Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Chief Engineer: Pavinospirit - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-09-16 - 2021-04-30 (7 months)
Chief Engineer: Pavinospirit - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-10-07 - 2020-03-22 (5 months)
Chief Engineer: Pavinospirit - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-12-22 - 2019-05-12 (5 months)
Chief Engineer: Pavinospirit - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-04-15 - 2018-08-15 (4 months)
Chief Engineer: Pavinospirit - Crude Oil Tanker / 2017-07-03 - 2017-12-14 (5 months)
ETO: MSC Auriga - Container Ship / 2020-12-18 - 2021-04-24 (4 months)
ETO: MSC JEONGMIN - Container Ship / 2019-12-17 - 2020-07-19 (7 months)
ETO: MSC Nadriely - Container Ship / 2018-10-28 - 2019-04-16 (6 months)
El. Engineer: MSC JEONGMIN - Container Ship / 2018-02-25 - 2018-07-28 (5 months)
El. Engineer: MSC WESER - Container Ship / 2017-04-21 - 2017-09-19 (5 months)
2nd Officer: Starry Metropolis - Passenger vessel / 2019-07-17 - 2021-04-21 (1 year)
3rd Officer: Saipan Star - Passenger vessel / 2018-04-30 - 2018-10-23 (6 months)
2nd Officer: China Star - Passenger vessel / 2017-04-25 - 2017-11-01 (6 months)
3rd Officer: China Star - Passenger vessel / 2016-09-27 - 2017-04-24 (7 months)
OS: MEDITERRANEAN SEA - RO-RO / 2021-02-01 - 2021-04-20 (3 months)
OS: HYUNDAI LOYALTY - Container Ship / 2019-10-27 - 2020-09-19 (11 months)
Deck Cadet: LAKE GENEVA - RO-RO / 2019-05-29 - 2019-08-23 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: LAKE COMO - RO-RO / 2018-12-08 - 2019-05-28 (6 months)
Messman: LAKE FUXIAN - RO-RO / 2017-11-15 - 2018-09-20 (10 months)
Wiper: Chelsea 4 - General cargo / 2020-11-19 - 2021-04-18 (5 months)
Wiper: WEC Mondriaan - Container Ship / 2019-08-16 - 2019-10-21 (2 months)
OS: NS Parade - Chemical tanker / 2020-09-18 - 2021-04-17 (7 months)
OS: NS Parade - Chemical tanker / 2019-09-11 - 2020-03-06 (6 months)
OS: Boray - Chemical tanker / 2019-01-23 - 2019-05-30 (4 months)
OS: Boray - Chemical tanker / 2018-09-05 - 2018-12-21 (4 months)
OS: Boray - Chemical tanker / 2017-09-15 - 2018-03-25 (6 months)
OS: Anne Sibum - Container Ship / 2020-10-08 - 2021-04-07 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Hizir - General cargo / 2020-02-21 - 2020-07-21 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: OM-106 - Passenger vessel / 2017-06-08 - 2017-08-31 (3 months)
ETO: Gloriuship - Bulk Carrier / 2020-06-28 - 2021-03-31 (9 months)
ETO: LMZ CERES - Bulk Carrier / 2019-05-20 - 2020-02-03 (8 months)
Electrician: LMZ CERES - Bulk Carrier / 2018-03-03 - 2018-11-10 (8 months)
Electrician: LMZ ARIEL - Bulk Carrier / 2017-06-13 - 2018-01-02 (7 months)
El. Engineer: DORADO PLUS - General cargo / 2016-11-04 - 2017-05-21 (7 months)
OS: Chingiz Mustafaev - Chemical tanker / 2020-12-21 - 2021-03-23 (3 months)
OS: Askar Sarydzha - General cargo / 2019-02-08 - 2019-03-31 (2 months)
OS: MSC Atlantic - Container Ship / 2018-05-27 - 2018-09-28 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: Kruzenshtern - Sailing Vessel / 2017-04-04 - 2017-06-05 (2 months)
