Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Electrician: SFP-511 - Cable laying vessel / 2023-04-10 - 2023-08-31 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: т/x "Адмірал Нахімов" - Tug boat / 2023-05-05 - 2023-08-30 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: Magnet Team - Bulk Carrier / 2023-06-06 - 2023-08-29 (3 months)
1st Officer: MSC MALENA - Container Ship / 2023-04-24 - 2023-08-28 (4 months)
1st Officer: MSC MALENA - Container Ship / 2022-07-14 - 2022-12-28 (5 months)
1st Officer: MSC MALENA - Container Ship / 2021-08-19 - 2022-01-25 (5 months)
1st Officer: Spero - Container Ship / 2021-03-09 - 2021-05-31 (3 months)
1st Officer: Polo - Container Ship / 2020-02-20 - 2020-10-08 (8 months)
Engine Cadet: Granit - Training Ship / 2023-07-31 - 2023-08-27 (1 month)
3rd Officer: CLIPPER TRIUMPH - Bulk Carrier / 2023-06-15 - 2023-08-27 (2 months)
3rd Officer: CETUS - Bulk Carrier / 2022-05-10 - 2022-08-02 (3 months)
3rd Officer: CLIPPER ALEXANDRIA - Bulk Carrier / 2020-11-26 - 2021-05-07 (5 months)
Chief Cook: M/V Maria G - Bulk Carrier / 2023-01-25 - 2023-08-27 (7 months)
Chief Cook: M/V Helena G - Bulk Carrier / 2022-02-19 - 2022-10-28 (8 months)
Chief Cook: Mv Maria G - Bulk Carrier / 2021-04-02 - 2021-10-23 (7 months)
Chief Cook: Mv Isabelle G - Bulk Carrier / 2020-02-25 - 2020-12-17 (10 months)
Messman: Mv Helena G - Bulk Carrier / 2019-01-09 - 2019-10-06 (9 months)
4th Engineer: Pyxis Malou - Chemical tanker / 2022-10-03 - 2023-08-23 (11 months)
Fitter / Welder: MSC Spring lll - Container Ship / 2023-01-26 - 2023-08-22 (7 months)
Fitter / Welder: MSC Aby - Container Ship / 2021-11-28 - 2022-09-19 (10 months)
Fitter / Welder: MSC Arushi R - Container Ship / 2020-09-04 - 2021-07-10 (10 months)
Fitter / Welder: MSC Vaishnavi R - Container Ship / 2019-08-23 - 2020-05-09 (9 months)
Fitter / Welder: MSC Clea - Container Ship / 2018-09-09 - 2019-04-04 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: Albatros - Tug boat / 2023-02-22 - 2023-08-22 (6 months)
Ref. Machinist: Marshal Krylov - Fishing vessel / 2023-03-22 - 2023-08-20 (5 months)
AB Seaman: F/V"Kapitan Sukhondyayevskiy" - Fishing vessel / 2021-06-28 - 2021-11-29 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: F/V"Kapitan Sukhondyayevskiy" - Fishing vessel / 2019-09-23 - 2020-03-04 (5 months)
OS: STS Nadezhda - Training Ship / 2023-06-19 - 2023-08-19 (2 months)
AB Seaman: EemsWrestler - Tug boat / 2023-05-15 - 2023-08-19 (3 months)
AB Seaman: EEMSWRESTLER - Tug boat / 2022-12-15 - 2023-03-20 (3 months)
AB Seaman: Emms Wrestler - Tug boat / 2022-08-04 - 2022-11-01 (3 months)
AB Seaman: Pindos - Bulk Carrier / 2021-07-01 - 2022-04-09 (9 months)
AB Seaman: ATHOS - Bulk Carrier / 2020-06-02 - 2021-04-02 (10 months)
Engine Cadet: Team Beleuzi - Platform Supply vessel / 2023-03-31 - 2023-08-17 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: M/V Agios Dimitrios - Container Ship / 2023-03-26 - 2023-08-14 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: M/T Hyde Park - Bunkering Vessel / 2022-07-26 - 2022-08-26 (1 month)
OS: Haji Davud - Chemical tanker / 2023-05-04 - 2023-08-13 (3 months)
OS: I.A.Krylov - Passenger vessel / 2022-05-26 - 2022-07-28 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: Seliger - Crude Oil Tanker / 2023-05-28 - 2023-08-12 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: Seliger - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-09-09 - 2023-01-05 (4 months)
4th Engineer: SOUSELAS - Bulk Carrier / 2023-02-27 - 2023-08-10 (5 months)
4th Engineer: DON JUAN - Bulk Carrier / 2022-07-19 - 2022-12-24 (5 months)
4th Engineer: SCALA - Dry Cargo / 2021-05-17 - 2021-10-01 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: FRUCTIDOR - Bulk Carrier / 2007-07-05 - 2008-01-30 (7 months)
Fitter / Welder: Coral Fungia - LPG / LNG / 2023-07-27 - 2023-08-09 (13 days)
Fitter / Welder: MSC Sasha - Container Ship / 2022-09-22 - 2023-03-14 (6 months)
Fitter / Welder: MSC fiammetta - Container Ship / 2021-11-20 - 2022-07-27 (8 months)
Fitter / Welder: Mineral Yarden - Bulk Carrier / 2021-03-05 - 2021-09-09 (6 months)
OS / Welder: Vera P - Bulk Carrier / 2020-08-10 - 2020-11-12 (3 months)
Master: Pomor - Tug boat / 2024-02-02 - 2024-03-19 (2 months)
Master: Pomor - Tug boat / 2023-06-15 - 2023-08-09 (2 months)
Master: Pomor - Tug boat / 2023-01-28 - 2023-04-10 (2 months)
Master: Pomor - Tug boat / 2022-08-08 - 2022-11-11 (3 months)
Master: Pomor - Tug boat / 2021-07-29 - 2021-11-11 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Nikolai Orlov - Tug boat / 2020-10-01 - 2021-07-23 (10 months)