Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Chief Engineer: Feed Fiskaa - Dry Cargo / 2024-08-06 - 2024-08-06 (0 days)
2nd Officer: BELUGA A - Bulk Carrier / 2023-10-21 - 2024-08-02 (9 months)
2nd Officer: CAPTAIN ADAM - Bulk Carrier / 2023-02-25 - 2023-10-01 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: WADI ALARAB - Bulk Carrier / 2021-03-17 - 2022-01-02 (10 months)
Junior officer: MT PETROSAMUDRA - Oil Products Tanker / 2023-12-12 - 2024-07-31 (8 months)
3rd Officer: FSO JAKA TARUB - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-09-01 - 2023-06-30 (10 months)
Junior officer: MT C. MIGHTY - VLCC / 2022-02-07 - 2022-05-05 (3 months)
3rd Officer: Aram Khachaturian - Chemical tanker / 2024-03-06 - 2024-07-30 (5 months)
3rd Officer: Pavlovsk - Reefer / 2023-02-17 - 2023-07-07 (5 months)
3rd Officer: Baltic Sailor - Dry Cargo / 2024-02-18 - 2024-07-27 (5 months)
Chief Engineer: African Vision - MRSV / 2024-07-04 - 2024-07-27 (1 month)
Motorman: Marco Polo - Passenger vessel / 2015-06-24 - 2015-10-24 (4 months)
Motorman: Marco Polo - Passenger vessel / 2014-08-27 - 2015-04-18 (8 months)
Engine Cadet: Marco Polo - Passenger vessel / 2013-10-26 - 2014-03-02 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: Akkord - Dry Cargo / 2012-06-11 - 2012-08-31 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: Glomar Worker - ROV Support vessel / 2024-04-18 - 2024-07-26 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: Granit - Tug boat / 2023-06-05 - 2023-08-09 (2 months)
OS: Southampton Strar - Reefer / 2023-12-19 - 2024-07-23 (7 months)
OS: Dunedin Star - Reefer / 2023-01-10 - 2023-07-18 (6 months)
Messman: Siem Socrates - RO-RO / 2022-03-31 - 2022-09-20 (6 months)
Chief Cook: Miedwie - Bulk Carrier / 2024-02-13 - 2024-07-20 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: Aragona - Bulk Carrier / 2024-02-27 - 2024-07-19 (5 months)
1st Engineer: Grace Leo - Oil Products Tanker / 2024-05-01 - 2024-07-17 (3 months)
Messman: OCEAN ENDEAVOUR - Passenger vessel / 2023-11-30 - 2024-07-07 (7 months)
Messman: Neptune Odyssey - RO-RO / 2022-11-20 - 2023-06-25 (7 months)
Messman: Francesca - RO-RO / 2021-08-06 - 2021-12-17 (4 months)
Messman: Astoria - Passenger vessel / 2019-02-19 - 2019-11-05 (9 months)
Messman: Columbus - Passenger vessel / 2018-08-04 - 2018-11-02 (3 months)
Oiler: Posh endeavour - Platform Supply vessel / 2024-04-17 - 2024-07-07 (3 months)
Oiler: Am pleasure - Platform Supply vessel / 2024-01-30 - 2024-03-29 (2 months)
Oiler: Posh endeavour - Platform Supply vessel / 2023-08-12 - 2023-12-22 (4 months)
Oiler: Posh panglima - AHTS / 2022-10-01 - 2023-04-24 (7 months)
Oiler: Stanford hunter - Platform Supply vessel / 2022-01-30 - 2022-07-01 (5 months)
OS: Rene - Oil Products Tanker / 2024-06-01 - 2024-07-06 (1 month)
OS: Rene - Oil Products Tanker / 2024-04-05 - 2024-05-03 (1 month)
2nd Officer: MV Milky way - General cargo / 2023-09-21 - 2024-07-05 (9 months)
2nd Officer: MV TRF Kaya - Container Ship / 2022-02-14 - 2022-06-16 (4 months)
2nd Officer: MV TRF Kaya - Container Ship / 2021-03-14 - 2021-10-22 (7 months)
2nd Officer: MV TRF Kaya - Container Ship / 2019-07-31 - 2020-08-30 (1 year)
2nd Officer: MV TRF Kaya - Container Ship / 2018-09-07 - 2019-02-22 (5 months)
Chief Engineer: Transpacific - Bulk Carrier / 2023-12-11 - 2024-07-02 (7 months)
Chief Engineer: Alpha Legacy - Bulk Carrier / 2023-03-09 - 2023-10-05 (7 months)
Chief Engineer: Alpha Pride - Bulk Carrier / 2022-08-18 - 2022-12-18 (4 months)
Chief Engineer: Alpha Optimism - Bulk Carrier / 2021-06-14 - 2022-03-28 (9 months)
Chief Engineer: Сramond Island - Bulk Carrier / 2020-10-23 - 2021-02-24 (4 months)
3rd Engineer: MK5695 "Murman 1" - Platform Supply vessel / 2024-01-24 - 2024-06-24 (5 months)
4th Engineer: MK5695 "Murman 1" - Platform Supply vessel / 2023-03-04 - 2023-09-21 (7 months)
3rd Engineer: Yasnyy - AHTS / 2022-07-22 - 2022-11-25 (4 months)
3rd Engineer: Purga - Tug boat / 2020-08-20 - 2020-10-19 (2 months)
4th Engineer: Purga - Tug boat / 2020-03-14 - 2020-05-15 (2 months)
Receptionist: Sea Cloud II - Yacht / 2024-03-15 - 2024-06-17 (3 months)
Receptionist: Isle of Inisheer - Passenger vessel / 2023-11-25 - 2024-01-23 (2 months)
Purser: Halunder Jet - High Speed Craft / 2019-08-21 - 2023-05-02 (3 years)
Stewardess: SyltExpress - RO-RO / 2014-08-21 - 2019-07-21 (4 years)
Photographer: Aida Mar - Passenger vessel / 2011-04-21 - 2011-08-21 (4 months)
OS: MIRNIY - Pilot boat / 2020-02-07 - 2024-06-05 (4 years)
Deck Cadet: YUNYI BALTIETS (sailing training special purpose ship) - Sailing Vessel / 2016-09-01 - 2016-11-20 (3 months)
Electric Cadet: Pinar Gas - Chemical tanker / 2024-03-01 - 2024-06-03 (3 months)
Electric Cadet: Pinar Gas - LPG / LNG / 2023-06-19 - 2024-02-11 (8 months)