Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Deck Cadet: GS-192 - Survey vessel / 2019-09-02 - 2020-01-13 (4 months)
AB Seaman: Belomorskiy-20 - Dry Cargo / 2019-06-10 - 2019-09-01 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: MIR - Training Ship / 2018-09-12 - 2018-11-15 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: KURPIE - Bulk Carrier / 2019-07-31 - 2020-01-06 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: M/F MAZOVIA - Ferry / 2018-08-23 - 2018-09-20 (1 month)
Deck Cadet: M/S NAWIGATOR XXI - Research vessel / 2018-07-30 - 2018-08-19 (1 month)
Deck Cadet: FAIRPLAY V - Tug boat / 2017-08-14 - 2017-08-20 (6 days)
Deck Cadet: M/S NAWIGATOR XXI - Research vessel / 2017-06-05 - 2017-06-18 (13 days)
Deck Cadet: Dilam - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-07-19 - 2019-12-31 (5 months)
Stewardess: Horizon - Cruise Liner / 2019-05-12 - 2019-12-27 (7 months)
Stewardess: Horizon - Cruise Liner / 2018-07-22 - 2019-03-09 (7 months)
El. Engineer: APJ Mahadeva - Bulk Carrier / 2019-09-07 - 2019-12-27 (4 months)
El. Engineer: Oriental Glory - Bulk Carrier / 2018-06-21 - 2019-01-14 (7 months)
Electric Cadet: DHT Hawk - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-01-13 - 2018-01-30 (1 month)
Electric Cadet: DHT Redwood - Crude Oil Tanker / 2017-05-29 - 2017-12-02 (6 months)
Chief Engineer: Lecompte Tide - AHTS / 2019-09-21 - 2019-12-26 (3 months)
Chief Engineer: Lecompte Tide - AHTS / 2019-02-20 - 2019-06-16 (4 months)
Chief Engineer: Kirkconnell Tide - AHTS / 2018-07-21 - 2018-11-08 (4 months)
Chief Engineer: Tablate tide - AHTS / 2018-02-03 - 2018-05-23 (4 months)
Chief Engineer: Boutros Tide - AHTS / 2017-06-07 - 2017-10-28 (5 months)
OS: Suderoog - Container Ship / 2019-07-15 - 2019-12-24 (5 months)
OS: BBC Africa - Heavy lift vessel / 2018-09-17 - 2019-03-19 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: BBC Parana - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2017-10-05 - 2018-04-13 (6 months)
3rd Officer: Mykola Slavov - General cargo / 2015-11-14 - 2016-04-15 (5 months)
2nd Officer: Ivan Sergiyenko - Dry Cargo / 2015-02-12 - 2015-06-12 (4 months)
Motorman: Titanium Explora - Drilling platform / 2019-11-13 - 2019-12-18 (1 month)
Motorman: LILANI - Tug boat / 2011-05-01 - 2014-12-31 (3 years)
Mechanic: SAS Makhanda - NAVY / 1996-08-27 - 1997-10-31 (1 year)
AB Seaman: ROWAYTON EAGLE - Bulk Carrier / 2019-04-15 - 2019-12-16 (8 months)
AB Seaman: BITTERN - Bulk Carrier / 2018-03-14 - 2018-11-06 (8 months)
AB Seaman: TINA 4 - Bulk Carrier / 2016-06-12 - 2017-03-21 (9 months)
AB Seaman: NAVIOS ALEGRIA - Bulk Carrier / 2015-04-07 - 2015-11-04 (7 months)
AB Seaman: NAVIOS HORIZON - Bulk Carrier / 2014-02-08 - 2014-10-20 (8 months)
OS: Carnival Sunrise - Passenger vessel / 2019-05-22 - 2019-11-21 (6 months)
OS: Carnival Victory - Passenger vessel / 2018-09-10 - 2019-03-11 (6 months)
3rd Engineer: Fearless - Bulk Carrier / 2019-04-30 - 2019-11-20 (7 months)
3rd Engineer: Papua - Bulk Carrier / 2018-03-13 - 2018-10-30 (8 months)
3rd Engineer: Papua - Bulk Carrier / 2017-07-02 - 2018-02-05 (7 months)
3rd Engineer: Helmuth Rambow - General cargo / 2016-08-11 - 2017-04-25 (8 months)
4th Engineer: Baltic Heather - Reefer / 2014-07-03 - 2014-09-30 (3 months)
Chief Engineer: Bbc Ursa - Heavy lift vessel / 2019-07-18 - 2019-11-18 (4 months)
2nd Engineer: Malte Rambow - Container Ship / 2018-11-20 - 2019-03-18 (4 months)
2nd Engineer: Industrial diamond - Heavy lift vessel / 2018-02-27 - 2018-06-09 (3 months)
2nd Engineer: Industrial diamond - Heavy lift vessel / 2017-04-27 - 2017-09-17 (5 months)
2nd Engineer: Bbc Ursa - Heavy lift vessel / 2016-03-17 - 2016-07-26 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: Lira - Fishing vessel / 2019-06-15 - 2019-11-07 (5 months)
Chief Engineer: Energy Annabelle - Bulk Carrier / 2019-04-10 - 2019-11-03 (7 months)
Chief Engineer: "GEOGRAPH" - Survey vessel / 2014-12-08 - 2017-11-21 (2 years)
Chief Engineer: “Geograph” - Survey vessel / 2009-12-08 - 2014-12-07 (4 years)
2nd Officer: Oneriva 45 - Dry Cargo / 2019-09-10 - 2019-11-01 (2 months)
3rd Officer: Azov Coast - Dry Cargo / 2019-01-20 - 2019-05-17 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Azov Coast - Dry Cargo / 2018-04-27 - 2018-09-22 (5 months)
OS: BW Aries - LPG / LNG / 2019-03-10 - 2019-10-26 (8 months)
OS: BW carina - LPG / LNG / 2018-04-15 - 2019-01-10 (9 months)
OS: BW havis - LPG / LNG / 2018-01-03 - 2018-02-18 (1 month)
OS: LNG Benue - LPG / LNG / 2017-08-26 - 2017-12-10 (3 months)
OS: Sigloo hav - LPG / LNG / 2017-01-25 - 2017-03-22 (2 months)
2nd Engineer: Astoria - Bulk Carrier / 2019-02-21 - 2019-10-25 (8 months)
3rd Engineer: INA - RO-RO / 2014-03-28 - 2014-09-16 (6 months)
3rd Engineer: AVIVA - RO-RO / 2013-06-24 - 2014-02-04 (7 months)
3rd Engineer: AVIVA - RO-RO / 2012-02-23 - 2012-12-17 (10 months)
3rd Engineer: FAINA - RO-RO / 2011-08-24 - 2011-10-31 (2 months)
4th Engineer: MV FAREEDA - Container Ship / 2019-04-16 - 2019-10-22 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: M V HAZEL - Container Ship / 2017-01-16 - 2017-10-04 (9 months)
OS: Aqua Diamond - Bulk Carrier / 2019-02-15 - 2019-10-22 (8 months)
OS: Transocean - Bulk Carrier / 2018-02-17 - 2018-06-21 (4 months)
OS: MT-9 - Bunkering Vessel / 2019-07-02 - 2019-10-18 (4 months)