Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Motorman: AKHTUBINSK - Dredger / 2021-07-05 - 2021-10-31 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: Nina Malkova - Passenger vessel / 2021-02-18 - 2021-03-25 (1 month)
Engine Cadet: KNYAZ VLADIMIR - Cruise Liner / 2020-02-12 - 2020-08-12 (6 months)
Motorman: POBEDA - Passenger vessel / 2019-04-15 - 2019-06-30 (2 months)
3rd Engineer: Gray whale - Sailing Vessel / 2021-05-01 - 2021-10-30 (6 months)
2nd Engineer: Elonga - Fishing vessel / 2019-09-03 - 2019-11-23 (3 months)
2nd Engineer: Elonga - Fishing vessel / 2019-03-28 - 2019-08-18 (5 months)
2nd Engineer: Elonga - Fishing vessel / 2018-07-22 - 2018-12-21 (5 months)
2nd Engineer: Adexe Primero - Fishing vessel / 2017-09-12 - 2017-12-02 (3 months)
Motorman: Mustai Karim - Cruise Liner / 2021-04-27 - 2021-10-28 (6 months)
Motorman: Pavel Lebedev - General cargo / 2020-05-15 - 2020-08-31 (4 months)
Motorman: Michael Tanich - Passenger vessel / 2019-05-11 - 2019-09-11 (4 months)
Motorman: Anton Chekhov - Passenger vessel / 2021-03-22 - 2021-10-25 (7 months)
Electric Cadet: Hersones - Training Ship / 2020-06-17 - 2020-08-30 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: MT SHANAYE QUEEN - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-12-29 - 2021-10-16 (10 months)
Motorman: VEGA - General cargo / 2021-06-04 - 2021-10-13 (4 months)
Motorman: Hadjibey - Passenger vessel / 2016-04-28 - 2016-06-28 (2 months)
Senior DPO: C Master - Pipe laying vessel / 2021-08-29 - 2021-10-12 (1 month)
Senior DPO: Jascon34 - Pipe laying vessel / 2020-02-20 - 2020-09-25 (7 months)
Senior DPO: Van Gogh - DSV (Diving Support) / 2019-03-20 - 2019-11-06 (8 months)
Senior DPO: Simar Esperança - MRSV / 2014-12-04 - 2019-02-27 (4 years)
2nd Engineer: Baku Star - Dry Cargo / 2021-03-14 - 2021-10-08 (7 months)
3rd Engineer: Baku Star - Dry Cargo / 2020-01-16 - 2020-06-10 (5 months)
3rd Engineer: Baku Star - Dry Cargo / 2019-04-12 - 2019-09-10 (5 months)
3rd Engineer: Baku Star - Dry Cargo / 2017-12-15 - 2018-04-28 (4 months)
AB / Motorman: Baku Star - Dry Cargo / 2017-04-21 - 2017-10-16 (6 months)
2nd Officer: Kyri Bay - Bulk Carrier / 2021-03-12 - 2021-10-07 (7 months)
2nd Officer: Mykonos Bay - Bulk Carrier / 2019-10-18 - 2020-07-29 (9 months)
3rd Officer: Venus Bay - Bulk Carrier / 2017-10-18 - 2018-05-25 (7 months)
3rd Officer: Venus Bay - Bulk Carrier / 2016-10-28 - 2017-04-11 (5 months)
Chief Engineer: Seaways Liberty - VLCC / 2021-07-07 - 2021-10-04 (3 months)
Chief Engineer: Gener8 Chiotis - VLCC / 2021-05-14 - 2021-07-06 (2 months)
Chief Engineer: Seaways Tybee - VLCC / 2020-04-02 - 2020-10-01 (6 months)
Chief Engineer: Gener8 Strength - VLCC / 2020-02-07 - 2020-04-01 (2 months)
Chief Engineer: Seaways Hatteras - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-05-29 - 2019-10-03 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: Em splendour - VLCC / 2020-10-21 - 2021-10-04 (11 months)
OS: EKMEN TRANS - General cargo / 2021-01-20 - 2021-10-03 (8 months)
OS: MURHAN DIZMAN - General cargo / 2020-03-08 - 2020-10-28 (8 months)
Master: Flagship Violet - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-06-12 - 2021-10-03 (4 months)
Master: Flagship Ivy - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-11-05 - 2020-07-23 (9 months)
Master: Flagship Ivy - Chemical tanker / 2018-12-13 - 2019-05-10 (5 months)
Master: Flagship Ivy - Chemical tanker / 2018-04-13 - 2018-08-08 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Emerald Shiner - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-04-12 - 2017-09-08 (5 months)
2nd Engineer: Cielo di Ulsan - Chemical tanker / 2021-06-01 - 2021-09-26 (4 months)
2nd Engineer: NCC Safa - Chemical tanker / 2020-05-29 - 2020-11-12 (5 months)
2nd Engineer: NCC Haiel - Chemical tanker / 2019-09-09 - 2019-12-10 (3 months)
2nd Engineer: NCC Sama - Chemical tanker / 2018-11-03 - 2019-03-03 (4 months)
2nd Engineer: CPO Larisa Hestia - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-05-22 - 2018-07-30 (2 months)
Motorman: Dorado Plus - General cargo / 2021-03-03 - 2021-09-21 (7 months)
Motorman: Sea Trader - General cargo / 2020-07-07 - 2020-12-24 (6 months)
Motorman: LEDA - General cargo / 2019-06-30 - 2019-12-21 (6 months)
Motorman: LEDA - General cargo / 2018-09-24 - 2019-05-24 (8 months)
Oiler: Pacific Future - General cargo / 2016-10-20 - 2017-03-25 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: ZIM VIRGINIA - Container Ship / 2020-11-29 - 2021-09-21 (10 months)
Engine Cadet: MSC JOY - Container Ship / 2018-03-07 - 2018-04-20 (1 month)
Deck Cadet: ALBY LIBERTY - Bulk Carrier / 2021-04-05 - 2021-09-20 (5 months)
Chief Engineer: GLOVIS CLIPPER - RO-RO / 2021-07-17 - 2021-09-17 (2 months)
Chief Engineer: GLOVIS CLIPPER - RO-RO / 2020-08-18 - 2021-03-27 (7 months)
Chief Engineer: HARMONY LEADER - RO-RO / 2019-07-04 - 2019-11-15 (4 months)
Chief Engineer: HARMONY LEADER - RO-RO / 2018-10-11 - 2019-03-04 (5 months)
Chief Engineer: HARMONY LEADER - RO-RO / 2017-11-14 - 2018-05-19 (6 months)
Electrician: Pilot Whale - Fishing vessel / 2021-04-18 - 2021-09-12 (5 months)
Electrician: Pilot whale - Fishing vessel / 2020-06-25 - 2020-12-04 (5 months)
Chief Engineer: Smeraldo - Chemical tanker / 2021-06-06 - 2021-09-09 (3 months)
Chief Engineer: Smeraldo - Chemical tanker / 2020-10-12 - 2021-01-14 (3 months)
Chief Engineer: granato - Chemical tanker / 2020-08-05 - 2020-09-09 (1 month)
Chief Engineer: turchese - Chemical tanker / 2020-02-21 - 2020-06-10 (4 months)
Chief Engineer: turchese - Chemical tanker / 2019-08-28 - 2019-11-16 (3 months)