Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
OS: Akadimik Primakov - Research vessel / 2023-12-07 - 2024-03-27 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: Boris Syromyatnikov - Fishing vessel / 2024-01-24 - 2024-03-25 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: Sedov - Training Ship / 2023-08-28 - 2023-10-28 (2 months)
Engineer Assistant: Viva Eclipse - Bulk Carrier / 2023-09-26 - 2024-03-24 (6 months)
Electric Cadet: Arctcic Flounder - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-01-13 - 2022-08-06 (7 months)
1st Engineer: Statia - Crude Oil Tanker / 2023-12-13 - 2024-03-22 (3 months)
1st Engineer: Drenec - VLCC / 2023-03-22 - 2023-09-05 (5 months)
1st Engineer: Alboran - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-12-21 - 2022-05-10 (5 months)
1st Engineer: Desirade - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-05-10 - 2021-10-12 (5 months)
1st Engineer: Nordic Breeze - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-06-26 - 2020-11-14 (5 months)
Master: Pomor - Tug boat / 2024-02-02 - 2024-03-19 (2 months)
Master: Pomor - Tug boat / 2023-06-15 - 2023-08-09 (2 months)
Master: Pomor - Tug boat / 2023-01-28 - 2023-04-10 (2 months)
Master: Pomor - Tug boat / 2022-08-08 - 2022-11-11 (3 months)
Master: Pomor - Tug boat / 2021-07-29 - 2021-11-11 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Nikolai Orlov - Tug boat / 2020-10-01 - 2021-07-23 (10 months)
Deck Cadet: MSC AMELIA - Container Ship / 2023-09-13 - 2024-03-18 (6 months)
2nd Officer: RUSICH-3 - General cargo / 2023-10-29 - 2024-03-16 (5 months)
3rd Officer: RUSICH-3 - General cargo / 2023-02-27 - 2023-07-04 (4 months)
3rd Officer: RUSICH-5 - General cargo / 2022-08-15 - 2022-12-24 (4 months)
OS: RUSICH-3 - General cargo / 2021-12-06 - 2022-05-12 (5 months)
OS: RUSICH-1 - General cargo / 2020-08-18 - 2021-01-27 (5 months)
3rd Officer: NAVI BALTIC - Container Ship / 2023-12-07 - 2024-03-16 (3 months)
3rd Officer: NAVI BALTIC - Container Ship / 2022-12-01 - 2023-03-03 (3 months)
3rd Officer: NAVI BALTIC - Container Ship / 2022-06-09 - 2022-08-30 (3 months)
2nd Officer: Amethyst - Bulk Carrier / 2023-10-25 - 2024-03-15 (5 months)
2nd Officer: CONTSHIP ART - Container Ship / 2022-11-11 - 2023-05-29 (7 months)
2nd Officer: Toronto Trader - Container Ship / 2022-02-15 - 2022-08-05 (6 months)
2nd Officer: Toronto Trader - Container Ship / 2021-05-14 - 2021-10-20 (5 months)
Oiler: PROPUS - General cargo / 2023-11-12 - 2024-03-14 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: Nordic Stavanger - Bulk Carrier / 2021-10-17 - 2022-06-05 (8 months)
Engine Cadet: Anarita - Bulk Carrier / 2020-08-12 - 2021-02-17 (6 months)
Trainee Engineer: Gelmond 2 - General cargo / 2023-12-28 - 2024-03-12 (2 months)
Trainee Wiper: Azov Concord - General cargo / 2021-07-04 - 2021-12-06 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: Mayfield - Container Ship / 2023-09-21 - 2024-03-11 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Virgo - Container Ship / 2021-09-29 - 2022-03-26 (6 months)
AB / Crane Operator: OSIRIS - Bulk Carrier / 2023-03-21 - 2024-03-11 (12 months)
OS: Zografia - Bulk Carrier / 2021-05-28 - 2021-11-26 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Rms laar - General cargo / 2023-12-21 - 2024-03-10 (3 months)
Electrician: Aquavita lime - Bulk Carrier / 2023-12-05 - 2024-03-10 (3 months)
Electric Cadet: Changsha - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2023-03-12 - 2023-08-28 (6 months)
Electric Cadet: Noumea Chief - Container Ship / 2021-08-14 - 2022-02-14 (6 months)
Electric Cadet: Gaslog Seattle - LPG / LNG / 2023-08-02 - 2024-03-05 (7 months)
Electric Cadet: COSCO HELLAS - Container Ship / 2022-09-25 - 2023-04-02 (6 months)
Chief Cook: AENEAS - Dry Cargo / 2023-08-25 - 2024-03-02 (6 months)
Chief Cook: Alkyon - Bulk Carrier / 2022-09-10 - 2023-06-26 (10 months)
Chief Cook: Contship Gin - Container Ship / 2021-06-06 - 2021-12-07 (6 months)
Chief Cook: Olga - Bulk Carrier / 2020-08-01 - 2021-03-25 (8 months)
Chief Cook: Falcona - Bulk Carrier / 2019-11-16 - 2020-05-14 (6 months)
AB Seaman: SANMAR SONNET - Oil Products Tanker / 2023-08-14 - 2024-02-27 (6 months)
Boatswain: M/T DIA - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-06-21 - 2022-08-17 (2 months)
AB Seaman: M.TSUZETTE - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-01-26 - 2021-07-17 (6 months)
AB Seaman: M.T.ARK PROGRESS - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-04-16 - 2020-01-26 (9 months)
AB Seaman: MV SAMPARAN - General cargo / 2018-01-24 - 2018-09-04 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: Vostok Reefer - Reefer / 2023-03-10 - 2024-02-26 (12 months)
Deck Cadet: Pallada - Training Ship / 2022-05-04 - 2022-06-09 (1 month)
Chief Officer: Aurelia - Bulk Carrier / 2023-09-02 - 2024-02-24 (6 months)
Chief Officer: Vil Atlantic - Bulk Carrier / 2022-12-01 - 2023-06-18 (7 months)
Chief Officer: AP Slano - Bulk Carrier / 2022-01-30 - 2022-08-09 (6 months)
Chief Officer: AP Sveti Vlaho - Bulk Carrier / 2021-05-22 - 2021-10-31 (5 months)
Chief Officer: AP Astarea - Bulk Carrier / 2020-07-24 - 2021-03-11 (7 months)