Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Motorman: Viking Sineus - Passenger vessel / 2018-11-18 - 2019-04-25 (5 months)
Motorman: Viking Sineus - Passenger vessel / 2018-03-12 - 2018-10-16 (7 months)
Engine Cadet: СМПК " Астрахань" - Other vessels / 2017-03-13 - 2017-05-14 (2 months)
OS: Portovyi 8 - Tug boat / 2019-03-25 - 2019-04-19 (1 month)
OS: Portovyi 5 - Tug boat / 2018-07-09 - 2018-08-05 (1 month)
Master: Italia Reefer - Container Ship / 2018-10-12 - 2019-04-18 (6 months)
Master: Italia Reefer - Container Ship / 2017-12-05 - 2018-06-10 (6 months)
Master: Bremen Reefer - Container Ship / 2017-07-25 - 2017-09-20 (2 months)
Master: HELLAS REEFER - Container Ship / 2017-03-21 - 2017-06-08 (3 months)
Master: Swedish Reefer - Container Ship / 2016-03-20 - 2016-09-07 (6 months)
AB Seaman: MSC Agata - Other vessels / 2018-08-15 - 2019-03-19 (7 months)
OS: MSC Ishyka - Other vessels / 2017-04-13 - 2018-01-17 (9 months)
OS: MSC Nederland - Other vessels / 2016-10-12 - 2017-02-02 (4 months)
AB Seaman: Marco Polo - Passenger vessel / 2015-01-05 - 2016-01-05 (1 year)
OS: Marco Polo - Passenger vessel / 2013-06-19 - 2014-07-04 (1 year)
Electric Cadet: Granit - Tug boat / 2018-06-01 - 2019-03-15 (9 months)
Electric Cadet: Udarnik - Tug boat / 2017-06-16 - 2017-07-10 (1 month)
Electrician: Wolf - General cargo / 2015-01-22 - 2019-02-13 (4 years)
Electrician: Terve - General cargo / 2014-01-12 - 2014-06-22 (5 months)
Electrician: Terve - General cargo / 2013-01-12 - 2013-11-03 (10 months)
Electrician: Terve - General cargo / 2012-04-21 - 2012-10-10 (6 months)
Electrician: Goodway - Dry Cargo / 2011-06-25 - 2012-02-22 (8 months)
Deck Cadet: Kentavr - Tug boat / 2018-12-10 - 2019-02-10 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: Dokovets - Tug boat / 2018-05-28 - 2018-08-20 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Delnavaz - Bulk Carrier / 2018-08-11 - 2019-02-09 (6 months)
Chief Officer: Fortune Daisy - Bulk Carrier / 2017-11-29 - 2018-04-03 (4 months)
Chief Officer: BAHJAT - Bulk Carrier / 2017-03-07 - 2017-10-13 (7 months)
Chief Officer: Glovis Maria - Bulk Carrier / 2016-01-29 - 2016-07-01 (5 months)
Chief Officer: Orient Crusader - Bulk Carrier / 2015-03-12 - 2015-08-25 (5 months)
Motorman: Sea Star 9 - General cargo / 2017-12-03 - 2019-02-01 (1 year)
Wiper : ER AUCKLAND - Container Ship / 2015-12-14 - 2016-10-18 (10 months)
Motorman: Sea Star 9 - General cargo / 2015-06-12 - 2015-06-27 (15 days)
Motorman: YONG FU - General cargo / 2014-04-11 - 2015-06-12 (1 year)
Chief Engineer: Naess Resolute - Bulk Carrier / 2018-07-29 - 2019-01-29 (6 months)
Chief Engineer: Naess Intrepid - Bulk Carrier / 2018-06-20 - 2018-08-18 (2 months)
Chief Engineer: Sparta” - Bulk Carrier / 2017-06-29 - 2017-10-27 (4 months)
Chief Engineer: Santa Elena - Bulk Carrier / 2016-07-18 - 2016-12-30 (5 months)
Chief Engineer: UCF -2 - Bulk Carrier / 2015-10-09 - 2016-03-04 (5 months)
OS: Captain George K - Bulk Carrier / 2018-07-23 - 2019-01-26 (6 months)
OS: FALCON TRIUMPH - Bulk Carrier / 2016-09-11 - 2017-05-10 (8 months)
3rd Engineer: Baltic Shearwater - Container Ship / 2018-09-24 - 2019-01-23 (4 months)
3rd Engineer: BOMAR RESOLUTE - Container Ship / 2017-07-14 - 2017-12-19 (5 months)
3rd Engineer: Schubert - Container Ship / 2016-05-30 - 2016-10-22 (5 months)
3rd Engineer: Gypsum Integrity - Bulk Carrier / 2014-10-06 - 2015-02-02 (4 months)
4th Engineer: Gypsum Integrity - Bulk Carrier / 2014-07-10 - 2014-10-05 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: m/v IKARIA ISLAND - Bulk Carrier / 2018-07-10 - 2019-01-19 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: m/v STELLAR PACIFIC - Bulk Carrier / 2018-01-10 - 2018-06-06 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: m/v SPIEKEROOG - General cargo / 2017-07-20 - 2017-12-20 (5 months)
OS: т/х Бурун - Tug boat / 2016-06-14 - 2016-08-29 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: MV. JULIANTO MOELIODIHARDJO - Bulk Carrier / 2017-11-22 - 2018-12-24 (1 year)
Electric Cadet: Ikaria Island - Bulk Carrier / 2018-06-12 - 2018-12-15 (6 months)
4th Engineer: BOSTON TRADER - Container Ship / 2018-06-05 - 2018-12-11 (6 months)
4th Engineer: Lady of luck - Container Ship / 2017-06-26 - 2017-11-05 (4 months)
Motorman: Lady of Luck - Container Ship / 2017-03-26 - 2017-06-26 (3 months)
Motorman: Star of Luck - Container Ship / 2016-08-09 - 2016-12-17 (4 months)
Motorman: Queen of Luck - Container Ship / 2015-09-16 - 2016-03-29 (6 months)
Galley Cleaner: MV Marco Polo - Cruise Liner / 2018-03-08 - 2018-12-08 (9 months)
OS: Jairan - Container Ship / 2017-02-23 - 2017-11-19 (9 months)
2nd Engineer: Nordic Yarra - Bulk Carrier / 2018-08-08 - 2018-11-25 (4 months)
2nd Engineer: Nordic Stokholm - Bulk Carrier / 2017-08-08 - 2018-03-18 (7 months)
3rd Engineer: Nordic Kiel - Bulk Carrier / 2016-08-08 - 2017-02-14 (6 months)
3rd Engineer: Nordic Beijing - Container Ship / 2015-10-31 - 2016-04-17 (6 months)
3rd Engineer: Nordic Stade - Bulk Carrier / 2014-11-05 - 2015-05-25 (7 months)
Oiler: Onego Trader - Dry Cargo / 2018-08-06 - 2018-11-23 (4 months)
Oiler: As Paulina - Container Ship / 2018-04-28 - 2018-06-28 (2 months)
Oiler: HHL Vinice - Heavy lift vessel / 2017-04-04 - 2017-10-28 (7 months)
Oiler: Wilson Astakos - Dry Cargo / 2016-03-22 - 2016-09-27 (6 months)
Oiler: Wilson Lisbon - Dry Cargo / 2014-12-15 - 2015-06-22 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: Rio Tamara - Bulk Carrier / 2018-04-23 - 2018-11-19 (7 months)
Engine Cadet: Danapris-1 - General cargo / 2017-12-04 - 2018-04-16 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: Pivdeniy - Other vessels / 2017-08-21 - 2017-10-21 (2 months)