Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Deck Cadet: Lucinda - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-11-13 - 2019-11-15 (1 year)
AB Seaman: Neatis - Chemical tanker / 2019-04-27 - 2019-11-12 (7 months)
AB Seaman: Glard 2 - Chemical tanker / 2017-11-22 - 2018-04-06 (4 months)
OOW Engine: Somers Isles - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2019-07-16 - 2019-11-07 (4 months)
OOW Engine: Somers Isles - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2019-01-10 - 2019-04-04 (3 months)
OOW Engine: Somers Isles - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2018-07-12 - 2018-10-03 (3 months)
OOW Engine: Somers Isles - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2018-02-15 - 2018-05-10 (3 months)
OOW Engine: Somers Isles - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2017-09-14 - 2017-11-30 (3 months)
Cabin Stewardess: Harmony G - Yacht / 2019-04-22 - 2019-10-30 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: SEAGAS GOVERNOR - LPG / LNG / 2019-01-24 - 2019-10-28 (9 months)
Fitter / Welder: m/vSFERA. - Bulk Carrier / 2019-07-22 - 2019-10-26 (3 months)
Fitter / Welder: m /vSider Atlantic - Bulk Carrier / 2017-10-18 - 2018-03-22 (5 months)
Fitter / Welder: JS Amazon - Bulk Carrier / 2016-08-15 - 2017-04-29 (8 months)
Fitter / Welder: M/V JS COLUMBIA - Bulk Carrier / 2015-08-23 - 2016-04-08 (8 months)
Fitter / Welder: M/V JS Bandol - Bulk Carrier / 2014-10-23 - 2015-05-03 (6 months)
Motorman-electrician: Mekhanik Yuzvovich - General cargo / 2019-06-27 - 2019-10-20 (4 months)
Motorman-electrician: Mekhanik Yuzvovich - General cargo / 2018-10-01 - 2019-02-03 (4 months)
Electrician: Arslan Bey - General cargo / 2018-02-11 - 2018-06-11 (4 months)
Electrician: ARVIN - General cargo / 2017-07-04 - 2017-10-31 (4 months)
Electrician: Aversa - General cargo / 2015-10-16 - 2016-08-16 (10 months)
4th Engineer: Frio Sevastopolis - Reefer / 2019-07-07 - 2019-10-16 (3 months)
4th Engineer: Viktor Titov - Crude Oil Tanker / 2017-10-29 - 2018-02-25 (4 months)
4th Engineer: SCF IRTYSH - Chemical tanker / 2017-02-05 - 2017-06-20 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: Captain Kostichev - Crude Oil Tanker / 2015-07-14 - 2015-10-13 (3 months)
Engine Cadet: Zaliv Aniva - Crude Oil Tanker / 2013-07-09 - 2013-10-24 (3 months)
3rd Engineer: Good Luck - Bulk Carrier / 2019-06-14 - 2019-10-13 (4 months)
4th Engineer: Star Sophia - Bulk Carrier / 2018-09-20 - 2019-02-07 (5 months)
4th Engineer: Spirit of Manila - Container Ship / 2017-12-28 - 2018-05-24 (5 months)
4th Engineer: Menomonee - Bulk Carrier / 2016-11-23 - 2017-05-19 (6 months)
4th Engineer: VICTORIA MAY - Bulk Carrier / 2016-01-21 - 2016-07-22 (6 months)
Master: Maersk Indus - Container Ship / 2019-05-25 - 2019-10-13 (5 months)
Master: Maersk Indus - Container Ship / 2018-09-16 - 2019-01-24 (4 months)
Chief Officer: MAERSK TEMA - Container Ship / 2018-01-21 - 2018-05-16 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Maersk Indus - Container Ship / 2017-06-19 - 2017-10-24 (4 months)
Chief Officer: E.R. KOBE - Container Ship / 2016-04-30 - 2016-09-10 (4 months)
Oiler: OCEAN OPAL - AHT / 2019-04-10 - 2019-10-12 (6 months)
Oiler: OCEAN JADE -1 - AHTS / 2018-04-29 - 2018-08-25 (4 months)
Oiler: MALAVIYA TWENTY EIGHT - Platform Supply vessel / 2017-08-09 - 2017-11-26 (4 months)
Electrician: MSC Vaishnavi R. - Reefer / 2019-03-28 - 2019-10-12 (6 months)
El. Eng. Assistant: MSC WESER - Container Ship / 2018-05-23 - 2018-12-08 (6 months)
Electrician: SOLIGORSK - Dry Cargo / 2017-06-12 - 2018-01-15 (7 months)
Wiper: NAVIGATOR B - Bulk Carrier / 2019-02-15 - 2019-10-10 (8 months)
Trainee OS: Nassim - Tug boat / 2018-08-20 - 2019-10-04 (1 year)
Chief Engineer: Pacific Harmony - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2019-03-22 - 2019-09-19 (6 months)
Chief Engineer: Kimolos Trader - Container Ship / 2018-08-26 - 2019-01-09 (4 months)
Chief Engineer: Sevgi - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2017-11-23 - 2018-05-01 (5 months)
Chief Engineer: Lady Rosebud - Reefer / 2016-04-14 - 2016-11-14 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: MV.TRIFOSA - General cargo / 2018-09-11 - 2019-09-12 (1 year)
Electric Cadet: Castlegate - Bulk Carrier / 2018-12-29 - 2019-09-11 (8 months)
Electric Cadet: CSAV Traiguen - Container Ship / 2018-02-19 - 2018-06-01 (3 months)
AB Seaman: M - Bulk Carrier / 2019-01-09 - 2019-09-10 (8 months)
AB Seaman: C - Bulk Carrier / 2017-12-07 - 2018-07-29 (8 months)
OS: S - Bulk Carrier / 2017-01-12 - 2017-08-19 (7 months)
OS: I - Bulk Carrier / 2015-12-03 - 2016-08-08 (8 months)
OS: K - Bulk Carrier / 2014-11-08 - 2015-07-09 (8 months)
Engine Cadet: KOMISSAR KVACHANTIRADZE - Tug boat / 2019-03-01 - 2019-09-09 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: K.Kvachantiradze - Tug boat / 2019-03-01 - 2019-09-09 (6 months)