Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
AB Seaman: Михаил Сомов - Research vessel / 2023-07-04 - 2023-08-18 (1 month)
OS: Гипанис - Passenger vessel / 2023-06-09 - 2023-06-23 (14 days)
Deck Cadet: МБ-1214 - Tug boat / 2022-06-21 - 2022-12-04 (5 months)
Chef de Partie: CELEBRITY SOLSTICE - Passenger vessel / 2022-12-11 - 2023-08-11 (8 months)
2nd Cook: celebrity equinox - Passenger vessel / 2021-12-10 - 2022-09-17 (9 months)
2nd Cook: Celebrity Reflection - Passenger vessel / 2019-11-03 - 2020-06-16 (7 months)
2nd Cook: Celebrity cruises - Passenger vessel / 2018-12-21 - 2019-09-25 (9 months)
Fitter / Welder: Chemtrans Riga - Chemical tanker / 2023-02-10 - 2023-08-10 (6 months)
Fitter / Welder: Athens Star - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-09-01 - 2022-11-23 (3 months)
2nd Officer: SEARAY - Oil Products Tanker / 2023-04-01 - 2023-08-04 (4 months)
2nd Officer: SEAMARLIN - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-09-23 - 2023-01-15 (4 months)
3rd Officer: SCF SURGUT - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-09-07 - 2022-01-17 (4 months)
3rd Officer: SCF SURGUT - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-11-17 - 2021-02-26 (3 months)
3rd Officer: SCF SURGUT - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-12-03 - 2020-06-04 (6 months)
Wiper: Aos victory - Platform Supply vessel / 2022-09-02 - 2023-08-04 (11 months)
Wiper: Aos Neptune - Platform Supply vessel / 2021-11-18 - 2022-08-10 (9 months)
Wiper: Jsw balram - Tug boat / 2021-02-21 - 2021-09-07 (7 months)
Trainee Engineer: Owusu - Ansah - Tug boat / 2023-06-05 - 2023-07-28 (2 months)
2nd Engineer: Nordic Qinngua - Bulk Carrier / 2022-02-10 - 2023-07-23 (1 year)
2nd Engineer: Nordic Qinngua - Bulk Carrier / 2022-10-10 - 2023-02-20 (4 months)
2nd Engineer: Nordic Oshima - Bulk Carrier / 2021-05-02 - 2021-10-20 (6 months)
3rd Engineer: Nordic Odin - Bulk Carrier / 2020-05-20 - 2021-01-04 (7 months)
3rd Engineer: Nordic Odin - Bulk Carrier / 2019-05-18 - 2019-10-17 (5 months)
3rd Officer: MLS AMBER - Bulk Carrier / 2023-04-27 - 2023-07-21 (3 months)
3rd Officer: SHANDONG DING SHENG - Bulk Carrier / 2021-12-27 - 2022-09-01 (8 months)
3rd Officer: Leonidas - Bulk Carrier / 2021-05-18 - 2021-11-14 (6 months)
3rd Officer: Saronic Trader - Bulk Carrier / 2020-08-16 - 2021-01-29 (5 months)
3rd Officer: Lambay - Bulk Carrier / 2019-06-07 - 2019-12-08 (6 months)
3rd Engineer: OMSKIY-206 - General cargo / 2023-03-21 - 2023-07-20 (4 months)
3rd Engineer: OMSKIY-157 - General cargo / 2022-07-22 - 2023-01-19 (6 months)
3rd Engineer: OREL-6 - General cargo / 2022-01-09 - 2022-05-17 (4 months)
3rd Engineer: SORMOVSKIY 71 - General cargo / 2021-10-10 - 2021-12-13 (2 months)
3rd Engineer: DUBREKA - Reefer / 2020-08-16 - 2021-03-05 (7 months)
Fitter / Welder: Hafnia Tanzanite - Chemical tanker / 2022-10-26 - 2023-07-19 (9 months)
Fitter / Welder: Salacgriva - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-07-18 - 2021-11-18 (4 months)
Fitter / Welder: Golden oak - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-09-21 - 2021-02-14 (5 months)
