Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
2nd Officer: MARINA - Container Ship / 2016-10-10 - 2017-03-23 (5 months)
2nd Officer: ARA AMSTERDAM - General cargo / 2015-04-26 - 2016-08-14 (1 year)
2nd Officer: FAS DAMMAM - Container Ship / 2015-11-27 - 2016-04-25 (5 months)
2nd Officer: ARA AMSTERDAM - General cargo / 2014-09-07 - 2014-12-24 (4 months)
2nd Officer: WEC MAJORELLE - Container Ship / 2014-04-15 - 2014-08-07 (4 months)
Master: KATRIN - General cargo / 2016-11-22 - 2017-03-18 (4 months)
Master: CELTIC WARRIOR - Dry Cargo / 2016-02-22 - 2016-06-19 (4 months)
Master: Lisbeth - Dry Cargo / 2015-03-01 - 2015-05-15 (2 months)
Master: Lisbeth - Dry Cargo / 2014-11-29 - 2015-01-21 (2 months)
Master: Lisbeth - Dry Cargo / 2014-09-12 - 2014-10-16 (1 month)
Motorman: FORTUNA - Barge / 2016-12-04 - 2017-03-06 (3 months)
Motorman: Норильск - Repair Vessel / 2016-04-22 - 2016-07-22 (3 months)
Engine Cadet: Петр Лидов - Bulk Carrier / 2015-05-15 - 2015-07-20 (2 months)
Chief Officer: MSC Julie - Container Ship / 2016-12-30 - 2017-02-21 (2 months)
Chief Officer: MSC CHLOE - Container Ship / 2016-09-20 - 2016-12-30 (3 months)
Chief Officer: MSC Meline - Container Ship / 2015-11-29 - 2016-04-14 (5 months)
Chief Officer: MSC LEANNE - Container Ship / 2015-02-03 - 2015-06-24 (5 months)
Chief Officer: MSC ATLANTIC - Container Ship / 2014-02-15 - 2014-07-28 (5 months)
3rd Engineer: Agia Ekaterini - Bulk Carrier / 2016-08-08 - 2017-01-30 (6 months)
3rd Engineer: Ice Dragon - Bulk Carrier / 2016-03-07 - 2016-05-21 (2 months)
4th Engineer: Ice Dragon - Bulk Carrier / 2015-03-21 - 2015-09-11 (6 months)
4th Engineer: Ice Dragon - Bulk Carrier / 2014-05-11 - 2014-09-28 (5 months)
Motorman: Ice Dragon - Bulk Carrier / 2014-02-01 - 2014-05-10 (3 months)
Oiler: ALYCIA - Bulk Carrier / 2016-07-01 - 2017-01-26 (7 months)
Oiler: ALTHEA - Bulk Carrier / 2015-05-26 - 2015-12-24 (7 months)
Motorman-welder: GORA - Bulk Carrier / 2014-06-20 - 2015-04-10 (10 months)
Oiler: SAKHALIN - Bulk Carrier / 2013-02-07 - 2013-09-24 (8 months)
Motorman: SADENT - Bulk Carrier / 2012-03-23 - 2012-10-24 (7 months)
3rd Officer: Santa Fe - General cargo / 2016-06-04 - 2017-01-06 (7 months)
3rd Officer: ANASSA - Bulk Carrier / 2015-05-24 - 2015-10-24 (5 months)
3rd Officer: AMBER HALO - Bulk Carrier / 2015-02-21 - 2015-05-14 (3 months)
3rd Officer: ANASSA - Bulk Carrier / 2014-03-13 - 2014-10-01 (7 months)
3rd Officer: MAERSK DELLYS - Container Ship / 2012-11-30 - 2013-02-28 (3 months)
ETO: Indian Goodwill - Bulk Carrier / 2016-06-15 - 2017-01-04 (7 months)
ETO: Castlegate - Bulk Carrier / 2015-10-24 - 2016-04-28 (6 months)
ETO: Castlegate - Bulk Carrier / 2015-10-23 - 2016-04-19 (6 months)
ETO: Guofeng Enterprise - Bulk Carrier / 2015-03-28 - 2015-07-28 (4 months)
ETO: Guofeng Enterprise - Bulk Carrier / 2015-03-27 - 2015-07-25 (4 months)
Cook: Silver Wind - Dry Cargo / 2016-12-08 - 2016-12-29 (1 month)
Cook: Silver Dream - Dry Cargo / 2016-03-05 - 2016-10-03 (7 months)
Cook: PATTANA - Dry Cargo / 2014-12-24 - 2015-10-17 (10 months)
Cook: Pattana - Dry Cargo / 2013-12-15 - 2014-08-15 (8 months)
Cook: lev Yashin - Dry Cargo / 2012-12-11 - 2013-09-09 (9 months)
Master: Asso Zejt 1 - AHTS / 2016-08-18 - 2016-12-22 (4 months)
Master: Challenger-1 - General cargo / 2016-02-04 - 2016-06-10 (4 months)
Master: Challenger - General cargo / 2014-09-01 - 2015-07-06 (10 months)
Master: Challenger - General cargo / 2013-07-15 - 2014-04-25 (9 months)
Master: Challenger - General cargo / 2012-03-03 - 2012-09-04 (6 months)
Master: Bystray - Other vessels / 2016-09-18 - 2016-12-16 (3 months)
