Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
2nd Engineer: LeilaH - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2019-05-17 - 2020-11-18 (1 year)
2nd Engineer: Isleman - Reefer / 2018-10-30 - 2019-03-15 (4 months)
3rd Engineer: Isleman - Reefer / 2017-07-24 - 2018-02-08 (6 months)
Cook: EVALUNA - General cargo / 2020-03-03 - 2020-11-10 (8 months)
Cook: EVALUNA - General cargo / 2019-01-28 - 2019-08-16 (7 months)
Cook: ALTRANY - General cargo / 2018-02-20 - 2018-10-03 (7 months)
Cook: Sophia-1 - General cargo / 2016-11-12 - 2017-05-28 (7 months)
Cook: Bellatrix - General cargo / 2015-10-04 - 2016-04-25 (7 months)
OS: Volgoneft - 32 - Chemical tanker / 2020-07-05 - 2020-11-04 (4 months)
OS: Valaams - Chemical tanker / 2019-07-30 - 2019-11-25 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: Борис Сыромятников - Fishing vessel / 2020-06-14 - 2020-11-03 (5 months)
Motorman: LENA - Bunkering Vessel / 2019-07-01 - 2019-09-30 (3 months)
Engine Cadet: Kruzenshtern - Passenger vessel / 2018-07-02 - 2018-09-07 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: Fresher - Other vessels / 2020-11-01 - 2020-11-01 (0 days)
Engine Cadet: SEA DOLPHIN - General cargo / 2019-09-20 - 2020-10-31 (1 year)
OS: Anuket Sapphire - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-06-23 - 2020-10-30 (4 months)
OS: Anuket Jade - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-09-27 - 2020-03-03 (5 months)
OS: Lumoso Surya - Bulk Carrier / 2018-10-16 - 2019-02-16 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: MV Berkat Tenang - AHTS / 2020-08-13 - 2020-10-28 (2 months)
Assistant Marine Terminal Superintendent: Petra Star - Bulk Carrier / 2018-01-16 - 2020-10-27 (2 years)
Chief Engineer: Sierra - Bulk Carrier / 2016-02-10 - 2016-08-17 (6 months)
Chief Engineer: Айрон дестени - Bulk Carrier / 2015-09-11 - 2015-11-28 (3 months)
Chief Engineer: Cape Ladoga - Bulk Carrier / 2014-06-26 - 2014-09-04 (2 months)
Chief Engineer: m/v"Hamburg" - Bulk Carrier / 2013-06-25 - 2013-11-08 (4 months)
2nd Engineer: Volans - Container Ship / 2020-06-25 - 2020-10-27 (4 months)
2nd Engineer: Hope Island - Container Ship / 2019-08-30 - 2019-12-11 (3 months)
2nd Engineer: GSL Valerie - Container Ship / 2018-11-18 - 2019-03-21 (4 months)
2nd Engineer: Valerie Schulte - Container Ship / 2018-03-09 - 2018-07-18 (4 months)
2nd Engineer: Bella Schulte - Container Ship / 2017-10-15 - 2017-11-21 (1 month)
ETO: Marella Dream - Passenger vessel / 2017-04-04 - 2020-10-26 (3 years)
El. Engineer: Swift1 - High Speed Craft / 2016-03-28 - 2016-10-01 (6 months)
ETO: Vivaldi - Accommodation barge / 2014-12-01 - 2015-02-05 (2 months)
El. Engineer: Commodore Goodwill - Ferry / 2014-02-07 - 2014-04-06 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: BARANA II - Tug boat / 2020-09-01 - 2020-10-24 (2 months)
Chief Engineer: Andropov - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-07-07 - 2020-10-22 (3 months)
Chief Engineer: El Charro - Chemical tanker / 2016-10-04 - 2017-03-26 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: M/V SULU VENTURE - Tug boat / 2019-09-18 - 2020-10-22 (1 year)
Master: shaw tide - Platform Supply vessel / 2020-07-16 - 2020-10-21 (3 months)
Pumpman: NS SPIRIT - Chemical tanker / 2020-02-20 - 2020-10-20 (8 months)
Oiler: Elbrus - Chemical tanker / 2018-07-04 - 2019-02-16 (7 months)
Oiler: Kazan - Crude Oil Tanker / 2017-01-30 - 2017-08-18 (7 months)
Oiler: NS COLUMBUS - Crude Oil Tanker / 2014-06-11 - 2015-01-31 (8 months)
1st Engineer: Pluto - Container Ship / 2020-08-05 - 2020-10-17 (2 months)
1st Engineer: GLOMAR COMMANDER - ROV Support vessel / 2019-03-21 - 2019-05-01 (1 month)
1st Engineer: ARTAVAND - Bulk Carrier / 2018-05-12 - 2018-11-21 (6 months)
1st Engineer: NOVO MESTO - Bulk Carrier / 2017-07-28 - 2017-09-16 (2 months)
1st Engineer: MAHNAM - Bulk Carrier / 2016-05-17 - 2016-10-08 (5 months)
4th Engineer: Stanford Kite - Crew boat / 2019-10-02 - 2020-10-11 (1 year)
Ship Security Officer: SHEGARDIAH - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-09-19 - 2020-10-03 (14 days)
Ship Security Officer: MTM Gibraltar - Chemical tanker / 2019-07-21 - 2019-07-30 (9 days)
Ship Security Officer: Boronia HZNE - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-06-24 - 2019-07-05 (11 days)
Ship Security Officer: GAS Athena - LPG / LNG / 2019-05-21 - 2019-06-13 (1 month)
AB Seaman: MV. VANESSA - Other vessels / 2019-10-30 - 2020-09-30 (11 months)
AB Seaman: MV. SKAFTAFELL - Container Ship / 2019-02-18 - 2019-08-17 (6 months)
AB Seaman: VALERIA RUGAIHURUZA - Tug boat / 2018-05-10 - 2019-02-14 (9 months)
AB Seaman: TUG KIBOKO - Tug boat / 2017-04-22 - 2018-03-21 (11 months)
AB Seaman: GIA DE 8 - General cargo / 2014-10-28 - 2015-04-17 (6 months)