Fitter / Welder: Furuholmen - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-03-03 - 2020-07-23 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: BROADGATE - Bulk Carrier / 2022-12-22 - 2023-07-12 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: OM 106 - Passenger vessel / 2021-06-07 - 2021-07-16 (1 month)
AB Seaman: m/v Allegro - General cargo / 2023-02-23 - 2023-07-10 (5 months)
AB Seaman: m/v "Gala " - General cargo / 2022-06-24 - 2022-11-14 (5 months)
AB Seaman: m/v "Eco Tide" - Bulk Carrier / 2021-11-02 - 2022-03-29 (5 months)
AB Seaman: m/v "Eco Tide" - Bulk Carrier / 2020-12-15 - 2021-07-15 (7 months)
AB Seaman: m/v "Blu Tide" - Bulk Carrier / 2019-08-02 - 2020-07-12 (11 months)
ETO: MS Wonder Of The Seas - Cruise Liner / 2022-12-11 - 2023-07-09 (7 months)
ETO: Bourbon Liberty 206 - AHTS / 2022-04-16 - 2022-08-31 (4 months)
ETO: Bourbon Liberty 206 - AHTS / 2021-10-16 - 2022-03-05 (5 months)
2nd Engineer: Sea Eagle - Yacht / 2023-04-19 - 2023-07-08 (3 months)
2nd Engineer: TSUMAT - Yacht / 2021-03-05 - 2021-10-10 (7 months)
3rd Engineer: Santa Marcela - Ferry / 2020-01-05 - 2021-03-03 (1 year)
Engine Cadet: San Jorge - Ferry / 2018-08-04 - 2019-08-07 (1 year)
3rd Officer: CMA CGM LOIRE - Container Ship / 2023-02-22 - 2023-07-07 (4 months)
3rd Officer: CMA CGM CORTE REAL - Container Ship / 2022-07-29 - 2022-12-03 (4 months)
3rd Officer: ALS Flora - Container Ship / 2022-01-28 - 2022-06-03 (4 months)
3rd Officer: ALS Kronos - Container Ship / 2021-06-04 - 2021-10-16 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Lobivia - Container Ship / 2020-09-04 - 2021-02-27 (6 months)
Motorman: Volgoneft-101 - Oil Products Tanker / 2023-03-03 - 2023-06-27 (4 months)
Motorman: SR-933 - Other vessels / 2022-06-01 - 2022-08-04 (2 months)
Motorman: Vodolaz Denisov - DSV (Diving Support) / 2021-12-15 - 2022-02-16 (2 months)
Chief Officer: Atameken - General cargo / 2023-01-12 - 2023-06-25 (5 months)
Chief Officer: Mekhanik котлов - Dry Cargo / 2022-02-16 - 2022-10-20 (8 months)
Chief Officer: Mekhanik kottsov - Dry Cargo / 2021-02-04 - 2021-10-04 (8 months)
Chief Officer: Plutonas - Reefer / 2020-01-14 - 2020-06-11 (5 months)
2nd Officer: Baltiyskiy-107 - Dry Cargo / 2018-03-17 - 2018-08-21 (5 months)
OS: Sormovskiy-3057 - General cargo / 2023-05-17 - 2023-06-22 (1 month)
OS: Neva-Leader 2 - General cargo / 2022-05-20 - 2022-09-30 (4 months)
OS: Lenaneft 2020 - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-05-13 - 2021-07-28 (2 months)
Trainee OS: Nadezhda - Training Ship / 2019-08-19 - 2019-10-27 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: Ro-Ro/Passenger - Passenger vessel / 2023-03-25 - 2023-06-22 (3 months)
OS: Azam SEALINk 1 - Passenger vessel / 2022-06-15 - 2022-12-30 (6 months)
Wiper: Amisia - Coaster / 2023-02-02 - 2023-06-22 (5 months)
Wiper: Spanaco progress - Coaster / 2022-04-14 - 2022-10-15 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: Simonas Daukantas - Fishing vessel / 2021-03-27 - 2021-08-26 (5 months)