Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Deck Cadet: Sail Training Ship "Pallada" - Sailing Vessel / 2019-03-25 - 2019-07-13 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: Sail Training Ship "Kruzenshtern" - Sailing Vessel / 2018-02-20 - 2018-04-24 (2 months)
2nd Officer: Juliana - General cargo / 2018-12-30 - 2019-07-08 (6 months)
3rd Officer: HAZAR - General cargo / 2018-04-07 - 2018-08-16 (4 months)
3rd Officer: EMMAKRIS II - Bulk Carrier / 2016-11-15 - 2017-05-22 (6 months)
3rd Officer: Zealand Maxima - General cargo / 2015-09-30 - 2016-04-12 (6 months)
2nd Officer: Marcel - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2014-07-28 - 2014-10-16 (3 months)
Turner: FOX BAY - Reefer / 2019-02-14 - 2019-07-05 (5 months)
Motorman: FOX BAY - Reefer / 2018-02-14 - 2018-08-09 (6 months)
Turner: NOVIY SVET - Reefer / 2016-05-03 - 2016-11-04 (6 months)
Turner: NOVIY SVET - Reefer / 2015-05-20 - 2015-11-10 (6 months)
Motorman: NOVIY SVET - Other vessels / 2014-02-21 - 2014-09-21 (7 months)
Engine Cadet: Myroslav - AHTS / 2019-02-20 - 2019-07-04 (4 months)
AB Seaman: Uzava - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-01-25 - 2019-06-28 (5 months)
AB Seaman: Ance - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-01-06 - 2018-08-17 (7 months)
AB Seaman: Jurkalne - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-03-31 - 2017-09-12 (5 months)
AB Seaman: Jurkalne - Oil Products Tanker / 2016-08-14 - 2017-01-15 (5 months)
AB Seaman: Kraslava - Oil Products Tanker / 2015-11-08 - 2016-04-13 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: Culpeo - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-09-27 - 2019-06-02 (8 months)
Wiper: Хаджибей - Passenger vessel / 2019-03-27 - 2019-05-28 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: MV Kambar - Tug boat / 2018-10-24 - 2019-05-18 (7 months)
Motorman: LEDA - Bulk Carrier / 2018-11-05 - 2019-05-12 (6 months)
Motorman: Leda - General cargo / 2018-04-19 - 2018-09-30 (5 months)
AB Seaman: Victor Martynenko - General cargo / 2018-11-04 - 2019-05-01 (6 months)
Boatswain: Wilson brugge - General cargo / 2019-01-01 - 2019-04-20 (4 months)
Boatswain: Wilson brugge - General cargo / 2018-08-06 - 2018-12-16 (4 months)
Boatswain: Wilson brugge - General cargo / 2016-11-28 - 2017-03-29 (4 months)
Boatswain: Wilson brugge - General cargo / 2016-04-01 - 2016-07-26 (4 months)
Boatswain: Wilson brugge - General cargo / 2015-07-10 - 2015-11-26 (5 months)
2nd Officer: Kerir 4 - Tug boat / 2015-04-12 - 2019-04-12 (4 years)
3rd Officer: Kerir 3 - Tug boat / 2005-04-19 - 2008-05-21 (3 years)
Messman: Sri Lanka - Tug boat / 2019-04-02 - 2019-04-12 (10 days)
OS / Welder: Akua - General cargo / 2018-11-08 - 2019-04-10 (5 months)
Fitter / Welder: Patriot - Tug boat / 2019-01-28 - 2019-03-29 (2 months)
OS: Spottail - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-09-20 - 2019-03-11 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: MB - 23 - Tug boat / 2018-08-03 - 2018-10-03 (2 months)
OS: Japetus - Chemical tanker / 2018-04-08 - 2018-07-23 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: Petr Gradov - Other vessels / 2016-06-01 - 2016-08-01 (2 months)
OS: PUFFIN BULKER - Bulk Carrier / 2018-09-11 - 2019-03-10 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: AIDAIV - Training Ship / 2018-08-29 - 2019-02-28 (6 months)
OS / Welder: Evgenia Z - Dry Cargo / 2018-10-29 - 2019-02-28 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: Inder - Tug boat / 2017-12-26 - 2018-02-24 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: UMM AL ANBER - Cable laying vessel / 2019-02-13 - 2019-02-21 (8 days)