Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Chief Officer: M.v.supreme explorer - DSV (Diving Support) / 2020-06-11 - 2020-09-02 (3 months)
2nd Officer: M.V. ASI M - Bulk Carrier / 2019-07-25 - 2020-01-14 (6 months)
2nd Officer: M.V. Genco Tiger - Bulk Carrier / 2015-12-10 - 2016-08-30 (9 months)
2nd Officer: M.V. BALTIC WOLF - Bulk Carrier / 2014-12-08 - 2015-05-26 (6 months)
2nd Officer: M.V.GENCO CLAUDIUS - Bulk Carrier / 2013-06-05 - 2014-02-27 (9 months)
AB Seaman: Азери Карабах - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-07-24 - 2020-08-24 (1 month)
Deck Cadet: Армада Навигатор - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-04-06 - 2019-08-05 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: MT Bora - Chemical tanker / 2020-02-13 - 2020-08-21 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: MT captain gregory - Chemical tanker / 2018-11-20 - 2019-08-26 (9 months)
Engine Cadet: MT Ashabi - Chemical tanker / 2017-01-09 - 2018-05-16 (1 year)
Deck Cadet: Берингов Пролив - MRSV / 2020-04-24 - 2020-08-20 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: Kalitva/ Калитва - General cargo / 2019-08-19 - 2019-11-26 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: Alexnder Kashchuk - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-06-10 - 2018-08-29 (3 months)
ETO: Molly R McCall - Crew boat / 2020-02-23 - 2020-08-17 (6 months)
ETO: Mac Kestrel - Platform Supply vessel / 2019-09-11 - 2019-11-07 (2 months)
ETO: Fortuna - Pipe laying vessel / 2019-01-18 - 2019-04-03 (3 months)
ETO: Siem Sapphire - AHTS / 2018-10-03 - 2018-11-28 (2 months)
AB Seaman: SCF Grand Aniva - LPG / LNG / 2020-05-18 - 2020-08-16 (3 months)
AB Seaman: SCF Grand Aniva - LPG / LNG / 2019-12-13 - 2020-03-28 (3 months)
AB Seaman: SCF Grand Aniva - LPG / LNG / 2019-01-20 - 2019-07-09 (6 months)
OS: SCF Grand Aniva - LPG / LNG / 2018-05-08 - 2018-10-26 (6 months)
OS: SCF Grand Aniva - LPG / LNG / 2017-05-23 - 2017-10-17 (5 months)
AB Seaman: Pioner - General cargo / 2020-06-07 - 2020-08-09 (2 months)
AB Seaman: Pioner - General cargo / 2019-10-11 - 2020-03-14 (5 months)
AB Seaman: INZHENER TRUBIN - General cargo / 2018-11-30 - 2019-03-22 (4 months)
AB Seaman: MEKHANIK PYATLIN - General cargo / 2018-06-07 - 2018-11-02 (5 months)
3rd Engineer: Narwhal - Tug boat / 2020-04-06 - 2020-08-02 (4 months)
Motorman: Dagestan - Fishing vessel / 2013-03-07 - 2014-01-15 (10 months)
3rd Engineer: Afon Cadnant - Tug boat / 2012-03-06 - 2012-09-23 (7 months)
3rd Engineer: Trans Pacific - Bulk Carrier / 2019-11-18 - 2020-07-29 (8 months)
3rd Engineer: Svyaty Pavlo - General cargo / 2018-10-12 - 2019-05-10 (7 months)
3rd Engineer: Evdokia L - General cargo / 2018-01-11 - 2018-04-12 (3 months)
3rd Engineer: Antje - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2017-09-15 - 2017-12-28 (3 months)
3rd Engineer: Berg - General cargo / 2017-06-04 - 2017-09-04 (3 months)
4th Engineer: M.v. silver Star - Bulk Carrier / 2020-02-26 - 2020-07-29 (5 months)
4th Engineer: M.v. diamond Star - Bulk Carrier / 2018-12-18 - 2019-06-18 (6 months)
4th Engineer: M.v. silver Star - Bulk Carrier / 2017-11-24 - 2018-06-26 (7 months)
Master: Federal Skeena - Bulk Carrier / 2020-03-01 - 2020-07-24 (5 months)
Master: Federal Spruce - Bulk Carrier / 2019-07-27 - 2019-12-07 (4 months)
Master: Glovis Maria - Bulk Carrier / 2018-11-03 - 2019-04-17 (5 months)
Master: Global Prime - Bulk Carrier / 2018-01-12 - 2018-06-16 (5 months)
Master: Glovis Maria - Bulk Carrier / 2017-04-06 - 2017-09-10 (5 months)
Motorman: MV Christine - General cargo / 2019-09-03 - 2020-07-21 (11 months)
Ship Security Officer: Grace 1 - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-11-12 - 2019-04-28 (6 months)
Ship Security Officer: Nobleway - Bulk Carrier / 2018-04-03 - 2018-08-18 (4 months)
Ship Security Officer: SCT Breithorn - Crude Oil Tanker / 2017-04-30 - 2017-12-13 (7 months)
Ship Security Officer: Gaschem Pacific - LPG / LNG / 2016-08-17 - 2017-03-20 (7 months)
Master: Ceylon Breeze - Bulk Carrier / 2019-12-19 - 2020-07-17 (7 months)
2nd Officer: Caspian Harmony - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2019-10-12 - 2020-07-17 (9 months)
2nd Officer: Dolce Vita - Bulk Carrier / 2018-10-22 - 2019-02-20 (4 months)
2nd Officer: Dolce Vita - Bulk Carrier / 2017-12-06 - 2018-06-13 (6 months)
2nd Officer: Dolce Vita - Bulk Carrier / 2016-12-14 - 2017-06-30 (7 months)
2nd Officer: True Love - Bulk Carrier / 2016-03-28 - 2016-08-24 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: CHEMTRANS RIGA - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-11-25 - 2020-07-16 (8 months)
Deck Cadet: Granit - Tug boat / 2018-05-29 - 2018-08-31 (3 months)
2nd Officer: GO SIRIUS - AHTS / 2020-02-14 - 2020-07-11 (5 months)
2nd Officer: HALUL 61 - AHTS / 2019-08-05 - 2019-11-18 (3 months)
2nd Officer: Halul 62 - AHTS / 2019-03-14 - 2019-06-03 (3 months)
2nd Officer: Posh Resolve - AHTS / 2018-09-28 - 2018-12-24 (3 months)
2nd Officer: Island Performer - Construction vessel / 2018-07-04 - 2018-08-27 (2 months)
1st Officer: SABINA A - Cement Carrier / 2019-10-31 - 2020-07-10 (8 months)
2nd Officer: LOBOS TUXPAN - Chemical tanker / 2015-12-07 - 2019-07-20 (3 years)
3rd Officer: Caspian Stream - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-02-25 - 2020-07-10 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Caspian Sprinter - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-06-07 - 2019-10-06 (4 months)
El. Engineer: SCI YAMUNA - Platform Supply vessel / 2019-10-03 - 2020-07-08 (9 months)
El. Engineer: SCI PAWAN - AHTS / 2018-11-08 - 2019-02-28 (4 months)
El. Engineer: SCI NALANDA - Platform Supply vessel / 2018-06-11 - 2018-08-18 (2 months)
El. Engineer: SCI SABARMATI - Platform Supply vessel / 2018-02-02 - 2018-04-06 (2 months)
El. Engineer: MV B.S NEGI - Tug boat / 2017-04-09 - 2017-07-31 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: Volgo-Balt 220 - General cargo / 2019-10-27 - 2020-07-04 (8 months)