Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Engine Cadet: MV. NJOMBE - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2023-02-06 - 2023-04-30 (3 months)
Engine Cadet: Mv. MBEYA II - Passenger vessel / 2022-10-09 - 2022-12-17 (2 months)
Electric Cadet: ds venture - VLCC / 2022-10-26 - 2023-04-26 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Papillon - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-10-09 - 2023-04-21 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Ambelos - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-04-13 - 2021-09-28 (5 months)
Master: LEA - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-12-04 - 2023-04-04 (4 months)
Master: Pti Nile - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-03-09 - 2022-09-19 (6 months)
Master: Pti Hudson - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-05-31 - 2021-10-01 (4 months)
Master: Star I - Chemical tanker / 2020-10-16 - 2021-04-12 (6 months)
Master: Ana Nzinga - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-02-09 - 2020-07-17 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: Balu - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-09-13 - 2023-03-30 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: OM-106 - Passenger vessel / 2021-06-07 - 2021-07-16 (1 month)
OS: Temp-1 - Accommodation barge / 2023-01-09 - 2023-03-30 (3 months)
OS: Volgo-Balt 232 - General cargo / 2022-07-09 - 2022-11-23 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: VOLGO-BALT 216 - General cargo / 2021-10-20 - 2022-01-19 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: КАПИТАН ЧЕЧКИН - Icebreaker / 2021-06-01 - 2021-07-02 (1 month)
Deck Cadet: КАПИТАН БУКАЕВ - Icebreaker / 2021-04-13 - 2021-05-13 (1 month)
3rd Engineer: Viking Queen - RO-RO / 2022-11-06 - 2023-03-26 (5 months)
3rd Engineer: Viking Queen - RO-RO / 2021-12-03 - 2022-07-06 (7 months)
4th Engineer: Viking Queen - RO-RO / 2021-08-27 - 2021-12-02 (3 months)
4th Engineer: Viking Queen - RO-RO / 2020-12-14 - 2021-05-08 (5 months)
Oiler: Viking Ocean - RO-RO / 2020-01-07 - 2020-07-25 (7 months)
OS: SCHILLPLATE - General cargo / 2022-09-14 - 2023-03-24 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: SIF - General cargo / 2021-09-13 - 2022-06-21 (9 months)
AB Seaman: Ayane - Chemical tanker / 2022-11-22 - 2023-03-16 (4 months)
AB Seaman: Ayane - Chemical tanker / 2022-07-30 - 2022-11-02 (3 months)
AB Seaman: Selasse - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-01-13 - 2022-07-04 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Cielo di New York - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-06-26 - 2021-12-20 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Katelina - Chemical tanker / 2020-11-28 - 2021-05-17 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Iron Destiny - Bulk Carrier / 2021-12-24 - 2023-03-15 (1 year)
Deck Cadet: Patriot - Tug boat / 2019-05-10 - 2019-06-06 (1 month)
Deck Cadet: Udarnik - Tug boat / 2018-09-03 - 2018-11-06 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: Udarnik - Tug boat / 2018-04-20 - 2018-06-26 (2 months)
ETO: IONA - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-09-17 - 2023-03-09 (6 months)
ETO: Navig8 Sirius - Chemical tanker / 2021-09-25 - 2022-04-03 (6 months)
ETO: Canal Street - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-10-15 - 2021-03-27 (5 months)
ETO: Olympia.GR - Bulk Carrier / 2019-04-03 - 2019-10-19 (7 months)
ETO: MSC SUEZ - Container Ship / 2018-04-12 - 2018-10-31 (7 months)
4th Engineer: GHANTOUT - Bulk Carrier / 2022-11-17 - 2023-03-05 (4 months)
El. Eng. Assistant: ALKARAMA - Bulk Carrier / 2022-05-06 - 2022-09-13 (4 months)
4th Engineer: WADI ALYARMOUK - Bulk Carrier / 2021-06-05 - 2021-10-25 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: JEBEL ALI - Container Ship / 2016-01-09 - 2016-08-03 (7 months)
AB Seaman: Rem Fortress - Platform Supply vessel / 2023-01-11 - 2023-03-01 (2 months)
AB Seaman: Rem Fortress - Platform Supply vessel / 2022-10-05 - 2022-11-30 (2 months)
AB Seaman: Rem Fortress - Platform Supply vessel / 2022-06-16 - 2022-08-10 (2 months)
AB Seaman: Rem Fortress - Platform Supply vessel / 2022-03-11 - 2022-04-20 (1 month)
AB Seaman: REM Mistral - Platform Supply vessel / 2019-04-05 - 2019-07-04 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: Valhalla - VLCC / 2022-09-15 - 2023-02-28 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: Knyaz Vladimir - Cruise Liner / 2021-03-05 - 2021-09-23 (7 months)
Master: SIFTERI - General cargo / 2022-09-10 - 2023-02-25 (5 months)
Master: WALKER - General cargo / 2022-03-01 - 2022-09-05 (6 months)
Master: DEFENDER - General cargo / 2021-11-08 - 2022-02-20 (3 months)
Master: OBIRIX - General cargo / 2021-04-01 - 2021-09-16 (5 months)
1st Officer: NAVIN OSPREY - Bulk Carrier / 2020-11-23 - 2021-02-13 (3 months)
OS: Balt Flot 12 - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-11-01 - 2023-02-24 (4 months)
OS: Balt Flot 12 - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-02-19 - 2022-07-30 (5 months)
OS: Balt Flot 4 - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-08-24 - 2021-11-25 (3 months)
OS: Kapitan Barmin - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-04-02 - 2021-07-30 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: Philipp Heylo - Crude Oil Tanker / 2017-04-02 - 2017-10-31 (7 months)
Chief Officer: Siem Aristotle - RO-RO / 2022-10-23 - 2023-02-22 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Leevsten - RO-RO / 2022-03-14 - 2022-07-18 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Leevsten - RO-RO / 2021-10-11 - 2021-12-20 (2 months)
Chief Officer: Leevsten - RO-RO / 2021-04-26 - 2021-08-02 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Liekut - RO-RO / 2021-02-05 - 2021-02-25 (1 month)
Deck Cadet: M/T RAVEN - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-06-18 - 2023-02-09 (8 months)
2nd Officer: ELZA - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-07-28 - 2023-02-03 (6 months)
2nd Officer: OCEAN STELLAR - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-09-01 - 2021-05-01 (8 months)
3rd Officer: OCEAN STELLAR - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-01-23 - 2020-08-31 (7 months)
3rd Officer: OCEAN GOBY - Chemical tanker / 2019-02-23 - 2019-08-02 (5 months)
3rd Officer: OCEAN COSMOS - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-07-12 - 2018-11-12 (4 months)
Chief Electrical Engineer: Windsor Knutsen - Shuttle Tanker / 2022-12-17 - 2023-02-01 (1 month)
Chief Electrical Engineer: Bodil Knutsen - Shuttle Tanker / 2021-11-24 - 2022-07-20 (8 months)
Chief Electrical Engineer: Front Endurance - VLCC / 2011-11-11 - 2012-04-14 (5 months)
Chief Electrical Engineer: Front Eminence - VLCC / 2010-05-18 - 2010-10-29 (5 months)