Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Deck Cadet: None - Other vessels / 2020-12-20 - 2020-12-20 (0 days)
Trainee Engineer: MV SSL KOCHI - Container Ship / 2020-03-13 - 2020-12-15 (9 months)
Chief Engineer: ALMI SUN - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-07-12 - 2020-12-11 (5 months)
Chief Engineer: ALMI EXPLORER - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-08-03 - 2019-12-06 (4 months)
Chief Engineer: DENSA ALLIGATOR - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-09-07 - 2018-12-26 (4 months)
Chief Engineer: DENSA CROCODILE - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-05-01 - 2018-07-25 (3 months)
2nd Engineer: DENSA CROCODILE - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-09-21 - 2018-02-02 (4 months)
Steward: Condor Valparaiso - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2020-07-09 - 2020-12-09 (5 months)
Steward: Komandor Stuart - Research vessel / 2019-09-02 - 2019-11-23 (3 months)
Steward: Tubingen - Yacht / 2019-01-02 - 2019-07-18 (7 months)
Steward: m/y Tubingn - Yacht / 2018-07-20 - 2018-10-08 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Chem Bulldog - Chemical tanker / 2020-08-05 - 2020-12-03 (4 months)
2nd Officer: Chem Bulldog - Chemical tanker / 2019-06-15 - 2019-11-07 (5 months)
2nd Officer: Chem Bulldog - Chemical tanker / 2018-09-18 - 2019-02-15 (5 months)
2nd Officer: Pavinospirit - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-03-09 - 2018-05-05 (2 months)
2nd Officer: Gazpromneft Zuid - East - Chemical tanker / 2017-04-24 - 2017-07-14 (3 months)
AB Seaman: m.v Jag rishi - Bulk Carrier / 2020-03-07 - 2020-11-29 (9 months)
AB Seaman: m.v jag Leela - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-07-04 - 2019-11-26 (5 months)
AB Seaman: m.v jag Radha - Bulk Carrier / 2018-08-23 - 2019-05-17 (9 months)
AB Seaman: m.v Pacific voyager - General cargo / 2017-12-26 - 2018-04-20 (4 months)
AB Seaman: m.v Arethusa 1 - Bulk Carrier / 2017-04-10 - 2017-08-18 (4 months)
OS: Dniprovetc - Dry Cargo / 2020-09-25 - 2020-11-27 (2 months)
Bartender: Celebrity Solstice - Passenger vessel / 2019-11-20 - 2020-05-25 (6 months)
Waiter: Costa Atlantika - Cruise Liner / 2010-11-07 - 2011-05-05 (6 months)
Waiter: Costa Fortuna - Cruise Liner / 2009-08-24 - 2010-05-10 (9 months)
Waiter: Costa Luminosa - Cruise Liner / 2009-03-28 - 2009-06-28 (3 months)
Boatswain: ''PETRA-1'' - Bulk Carrier / 2020-08-12 - 2020-11-23 (3 months)
AB Seaman: KRISTINA P - Bulk Carrier / 2020-01-05 - 2020-08-05 (7 months)
AB Seaman: KRISTINA P - Bulk Carrier / 2019-03-27 - 2019-11-06 (7 months)
AB Seaman: TATIANA P - Bulk Carrier / 2018-11-27 - 2019-03-03 (3 months)
AB Seaman: CORINA - Bulk Carrier / 2018-01-19 - 2018-07-01 (5 months)
Chief Cook: Kavkaz 5 - Bulk Carrier / 2020-07-10 - 2020-11-17 (4 months)
Chief Cook: Kavkaz 5 - Bulk Carrier / 2019-07-27 - 2019-12-08 (4 months)
Chief Cook: Bourbon Explorer 514 - Platform Supply vessel / 2017-11-15 - 2018-02-19 (3 months)
Chief Cook: FRIO ANTWERP - Dry Cargo / 2013-03-03 - 2013-07-15 (4 months)
Chief Cook: FRIO ATHENS - Dry Cargo / 2012-07-05 - 2013-01-03 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Kps Deniz Sultan - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-11-26 - 2020-11-15 (12 months)
OS: M.V AMBUJA MUKUND - Cement Carrier / 2020-03-04 - 2020-11-12 (8 months)
OS: M.V AMBUJA GAURAVA - Cement Carrier / 2019-02-04 - 2019-08-19 (6 months)
OS: M.V AMBUJA SHAKTI - Cement Carrier / 2018-06-19 - 2018-12-20 (6 months)
OS: M.V AMBUJA SHIKHAR - Cement Carrier / 2017-10-16 - 2018-03-23 (5 months)
OS: M.V AMBUJA GAURAVA - Cement Carrier / 2017-01-27 - 2017-08-10 (6 months)
Cook: Leonid Khotkin - Survey vessel / 2020-07-17 - 2020-11-12 (4 months)
Chief Cook: Merowing - Other vessels / 2019-07-05 - 2019-10-02 (3 months)
Cook: mars - Tug boat / 2018-10-26 - 2019-03-10 (4 months)
Chief Cook: china frost - Reefer / 2018-05-24 - 2018-10-03 (4 months)
AB Seaman: mrtk-1067 - Fishing vessel / 2015-08-01 - 2016-11-15 (1 year)
Wiper: MCP BILBAO - General cargo / 2020-08-28 - 2020-11-03 (2 months)
Oiler: MV BEST TRAVELLER - Bulk Carrier / 2018-12-12 - 2019-12-27 (1 year)
Wiper: MV NEERJA - General cargo / 2017-12-28 - 2018-07-10 (6 months)
Deckhand: MB ADONIS - Yacht / 2020-08-01 - 2020-11-02 (3 months)
Chief Engineer: LIV AUERBACH - General cargo / 2020-06-01 - 2020-10-25 (5 months)
Chief Engineer: MAPLE LIV - General cargo / 2019-07-04 - 2019-10-26 (4 months)
Chief Engineer: MAPLE LIV - General cargo / 2018-09-28 - 2019-03-02 (5 months)
Stewardess: m/y Vertigo - Yacht / 2020-06-01 - 2020-10-25 (5 months)
Cabin Stewardess: M/y Vertigo - Yacht / 2019-04-28 - 2019-10-28 (6 months)
Steward: O Natalina - Yacht / 2018-04-17 - 2018-11-23 (7 months)
Stewardess: O`Natalina - Yacht / 2017-04-19 - 2017-10-26 (6 months)
Stewardess: Jaan - Yacht / 2016-03-08 - 2016-09-22 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: Sedov - Training Ship / 2020-08-15 - 2020-10-24 (2 months)
3rd Officer: Atlantic East - Container Ship / 2020-06-01 - 2020-10-20 (5 months)
Motorman: MMP-1 - Barge / 2020-07-23 - 2020-10-16 (3 months)
Motorman: Kurshskaya kosa - Fishing vessel / 2019-10-15 - 2019-12-15 (2 months)
Motorman: Iosif Shmelkin - Fishing vessel / 2019-04-13 - 2019-10-02 (6 months)
Motorman: Kapitan Edemskiy - Fishing vessel / 2018-07-20 - 2018-10-19 (3 months)
Motorman: Right whale - Fishing vessel / 2017-06-27 - 2017-11-16 (5 months)
3rd Officer: Alpine Aqualina - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-07-16 - 2020-10-16 (3 months)
3rd Officer: Alpine Aqualina - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-08-29 - 2020-01-19 (5 months)
3rd Officer: Alpine Aqualina - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-11-08 - 2019-03-21 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Alpine Aqualina - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-11-24 - 2018-07-21 (8 months)