Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Chief Officer: Ekaterina - Bulk Carrier / 2018-08-04 - 2018-11-17 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Ekaterina - Bulk Carrier / 2017-09-05 - 2018-01-31 (5 months)
Chief Officer: Ekaterina - Bulk Carrier / 2016-11-24 - 2017-04-20 (5 months)
2nd Officer: Ekaterina - Bulk Carrier / 2015-11-07 - 2016-06-08 (7 months)
Chief Officer: Chasovoy - Other vessels / 2015-10-15 - 2015-10-30 (15 days)
Motorman: Vadim Klyuev - Tug boat / 2018-05-18 - 2018-11-08 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: Nevskiy 39 - Dry Cargo / 2017-08-04 - 2017-10-04 (2 months)
Master: Mykhaylo Nardekov - Fishing vessel / 2012-01-01 - 2018-11-01 (6 years)
Master: Berdyanets - Fishing vessel / 1995-01-01 - 2012-01-01 (17 years)
Chief Officer: SCHS-1016 - Other vessels / 1992-01-01 - 1995-01-01 (3 years)
Chief Officer: SCHS-1169 - Fishing vessel / 1989-01-01 - 1992-01-01 (3 years)
Chief Engineer: Major Chapichev - Ferry / 2015-10-01 - 2018-10-31 (3 years)
Chief Engineer: ALP Winger DP 2 - AHT / 2015-08-14 - 2015-09-20 (1 month)
Chief Engineer: urag ems - AHT / 2015-03-02 - 2015-04-10 (1 month)
Chief Engineer: urag elbe - AHT / 2014-12-15 - 2015-01-30 (1 month)
Chief Engineer: Urag elbe - AHT / 2014-10-18 - 2014-11-18 (1 month)
AB Seaman: Genoa - Container Ship / 2018-04-16 - 2018-10-24 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Express Rome - Container Ship / 2017-07-09 - 2018-01-13 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Express France - Container Ship / 2016-10-23 - 2017-05-13 (7 months)
AB / Welder: MV Letavia - Container Ship / 2017-12-24 - 2018-10-10 (10 months)
AB / Welder: MV Letavia - Container Ship / 2017-02-18 - 2017-08-26 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: MV NEW ENERGY - General cargo / 2018-03-04 - 2018-10-08 (7 months)
Electric Cadet: ELITA - Training Ship / 2018-06-25 - 2018-10-06 (3 months)
2nd Officer: Zulfi haciyev - Other vessels / 2016-02-01 - 2018-10-06 (2 years)
Deck Cadet: Mt. PEGADEN - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-08-28 - 2018-09-29 (1 year)
Steward: Seminole - Pipe laying vessel / 2018-06-16 - 2018-09-14 (3 months)
Stewardess: AF Marina - RO-RO / 2017-11-30 - 2018-03-09 (3 months)
Stewardess: Greifswald - RO-RO / 2017-08-05 - 2017-11-01 (3 months)
Stewardess: Greifswald - RO-RO / 2017-02-07 - 2017-06-04 (4 months)
Stewardess: Greifswald - RO-RO / 2016-09-06 - 2016-12-10 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: MIR - Sailing Vessel / 2018-06-15 - 2018-09-13 (3 months)
Fitter / Welder: NORTHERN GUILD - Container Ship / 2018-04-16 - 2018-09-07 (5 months)
Fitter / Welder: Emerald Strait - Bulk Carrier / 2017-08-06 - 2017-12-02 (4 months)
Fitter / Welder: Orient Strength - Bulk Carrier / 2016-11-15 - 2017-05-29 (6 months)
Fitter / Welder: Radiance of the Seas - Passenger vessel / 2016-05-02 - 2016-05-13 (11 days)
Fitter / Welder: Azamara Quest - Passenger vessel / 2016-03-25 - 2016-04-14 (1 month)
Electric Cadet: PROMITHEAS - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-06-20 - 2018-09-06 (3 months)
Engine Cadet: SOPHIE C. - Bulk Carrier / 1996-05-30 - 1996-10-16 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: Khersones - Sailing Vessel / 2018-04-01 - 2018-08-30 (5 months)
Motorman: Beata - General cargo / 2018-06-25 - 2018-08-18 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: Beata - General cargo / 2018-03-11 - 2018-06-24 (3 months)
Engine Cadet: Vnimatelnii - Tug boat / 2016-07-04 - 2016-09-07 (2 months)
Chief Officer: Concordia - Bulk Carrier / 2018-04-20 - 2018-08-16 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Harm - Bulk Carrier / 2017-11-03 - 2018-02-24 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Moonray - Bulk Carrier / 2016-09-25 - 2017-03-30 (6 months)
Chief Officer: Moonray - Bulk Carrier / 2015-09-11 - 2016-04-15 (7 months)
Chief Officer: KIBALI - Bulk Carrier / 2015-01-20 - 2015-06-22 (5 months)
AB Seaman: Temel Reis - General cargo / 2018-02-04 - 2018-07-25 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Lavrion - General cargo / 2017-07-27 - 2017-12-06 (4 months)
AB Seaman: Pacific Future - General cargo / 2016-03-20 - 2016-10-25 (7 months)
AB Seaman: Arda-K - General cargo / 2011-05-11 - 2012-02-25 (9 months)
AB Seaman: Moon - General cargo / 2009-04-18 - 2009-05-18 (1 month)
AB Seaman: MV SAGARDEEP II - General cargo / 2018-01-05 - 2018-07-18 (6 months)
AB Seaman: MV SAGARDEEP II - General cargo / 2015-06-24 - 2016-02-12 (8 months)
AB Seaman: MV PRADEEP - General cargo / 2014-08-06 - 2015-02-06 (6 months)
OS: MV SAGARDEEP II - General cargo / 2011-11-10 - 2012-06-19 (7 months)
OS: MV KUMAR - Bulk Carrier / 2010-11-26 - 2011-09-28 (10 months)
Oiler: CARME - Dry Cargo / 2017-12-13 - 2018-07-16 (7 months)
Motorman: BLKY - Bulk Carrier / 2016-10-07 - 2017-05-16 (7 months)
Motorman: INDRA 2 - Bulk Carrier / 2015-08-21 - 2016-05-21 (9 months)
Motorman: PORTOFINO - Container Ship / 2014-08-30 - 2015-02-25 (6 months)
Motorman: HAJ WALID - Bulk Carrier / 2013-11-25 - 2014-05-29 (6 months)