months)
Cook: Saxona - General cargo / 2020-01-08 - 2020-07-11 (6 months)
3rd Engineer: Akademik Tofig Ismayilov - DSV (Diving Support) / 2023-04-07 - 2023-12-15 (8 months)
Motorman: Muslim Magomayev - Crew boat / 2022-10-13 - 2023-04-04 (6 months)
Motorman: Xelo - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-02-08 - 2022-04-15 (1 year)
Master: San Biagio - Asphalt/Bitumen Tanker / 2023-08-04 - 2023-12-13 (4 months)
Master: San Biagio - Asphalt/Bitumen Tanker / 2022-10-20 - 2023-03-21 (5 months)
Chief Officer: San Bacco - Asphalt/Bitumen Tanker / 2021-08-26 - 2022-02-13 (6 months)
Chief Officer: San Bacco - Asphalt/Bitumen Tanker / 2020-11-29 - 2021-04-29 (5 months)
Chief Officer: San Bacco - Asphalt/Bitumen Tanker / 2020-02-04 - 2020-06-27 (5 months)
3rd Engineer: LCT SYDNEY ALYSSA II - Dry Cargo / 2022-06-11 - 2023-12-11 (1 year)
4th Engineer: Wattior-6 - Dredger / 2021-08-09 - 2022-05-04 (9 months)
2nd Engineer: Chemtrans Arctic - Crude Oil Tanker / 2023-07-23 - 2023-12-10 (5 months)
AB Seaman: SES I - Chemical tanker / 2022-11-08 - 2023-12-09 (1 year)
AB Seaman: MV YUKSEL KARABEKIR - Bulk Carrier / 2021-09-20 - 2022-07-02 (9 months)
Motorman: Sergey Dyagilev - Cruise Liner / 2023-09-21 - 2023-12-01 (2 months)