Master: Antey - Tug boat / 2015-05-15 - 2015-07-04 (2 months)
Master: Ataman - General cargo / 2012-11-04 - 2013-05-12 (6 months)
Master: Ataman - General cargo / 2011-12-21 - 2012-05-07 (5 months)
Chief Officer: Vega/Sarma1 - Dry Cargo / 2011-06-04 - 2011-10-18 (4 months)
2nd Engineer: Leto - Bulk Carrier / 2016-05-31 - 2016-12-15 (6 months)
2nd Engineer: THISSEAS - Bulk Carrier / 2015-08-06 - 2016-02-14 (6 months)
2nd Engineer: AMBER HALO - Bulk Carrier / 2015-02-21 - 2015-05-15 (3 months)
2nd Engineer: STARWAY - Bulk Carrier / 2014-06-09 - 2014-10-24 (4 months)
2nd Engineer: VERGINIA - Bulk Carrier / 2013-05-30 - 2013-12-14 (6 months)
El. Engineer: BBC Sapphire - Heavy lift vessel / 2016-08-11 - 2016-12-11 (4 months)
El. Engineer: BBC Sapphire - Heavy lift vessel / 2015-11-30 - 2016-04-09 (4 months)
El. Engineer: Michigan - Heavy lift vessel / 2015-02-09 - 2015-06-27 (5 months)
El. Engineer: BBC Maine - Heavy lift vessel / 2014-07-07 - 2014-11-02 (4 months)
El. Engineer: BBC Delaware - Heavy lift vessel / 2013-10-01 - 2014-02-14 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Straitview - Chemical tanker / 2016-09-01 - 2016-12-04 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Aliot - Tug boat / 2016-04-15 - 2016-06-11 (2 months)
Chief Officer: Aliot - Tug boat / 2015-12-05 - 2016-02-08 (2 months)
2nd Officer: Niagara - Chemical tanker / 2015-04-14 - 2015-06-10 (2 months)
3rd Officer: Niagara - Chemical tanker / 2015-02-14 - 2015-04-14 (2 months)
4th Engineer: NORRLAND - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2016-06-08 - 2016-11-10 (5 months)
Motorman: NORRLAND - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2016-04-11 - 2016-06-07 (2 months)
Motorman: OSTERBOTTEN - Dry Cargo / 2015-08-17 - 2016-02-19 (6 months)
Motorman: LETLAND - General cargo / 2014-08-18 - 2015-05-12 (9 months)
Motorman: LOLAND - General cargo / 2013-12-18 - 2014-06-14 (6 months)
Chief Officer: Naval Ship - AHTS / 2012-09-07 - 2016-11-07 (4 years)
Master: Investigator - Drilling Vessel / 2016-07-30 - 2016-11-05 (3 months)
Master: Investigator - Drilling Vessel / 2015-12-11 - 2016-04-29 (5 months)
Master: Investigator - Drilling Vessel / 2015-05-12 - 2015-09-27 (4 months)
Master: Albatros 1 - Drilling Vessel / 2014-12-18 - 2015-03-09 (3 months)
Master: Albatros 1 - Drilling Vessel / 2014-05-27 - 2014-09-27 (4 months)
OS: CAPE ESMERALDA - Oil Products Tanker / 2016-08-24 - 2016-11-01 (2 months)
AB Seaman: KARALIUS - Fishing vessel / 2016-07-01 - 2016-07-15 (14 days)
OS: LOS ANGELES TRADER - Container Ship / 2015-12-04 - 2016-01-09 (1 month)
OS: CAPE BON - Oil Products Tanker / 2015-03-23 - 2015-09-13 (6 months)
OS: AMBER 1 - Oil Products Tanker / 2014-02-19 - 2014-03-14 (1 month)
Master: TIP Leer - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2016-06-22 - 2016-10-31 (4 months)
Master: TIP Leer - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2015-11-01 - 2016-04-22 (6 months)
Master: RMS Neudorf - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2015-01-04 - 2015-07-08 (6 months)
Master: Fehn Castle - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2014-01-02 - 2014-04-18 (4 months)
Master: Fehn Courage - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2013-05-05 - 2013-10-08 (5 months)
Motorman: ICE RIVER - Reefer / 2016-04-19 - 2016-09-23 (5 months)
Motorman: ICE RUNNER - Reefer / 2015-07-28 - 2015-11-28 (4 months)
Motorman: ICE RANGER - Reefer / 2014-05-04 - 2014-07-20 (3 months)
Engine Cadet: ICE RANGER - Reefer / 2014-02-12 - 2014-05-03 (3 months)
Engine Cadet: ICE RIVER - Other vessels / 2013-02-16 - 2013-06-29 (4 months)