Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Chief Engineer: BBC Mississippi - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2016-05-12 - 2016-08-22 (3 months)
Chief Engineer: Sima Pride - Container Ship / 2015-11-30 - 2016-02-26 (3 months)
2nd Engineer: V.UNO - Bulk Carrier / 2015-03-25 - 2015-07-27 (4 months)
2nd Engineer: MOL EMERALD - Container Ship / 2014-05-11 - 2014-09-03 (4 months)
2nd Engineer: Meta - Container Ship / 2013-09-28 - 2014-01-31 (4 months)
3rd Engineer: ATLANTIS DWELLER - DSV (Diving Support) / 2016-04-27 - 2016-08-08 (3 months)
3rd Engineer: ATLANTIS DWELLER - DSV (Diving Support) / 2016-02-17 - 2016-03-05 (1 month)
3rd Engineer: ATLANTIS DWELLER - DSV (Diving Support) / 2015-04-04 - 2015-07-06 (3 months)
Motorman: ATLANTIS DWELLER - DSV (Diving Support) / 2015-03-28 - 2015-04-04 (7 days)
3rd Engineer: NSO CHAMPION - Platform Supply vessel / 2014-10-20 - 2015-01-13 (3 months)
Electrician: MCS VERONIQUE - Container Ship / 2016-04-16 - 2016-08-03 (4 months)
Electrician: RHAPSODY - Passenger vessel / 2015-04-07 - 2015-09-01 (5 months)
AB Seaman: KAISER SEA - Bunkering Vessel / 2016-03-23 - 2016-07-20 (4 months)
AB Seaman: Almuntazah - Bunkering Vessel / 2014-10-31 - 2015-12-29 (1 year)
AB Seaman: Alexandr Lebed - General cargo / 2012-07-12 - 2013-03-20 (8 months)
AB Seaman: Alexandr Lebed - General cargo / 2011-09-26 - 2012-03-23 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Bufflehead - Bulk Carrier / 2015-12-14 - 2016-07-12 (7 months)
AB Seaman: MASKY - Bulk Carrier / 2015-01-26 - 2015-09-03 (7 months)
AB Seaman: TUNDRA - Bulk Carrier / 2014-04-12 - 2014-10-29 (7 months)
AB Seaman: TN DAWN - Bulk Carrier / 2011-12-18 - 2012-07-15 (7 months)
AB Seaman: DIAS - Bulk Carrier / 2011-04-12 - 2011-11-24 (7 months)
OS: m/v»CCNI Caribe» - Bulk Carrier / 2015-12-10 - 2016-06-25 (6 months)
OS: «Callio» - Bulk Carrier / 2013-11-10 - 2014-05-15 (6 months)
OS: «Dona Maria» - Bulk Carrier / 2013-03-29 - 2013-09-30 (6 months)
3rd Engineer: SAINT DIONYSIS - Bulk Carrier / 2015-12-29 - 2016-05-25 (5 months)
4th Engineer: AVIONA - Bulk Carrier / 2015-11-26 - 2015-12-14 (1 month)
4th Engineer: OCEAN FORTUNE - Container Ship / 2013-08-19 - 2014-02-09 (6 months)
4th Engineer: TANAIS LEADER - Bulk Carrier / 2012-01-29 - 2012-07-29 (6 months)
4th Engineer: LADY JULIET - Dry Cargo / 2010-12-28 - 2011-05-12 (4 months)
3rd Engineer: ISADORA - Reefer / 2015-05-23 - 2016-04-22 (11 months)
3rd Engineer: Great White - Crude Oil Tanker / 2013-10-14 - 2014-03-20 (5 months)
3rd Engineer: IRON DESTINY - Bulk Carrier / 2013-02-20 - 2013-05-10 (3 months)
3rd Engineer: PACIFIK PIONEER - Bulk Carrier / 2012-02-14 - 2012-08-02 (6 months)
3rd Engineer: ST.MARK - Bulk Carrier / 2011-06-20 - 2011-12-18 (6 months)
ETO: Ruby Princess - Passenger vessel / 2016-01-07 - 2016-04-09 (3 months)
ETO: Emerald Princess - Passenger vessel / 2015-09-20 - 2015-10-30 (1 month)
ETO: Golden Princess - Passenger vessel / 2015-04-18 - 2015-06-11 (2 months)
ETO: Emerald Princess - Passenger vessel / 2015-02-21 - 2015-04-17 (2 months)
ETO: Diamond Princess - Passenger vessel / 2014-07-07 - 2014-10-03 (3 months)
Wiper: Golden Princess - Passenger vessel / 2016-01-23 - 2016-04-08 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Thorco Africa - General cargo / 2015-06-12 - 2016-03-24 (9 months)
