Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
OS: TEZEY M-0268 - Fishing vessel / 2020-06-21 - 2020-08-10 (2 months)
OS: Askholmen - Chemical tanker / 2019-12-08 - 2020-01-16 (1 month)
Deck Cadet: Sedov - Training Ship / 2019-07-05 - 2019-09-06 (2 months)
Electrician: st. Nicolas - General cargo / 2019-11-08 - 2020-08-09 (9 months)
Electrician: st. Constantine - General cargo / 2019-05-22 - 2019-08-07 (3 months)
Electrician: st. Constantine - General cargo / 2018-12-08 - 2019-03-06 (3 months)
Electrician: st. Constantine - General cargo / 2018-08-20 - 2018-11-24 (3 months)
Electrician: st. Constantine - General cargo / 2018-05-04 - 2018-07-14 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: M/V INCE FORTUNE - Bulk Carrier / 2020-02-03 - 2020-08-04 (6 months)
2nd Officer: Border - Container Ship / 2019-10-18 - 2020-08-04 (10 months)
2nd Officer: Border - Container Ship / 2019-02-02 - 2019-06-13 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Ds Blue Wave - Container Ship / 2018-05-05 - 2018-09-29 (5 months)
3rd Officer: Mareno - Container Ship / 2017-07-28 - 2017-12-18 (5 months)
3rd Officer: Mareno - Container Ship / 2016-10-09 - 2017-03-17 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: M/V REGINA CALIXTA V - RO-RO / 2019-08-03 - 2020-08-03 (1 year)
Master: Stavr - General cargo / 2020-03-20 - 2020-07-31 (4 months)
Master: Muse - General cargo / 2019-09-28 - 2020-01-14 (4 months)
Master: Ilya Muromets - General cargo / 2019-04-30 - 2019-08-15 (4 months)
Master: Baykal - General cargo / 2018-09-29 - 2019-01-28 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Rodion Oslyabya - General cargo / 2018-01-19 - 2018-07-13 (6 months)
OS: Tay son 1 - General cargo / 2019-06-01 - 2020-07-27 (1 year)
AB Seaman: Shakhty - Dry Cargo / 2020-02-16 - 2020-07-26 (5 months)
AB Seaman: Chaltyr - Dry Cargo / 2019-07-12 - 2019-12-13 (5 months)
AB Seaman: Tikhiy Don - Cruise Liner / 2018-04-21 - 2018-10-08 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Tikhiy Don - Cruise Liner / 2017-04-22 - 2017-10-08 (6 months)
OS: Chelsea 2 - Bulk Carrier / 2019-09-26 - 2020-07-21 (10 months)
OS: Chelsea 2 - Bulk Carrier / 2018-06-14 - 2018-12-24 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Chelsea 1 - Bulk Carrier / 2018-03-28 - 2018-06-13 (3 months)
3rd Engineer: Pride - Bulk Carrier / 2020-01-21 - 2020-07-15 (6 months)
3rd Engineer: Pride - Bulk Carrier / 2019-05-20 - 2019-10-03 (4 months)
3rd Engineer: Pride - Bulk Carrier / 2018-09-11 - 2019-01-15 (4 months)
3rd Engineer: Pride - Bulk Carrier / 2017-11-29 - 2018-04-23 (5 months)
3rd Engineer: Sanna - Bulk Carrier / 2017-02-20 - 2017-06-27 (4 months)
AB Seaman: Shoja2 - General cargo / 2019-10-17 - 2020-07-14 (9 months)
OS: Oriental glory - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-06-20 - 2019-08-23 (2 months)
Messman: Rineia - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-03-30 - 2020-07-12 (3 months)
Chief Officer: B Gas Mariner - LPG / LNG / 2020-01-24 - 2020-07-10 (6 months)
Chief Officer: B Gas Commander - LPG / LNG / 2019-07-05 - 2019-10-17 (3 months)
Chief Officer: B Gas Maud - LPG / LNG / 2018-10-04 - 2019-01-17 (3 months)
2nd Officer: B Gas Summit - LPG / LNG / 2018-03-27 - 2018-03-29 (2 days)
2nd Officer: B Gas Summit - LPG / LNG / 2017-07-18 - 2017-11-14 (4 months)
Boatswain: Agnes - General cargo / 2019-12-14 - 2020-06-25 (6 months)
OS: Volga 4004 - General cargo / 2018-04-12 - 2018-12-09 (8 months)
OS: VOLGO BALT 213 - General cargo / 2017-08-15 - 2018-02-05 (6 months)
El. Engineer: Sabada - General cargo / 2020-02-28 - 2020-06-17 (4 months)
Electric Cadet: Sabada - General cargo / 2019-11-27 - 2020-02-27 (3 months)
Electric Cadet: Svyataya Anna - Dry Cargo / 2018-07-28 - 2019-01-31 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Columbus - Passenger vessel / 2019-11-03 - 2020-06-13 (7 months)
AB Seaman: Columbus - Passenger vessel / 2018-12-05 - 2019-07-22 (8 months)
3rd Officer: Orient transit - Bulk Carrier / 2016-04-05 - 2016-09-02 (5 months)
AB Seaman: Sofrana Surville - Container Ship / 2013-05-20 - 2013-12-15 (7 months)
Steward: DP Reel - ROV Support vessel / 2009-10-28 - 2010-03-24 (5 months)
4th Engineer: Lily Star - Container Ship / 2019-09-11 - 2020-06-08 (9 months)
4th Engineer: Aruna Ece - Bulk Carrier / 2018-05-06 - 2019-02-13 (9 months)
4th Engineer: DOLPHIN 08 - Tug boat / 2017-05-13 - 2017-11-29 (7 months)
Engine Cadet: Super arsenal - Bulk Carrier / 2019-09-09 - 2020-06-02 (9 months)
Photo Manager: Regal Princess - Cruise Liner / 2019-12-01 - 2020-05-15 (5 months)
Photographer: Golden Princess - Cruise Liner / 2019-03-01 - 2019-08-10 (5 months)
Photographer: Regal Princess - Cruise Liner / 2018-07-15 - 2019-01-18 (6 months)
Photographer: Pacific Princess - Cruise Liner / 2017-10-06 - 2018-04-01 (6 months)
Photographer: Caribbean Princess - Cruise Liner / 2017-01-28 - 2017-07-12 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: MT TRANSKO YUDHISTIRA - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-04-01 - 2020-04-03 (1 year)