OS: Sveaborg - Fishing vessel / 2020-09-26 - 2021-03-19 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Sveaborg - Fishing vessel / 2019-08-26 - 2020-03-07 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Evaluna - General cargo / 2020-08-30 - 2021-03-16 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Altrany - General cargo / 2019-09-25 - 2020-03-13 (6 months)
OS: Bade - General cargo / 2018-02-20 - 2018-06-21 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Krilyon - General cargo / 2014-07-02 - 2014-10-21 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: Krilyon - General cargo / 2014-03-15 - 2014-07-01 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: Maira - Container Ship / 2020-09-15 - 2021-03-15 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Hermes - General cargo / 2019-09-05 - 2020-03-12 (6 months)
OS: Alexander Grin - General cargo / 2020-11-17 - 2021-03-15 (4 months)
OS: ELENA - RO-RO / 2016-09-26 - 2016-10-31 (1 month)
AB Seaman: Panda - Bulk Carrier / 2020-08-22 - 2021-03-13 (7 months)
OS: COMMODORE GOODWILL - RO-RO / 2019-12-12 - 2020-01-05 (1 month)
OS: CARNIVAL MIRACLE - Cruise Liner / 2019-04-21 - 2019-10-12 (6 months)
OS: Legend - Cruise Liner / 2018-05-22 - 2018-11-01 (5 months)
OS: Legend - Cruise Liner / 2017-09-05 - 2018-03-04 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Korsakov - Bunkering Vessel / 2021-02-19 - 2021-03-07 (1 month)
AB Seaman: Korsakov - Bunkering Vessel / 2021-01-14 - 2021-02-02 (1 month)
AB Seaman: Nikolaos Skoufas - Bulk Carrier / 2020-06-10 - 2020-10-15 (4 months)
AB Seaman: Ulika - Bunkering Vessel / 2019-12-01 - 2020-03-17 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Salsk - Dry Cargo / 2019-05-01 - 2019-09-07 (4 months)
2nd Engineer: Buk - Tug boat / 2020-03-06 - 2021-03-06 (1 year)
2nd Engineer: Kayman - Tug boat / 2018-09-10 - 2020-03-05 (1 year)
2nd Engineer: Kildin - Tug boat / 2016-10-23 - 2017-09-30 (11 months)
2nd Engineer: Grumant - Tug boat / 2016-06-02 - 2016-09-21 (4 months)
2nd Engineer: Kildin - Tug boat / 2015-09-02 - 2016-06-02 (9 months)
Chief Engineer: Aureus (DP 2) - DSV (Diving Support) / 2020-07-31 - 2021-03-06 (7 months)
Chief Engineer: Aureus (DP 2) - DSV (Diving Support) / 2019-10-20 - 2020-01-29 (3 months)
Chief Engineer: Aureus (DP 2) - DSV (Diving Support) / 2019-05-03 - 2019-08-25 (4 months)
Chief Engineer: NPCC Almaryah (DP 2) - DSV (Diving Support) / 2018-08-27 - 2019-02-01 (5 months)
Chief Engineer: NPCC Almaryah (DP 2) - DSV (Diving Support) / 2017-10-17 - 2018-06-19 (8 months)
Engine Cadet: Mv Kalamata Trader - Container Ship / 2020-02-18 - 2021-03-05 (1 year)
Motorman: BODRYY - Fishing vessel / 2020-12-07 - 2021-02-27 (3 months)
Motorman: SOKOL - Fishing vessel / 2019-12-17 - 2020-06-30 (6 months)
El. Engineer: Cape Veni - Bulk Carrier / 2020-10-26 - 2021-02-25 (4 months)
El. Engineer: Lordship - Bulk Carrier / 2019-12-26 - 2020-08-05 (7 months)
El. Engineer: Gloriuship - Bulk Carrier / 2019-06-13 - 2019-11-28 (5 months)
El. Engineer: Jolanda - Bulk Carrier / 2018-05-04 - 2019-04-28 (12 months)
El. Engineer: Corinthian Poenix - Bulk Carrier / 2017-10-18 - 2018-03-02 (4 months)