Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
2nd Engineer: Hercules - Bulk Carrier / 2019-05-20 - 2020-09-02 (1 year)
2nd Engineer: Aquila - Bulk Carrier / 2018-10-14 - 2019-03-18 (5 months)
2nd Engineer: Columba - Bulk Carrier / 2018-02-02 - 2018-09-02 (7 months)
2nd Engineer: Hercules - Bulk Carrier / 2017-07-03 - 2017-12-25 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: T.S.PRIDE OF IMA - Training Ship / 2017-10-08 - 2020-08-31 (2 years)
OS: Fortune navigator - Container Ship / 2019-12-15 - 2020-08-22 (8 months)
Ref. Machinist: Sunfish - Fishing vessel / 2019-06-06 - 2020-08-20 (1 year)
Ref. Machinist: ODOEVSK - Fishing vessel / 2019-04-03 - 2019-06-05 (2 months)
Ref. Machinist: BORODINO - Fishing vessel / 2017-12-22 - 2018-05-20 (5 months)
Ref. Engineer: Александр Беляков - Fishing vessel / 2017-06-10 - 2017-10-26 (5 months)
AB Seaman: Мыс турали - Fishing vessel / 2016-04-20 - 2016-10-21 (6 months)
OS: MV Eurocargo Salerno - RO-RO / 2020-08-10 - 2020-08-19 (9 days)
OS: Pacific Harmony - Heavy lift vessel / 2020-01-28 - 2020-08-12 (6 months)
OS: Atlantic Harmony - Heavy lift vessel / 2019-09-24 - 2019-11-27 (2 months)
OS: Pacific Harmony - Heavy lift vessel / 2019-01-20 - 2019-07-15 (6 months)
2nd Engineer: NAVIOS MELODIA - Bulk Carrier / 2019-09-30 - 2020-08-08 (10 months)
2nd Engineer: HYNDAI SHANGHAI - Container Ship / 2018-09-24 - 2019-02-28 (5 months)
2nd Engineer: HYNDAI SHANGHAI - Container Ship / 2017-12-07 - 2018-04-13 (4 months)
2nd Engineer: MIRAMARIN - Container Ship / 2016-07-12 - 2017-03-17 (8 months)
2nd Engineer: HH JOHANNA - Container Ship / 2015-09-01 - 2016-01-20 (5 months)
Motorman: CARNIVAL SPLENDOR - Cruise Liner / 2020-01-28 - 2020-08-06 (6 months)
Motorman: CARNIVAL VALOR - Cruise Liner / 2019-05-16 - 2019-11-18 (6 months)
Motorman: CARNIVAL VISTA - Cruise Liner / 2018-10-21 - 2019-04-13 (6 months)
Chief Officer: Vityaz - Tug boat / 2019-08-02 - 2020-08-01 (12 months)
Chief Officer: Tsvitomyr - Tug boat / 2018-10-29 - 2019-08-01 (9 months)
Chief Officer: Kronos - Tug boat / 2017-12-30 - 2018-10-15 (9 months)
Chief Officer: Kronos - Tug boat / 2016-12-28 - 2017-11-25 (11 months)
3rd Engineer: Keeper - AHTS / 2020-01-18 - 2020-07-16 (6 months)
3rd Engineer: Keeper - AHTS / 2019-10-08 - 2019-11-29 (2 months)
3rd Engineer: Keeper - AHTS / 2019-06-25 - 2019-08-19 (2 months)
AB Seaman: Gaschem Mosel - LPG / LNG / 2019-09-14 - 2020-07-15 (10 months)
AB Seaman: Gaschem Atlantic - LPG / LNG / 2018-10-17 - 2019-05-28 (7 months)
AB Seaman: Gaschem Rhone - LPG / LNG / 2017-12-05 - 2018-07-18 (7 months)
AB Seaman: Saargas - LPG / LNG / 2016-07-04 - 2017-05-09 (10 months)
AB Seaman: Gaschem Antarctic - LPG / LNG / 2015-03-27 - 2016-02-05 (10 months)
Engine Cadet: Brodospas Beta - AHTS / 2020-03-06 - 2020-07-03 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: Borac - Crew boat / 2019-10-26 - 2020-01-28 (3 months)
AB Seaman: INA LOTTE - Bulk Carrier / 2020-01-28 - 2020-06-28 (5 months)
AB Seaman: Gravity - Bulk Carrier / 2019-01-08 - 2019-06-08 (5 months)
AB Seaman: IRON BARON V - Bulk Carrier / 2018-11-10 - 2019-01-08 (2 months)
AB Seaman: SKY MARINER V - Bulk Carrier / 2018-03-22 - 2018-07-24 (4 months)
Messman: SKY MARINER V - Bulk Carrier / 2017-12-20 - 2018-03-21 (3 months)
Master: ALPHA - General cargo / 2020-01-20 - 2020-06-26 (5 months)
Master: ALPHA - General cargo / 2019-04-12 - 2019-07-30 (4 months)
Master: SPECTRA - General cargo / 2018-07-03 - 2018-11-07 (4 months)
Master: SPECTRA - General cargo / 2017-11-06 - 2018-03-02 (4 months)
Master: SPECTRA - General cargo / 2017-01-27 - 2017-06-17 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: Alexo - RO-RO / 2020-01-02 - 2020-06-24 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Sevastopol - Passenger vessel / 2017-02-27 - 2017-04-29 (2 months)
OS: " Pilot Whale" - Fishing vessel / 2019-12-14 - 2020-06-24 (6 months)
OS: "Mikhail Verbitskiy" - Fishing vessel / 2019-02-07 - 2019-08-05 (6 months)
OS: "Mikhail Verbitskiy" - Fishing vessel / 2019-01-24 - 2019-02-06 (13 days)
OS: "Mikhail Verbitskiy" - Fishing vessel / 2018-06-19 - 2018-10-25 (4 months)
Chief Officer: ADS ARENDAL - Bulk Carrier / 2019-10-31 - 2020-06-22 (8 months)
Chief Officer: FASSA - Bulk Carrier / 2018-11-09 - 2019-06-11 (7 months)
Chief Officer: EQUINOX AGNANDOUSSA - Bulk Carrier / 2017-11-14 - 2018-05-09 (6 months)
Chief Officer: SATDION II - Bulk Carrier / 2017-02-15 - 2017-07-13 (5 months)
Chief Officer: CAPT STEFANOS - Bulk Carrier / 2015-11-21 - 2016-05-23 (6 months)
3rd Engineer: FMT Gumuldur - Chemical tanker / 2019-11-11 - 2020-06-21 (7 months)
3rd Engineer: FMT Gumuldur - Chemical tanker / 2019-03-25 - 2019-06-30 (3 months)
4th Engineer: FMT Gumuldur - Chemical tanker / 2019-02-14 - 2019-03-24 (1 month)
4th Engineer: FMT Gumuldur - Chemical tanker / 2018-06-01 - 2018-10-04 (4 months)
3rd Engineer: Glard-2 - Chemical tanker / 2017-09-18 - 2018-01-21 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: M.T PAGAS - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-09-20 - 2020-06-15 (9 months)
Deck Cadet: Sedov - Sailing Vessel / 2019-12-06 - 2020-06-05 (6 months)
OS: Sedov - Sailing Vessel / 2019-07-06 - 2019-09-06 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: Sedov - Sailing Vessel / 2018-06-15 - 2018-08-30 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: Sedov - Sailing Vessel / 2018-03-28 - 2018-06-13 (3 months)