Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Deck Cadet: Wislon North - General cargo / 2019-10-20 - 2020-02-03 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: Wilson Gdynia - General cargo / 2019-06-11 - 2019-09-11 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: Wilson Malm - General cargo / 2018-10-30 - 2019-01-21 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: Wilson Leer - General cargo / 2018-07-23 - 2018-10-29 (3 months)
Boatswain: bbc balboa - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2018-08-19 - 2020-01-26 (1 year)
Boatswain: bbc london - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2016-08-10 - 2018-02-23 (1 year)
Boatswain: bbc ocean - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2013-04-10 - 2016-03-18 (2 years)
AB / Crane Operator: Skaftafell - General cargo / 2011-09-07 - 2012-02-18 (5 months)
Boatswain: BBC Gibraltar - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2010-12-02 - 2011-05-07 (5 months)
3rd Officer: TANTO NUSANTARA - Container Ship / 2019-07-01 - 2020-01-15 (6 months)
3rd Officer: TANTO SETIA - Container Ship / 2018-12-17 - 2019-06-23 (6 months)
3rd Officer: TANTO CAHAYA - Container Ship / 2018-02-14 - 2018-12-16 (10 months)
Stewardess: Tianjin Maritime College - Training Ship / 2017-11-23 - 2020-01-10 (2 years)
Engine Cadet: ATLAS - Other vessels / 2020-01-01 - 2020-01-08 (7 days)
OS: Mira A - Survey vessel / 2019-12-12 - 2020-01-07 (1 month)
OS: Mira A - Survey vessel / 2019-10-15 - 2019-11-15 (1 month)
OS: Warmia - Bulk Carrier / 2019-01-23 - 2019-07-05 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: Caro - Bulk Carrier / 2017-11-27 - 2018-05-28 (6 months)
Chief Officer: RAWABI INTEGRITY - FSO / 2019-09-22 - 2019-12-29 (3 months)
Chief Officer: RAWABI INTEGRITY - FSO / 2019-04-01 - 2019-06-19 (3 months)
Chief Officer: RAWABI INTEGRITY - FSO / 2018-11-10 - 2019-01-24 (2 months)
Chief Officer: RAWABI INTEGRITY - FSO / 2018-05-08 - 2018-08-04 (3 months)
Chief Officer: RAWABI INTEGRITY - FSO / 2017-12-16 - 2018-03-06 (3 months)
Wiper: MV WIN SHUEN SHING - Reefer / 2019-09-03 - 2019-12-27 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: MV EMPRESS AMY - General cargo / 2016-07-01 - 2017-07-08 (1 year)
OS: Mv/AKUA - General cargo / 2019-06-18 - 2019-12-24 (6 months)
Deck Fitter: Explorer of the seas - Cruise Liner / 2019-10-18 - 2019-12-13 (2 months)
Deck Fitter: Explorer of the seas - Cruise Liner / 2019-04-13 - 2019-07-04 (3 months)
Deck Fitter: Explorer of the seas - Cruise Liner / 2018-07-20 - 2019-01-15 (6 months)
Chief Engineer: BOSPORUS - Coaster / 2019-08-08 - 2019-12-09 (4 months)
Chief Engineer: Edzard Cirksena - Coaster / 2018-12-14 - 2019-04-14 (4 months)
Chief Engineer: Edzard Cirksena - Coaster / 2018-04-08 - 2018-08-28 (5 months)
Chief Engineer: " LAE EXPRESS 2 " - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2019-05-23 - 2019-12-03 (6 months)
Chief Engineer: ALDI WAVE - Container Ship / 2018-03-28 - 2018-11-28 (8 months)
Chief Engineer: Carmelia - Chemical tanker / 2017-07-04 - 2017-10-05 (3 months)
Chief Engineer: True Colors - Chemical tanker / 2017-02-05 - 2017-05-13 (3 months)
Chief Engineer: Island Transporter - Crude Oil Tanker / 2016-05-07 - 2016-11-19 (6 months)
Trainee OS: MV. MSC MEDITERRANEAN - Container Ship / 2019-11-18 - 2019-12-02 (14 days)
Fitter / Welder: Fulham - Chemical tanker / 2019-07-15 - 2019-11-30 (4 months)
Fitter / Welder: Sunny Day - Chemical tanker / 2018-11-13 - 2019-03-07 (4 months)
Fitter / Welder: Sunny Day - Chemical tanker / 2018-01-31 - 2018-06-22 (5 months)
ETO: Zamil 55 - AHTS / 2019-08-18 - 2019-11-29 (3 months)
ETO: Zamil 55 - AHTS / 2019-02-14 - 2019-05-14 (3 months)
ETO: Zamil 55 - AHTS / 2018-06-10 - 2018-11-30 (6 months)
ETO: AOS Neptune - Platform Supply vessel / 2017-03-14 - 2017-09-15 (6 months)
ETO: AOS Neptune - Platform Supply vessel / 2016-07-30 - 2016-10-30 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: Mir - Sailing Vessel / 2019-09-09 - 2019-11-25 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: Kruzenshtern - Sailing Vessel / 2015-04-28 - 2015-06-23 (2 months)
Electrician: Nord - Bulk Carrier / 2019-04-06 - 2019-11-25 (8 months)
Electrician: JUMMY T - Bulk Carrier / 2018-01-02 - 2018-07-14 (6 months)
Electrician: FLAG TOM - Bulk Carrier / 2017-04-10 - 2017-10-06 (6 months)
Electrician: LA TONDA - Bulk Carrier / 2016-04-30 - 2016-11-02 (6 months)
Electrician: CITI AMSTERDAM - Bulk Carrier / 2015-10-10 - 2016-04-04 (6 months)
3rd Engineer: M.V Alitia - Bulk Carrier / 2018-12-20 - 2019-11-25 (11 months)
3rd Engineer: M.V ATLANTICA - Dry Cargo / 2017-07-12 - 2018-06-02 (11 months)
3rd Engineer: ATLANTICA - Bulk Carrier / 2016-08-29 - 2016-12-21 (4 months)
4th Engineer: ATLANTICA - Bulk Carrier / 2016-03-15 - 2016-08-28 (5 months)
4th Engineer: ATLANTIKA - Bulk Carrier / 2014-05-28 - 2015-06-17 (1 year)
AB Seaman: Vento Grecale - Bulk Carrier / 2019-08-30 - 2019-10-31 (2 months)
OS: Vento Grecale - Bulk Carrier / 2019-04-07 - 2019-08-29 (5 months)
OS: TRIADES - Bulk Carrier / 2017-12-10 - 2018-06-20 (6 months)
AB Seaman: LENA - Bulk Carrier / 2016-08-13 - 2017-03-13 (7 months)
AB Seaman: ICE DRAGON - Bulk Carrier / 2015-09-11 - 2016-02-16 (5 months)
4th Engineer: Lewante - General cargo / 2019-08-14 - 2019-10-26 (2 months)
Motorman: Orient Tranzit - Bulk Carrier / 2010-10-15 - 2011-07-21 (9 months)
Motorman: Liberty - Cruise Liner / 2009-03-12 - 2009-10-13 (7 months)
Motorman: Legend Unity - Bulk Carrier / 2008-12-18 - 2009-05-20 (5 months)