Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Oiler: Hari Anand - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-11-02 - 2021-05-05 (6 months)
Oiler: Hari Sagar - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-11-29 - 2020-06-30 (7 months)
Wiper: Hari Sagar - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-09-09 - 2019-11-28 (3 months)
Wiper: Ocean Fame - Tug boat / 2018-09-10 - 2019-03-11 (6 months)
Wiper: Ocean monarch - Tug boat / 2016-09-19 - 2017-07-06 (10 months)
AB Seaman: Viking Odessa - RO-RO / 2020-10-31 - 2021-05-03 (6 months)
AB Seaman: City of Oslo - RO-RO / 2020-01-25 - 2020-07-07 (5 months)
AB Seaman: Viking Odessa - RO-RO / 2019-04-20 - 2019-10-22 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Hoegh Caribiya - RO-RO / 2018-05-31 - 2018-12-03 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Viking Constanza - RO-RO / 2017-05-26 - 2017-11-28 (6 months)
OS: Afros - Bulk Carrier / 2021-02-03 - 2021-05-03 (3 months)
OS: Teal Bay - General cargo / 2019-12-13 - 2020-08-26 (8 months)
OS: Chelsea - General cargo / 2018-12-10 - 2019-02-10 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: mv meraio - Bulk Carrier / 2020-01-02 - 2021-04-26 (1 year)
Deck Cadet: Zaliv Vostok - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-01-21 - 2021-04-25 (3 months)
OS: arya 3 - General cargo / 2020-02-14 - 2021-04-20 (1 year)
2nd Engineer: Hyundai Antwerp - Heavy lift vessel / 2020-11-27 - 2021-04-18 (5 months)
2nd Engineer: Hyundai Antwerp - Heavy lift vessel / 2020-02-10 - 2020-07-29 (6 months)
2nd Engineer: Hyundai Ulsan - Heavy lift vessel / 2019-06-05 - 2019-10-03 (4 months)
2nd Engineer: Barbara - Bulk Carrier / 2018-04-18 - 2018-08-17 (4 months)
2nd Engineer: Happy Hiro - Bulk Carrier / 2017-05-29 - 2017-10-02 (4 months)
Chief Cook: ROME EXPRESS - Container Ship / 2020-10-01 - 2021-04-15 (6 months)
Chief Cook: ROME EXPRESS - Container Ship / 2019-04-18 - 2020-01-31 (9 months)
Chief Cook: BERNADETTE - Container Ship / 2018-03-08 - 2018-09-01 (6 months)
Chief Cook: DANCE - Container Ship / 2017-05-12 - 2017-10-27 (5 months)
Chief Cook: BERNADETTE - Container Ship / 2016-11-09 - 2017-02-24 (3 months)
3rd Officer: Patani - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-11-13 - 2021-04-15 (5 months)
AB Seaman: CDRY Brown - General cargo / 2014-02-21 - 2014-08-06 (6 months)
AB Seaman: CDRY Brown - General cargo / 2013-02-11 - 2013-08-18 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Slavutich-13 - Dry Cargo / 2012-03-22 - 2012-12-07 (8 months)
OS: Slavutich-11 - Dry Cargo / 2011-06-17 - 2011-12-23 (6 months)
Oiler: Tiger - Container Ship / 2020-11-21 - 2021-04-12 (5 months)
Motorman: First Bridge - Dry Cargo / 2018-10-14 - 2019-04-05 (6 months)
Motorman: First Bridge - Dry Cargo / 2017-11-24 - 2018-04-30 (5 months)
Fitter / Welder: Power Star - Dry Cargo / 2017-02-03 - 2017-06-21 (5 months)
Fitter / Welder: Nana Leen - Dry Cargo / 2016-05-08 - 2016-11-11 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Nestor - General cargo / 2020-10-01 - 2021-04-10 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Carine - Bulk Carrier / 2018-01-25 - 2018-10-19 (9 months)
AB Seaman: Perlita - Bulk Carrier / 2016-11-27 - 2017-09-20 (10 months)
OS: MV Lena - General cargo / 2019-05-19 - 2021-04-10 (1 year)
AB Seaman: Matteo BR - Bulk Carrier / 2020-06-06 - 2021-04-10 (10 months)
OS: ASTRA MARINE - General cargo / 2019-08-08 - 2019-12-15 (4 months)
OS: ASTRA MARINE - General cargo / 2018-12-28 - 2019-07-22 (7 months)
OS: Bislan - General cargo / 2018-07-12 - 2018-11-18 (4 months)
OS: Salsk - General cargo / 2020-11-07 - 2021-04-06 (5 months)
OS: Morozovsk - General cargo / 2020-01-14 - 2020-05-17 (4 months)
OS: Pavel Panin - Fishing vessel / 2019-04-24 - 2019-09-06 (4 months)
OS: Mys Tarkhankut - Other vessels / 2018-08-10 - 2018-10-26 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: M/V Nautilus IC - Other vessels / 2021-03-06 - 2021-03-27 (1 month)
Deck Cadet: M/V Nautilus IC - Other vessels / 2020-11-22 - 2020-12-06 (14 days)
Trainee Engineer: Romen E - Heavy lift vessel / 2019-11-18 - 2021-03-27 (1 year)
Deck Cadet: M/v SELIM - General cargo / 2021-01-20 - 2021-03-15 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: M/v ABUBAKAR - Dry Cargo / 2020-02-20 - 2020-08-24 (6 months)
El. Engineer: KRITI SEA - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-07-04 - 2021-03-12 (8 months)
El. Engineer: KRITI - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-11-29 - 2019-08-01 (8 months)
El. Engineer: KRITI - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-10-23 - 2018-06-07 (7 months)
El. Engineer: VIETSOVPETRO 01 - FPSO / 2012-04-20 - 2017-04-19 (4 years)
Motorman: Lyra - Reefer / 2020-10-14 - 2021-03-10 (5 months)
Motorman: Socol8 - RO-RO / 2019-04-02 - 2019-12-31 (9 months)
Motorman: MOMA - RO-RO / 2018-02-26 - 2018-07-30 (5 months)
Motorman: Sheriff - Fishing vessel / 2016-08-28 - 2017-08-26 (12 months)
Motorman: Аэронавт - Fishing vessel / 2014-08-24 - 2015-04-28 (8 months)
Oiler: MV Orient Genesis - Bulk Carrier / 2020-06-18 - 2021-03-10 (9 months)
Engine Cadet: MV Theben - RO-RO / 2017-09-28 - 2018-04-04 (6 months)