Chief Officer: Thorco Sapphire - RO-RO / 2014-08-22 - 2015-02-26 (6 months)
Chief Officer: Hammonia Pacificum - Container Ship / 2013-12-17 - 2014-04-18 (4 months)
Chief Officer: TS Qingdao (Hammonia Holasatia) - Container Ship / 2013-05-22 - 2013-10-01 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Belgica - Container Ship / 2012-10-15 - 2013-03-02 (4 months)
2nd Officer: CSC Nelson - AHTS / 2015-08-31 - 2016-03-15 (6 months)
2nd Officer: CSC Nelson - AHTS / 2014-12-31 - 2015-05-01 (4 months)
2nd Officer: Martial - AHTS / 2014-06-27 - 2014-11-05 (4 months)
2nd Officer: Bateleur - AHTS / 2013-08-03 - 2014-01-15 (5 months)
2nd Officer: Talon - AHTS / 2013-06-01 - 2013-07-21 (2 months)
3rd Engineer: Fairway - Dredger / 2016-01-13 - 2016-02-24 (1 month)
3rd Engineer: Fairway - Dredger / 2015-11-18 - 2015-12-16 (1 month)
3rd Engineer: Fairway - Dredger / 2015-08-26 - 2015-10-07 (1 month)
3rd Engineer: Fairway - Dredger / 2015-06-03 - 2015-07-15 (1 month)
3rd Engineer: Fairway - Dredger / 2015-03-10 - 2015-04-22 (1 month)
AB / Welder: Pavel Kutakhov - Fishing vessel / 2015-11-28 - 2016-02-12 (2 months)
AB / Welder: Ieva Simonoityte - Fishing vessel / 2015-11-20 - 2015-11-28 (8 days)
OS: FinWhale - Fishing vessel / 2015-10-22 - 2016-02-10 (4 months)
OS: FinWhale - Fishing vessel / 2015-01-15 - 2015-05-24 (4 months)
OS: FinWhale - Fishing vessel / 2013-08-29 - 2014-01-23 (5 months)
OS: FinWhale - Fishing vessel / 2013-01-05 - 2013-05-21 (5 months)
OS: FinWhale - Fishing vessel / 2012-04-02 - 2012-08-09 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: Solka 2 - General cargo / 2015-07-08 - 2016-02-05 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: Tatres - Passenger vessel / 2014-03-19 - 2014-08-30 (5 months)
Chief Officer: Nireas - Bulk Carrier / 2015-06-15 - 2016-01-04 (7 months)
2nd Officer: Atlas - Bulk Carrier / 2014-06-29 - 2014-12-17 (6 months)
2nd Officer: Thisseas - Bulk Carrier / 2013-09-19 - 2014-03-17 (6 months)
2nd Officer: Joalmi - Bulk Carrier / 2012-12-17 - 2013-04-05 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Joalmi - Bulk Carrier / 2012-12-05 - 2012-12-17 (12 days)
Mess Boy: Chemtrans Rugen - Oil Products Tanker / 2015-07-09 - 2015-12-22 (5 months)
Mess Boy: Chemtrans Rouen - Oil Products Tanker / 2014-08-08 - 2015-02-12 (6 months)
Mess Boy: TR.Crowne - Bulk Carrier / 2014-02-09 - 2014-06-17 (4 months)
Mess Boy: Jimakos T - Bulk Carrier / 2007-12-04 - 2008-06-04 (6 months)
3rd Engineer: Dona Maria - Bulk Carrier / 2015-07-17 - 2015-12-20 (5 months)
Motorman: Seabreeze - General cargo / 2015-04-25 - 2015-06-20 (2 months)
Motorman: MUNICH TRADER - Container Ship / 2013-11-06 - 2014-05-25 (7 months)
Motorman: OCEAN PRELATE - Bulk Carrier / 2012-10-19 - 2013-06-03 (7 months)
Motorman: Halcyon (Colan) - Container Ship / 2011-11-01 - 2012-06-03 (7 months)
Chief Engineer: Martta VG - General cargo / 2015-11-03 - 2015-12-01 (1 month)
Chief Engineer: Martta VG - General cargo / 2015-09-02 - 2015-10-01 (1 month)
Chief Engineer: Martta VG - General cargo / 2015-06-13 - 2015-07-28 (1 month)
2nd Engineer: Finnhawk - RO-RO / 2014-11-01 - 2014-11-22 (1 month)
2nd Engineer: Finnhawk - RO-RO / 2014-09-20 - 2014-10-12 (1 month)