Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Stewardess: Vestland Cygnus - Seismic vessel / 2021-11-11 - 2022-05-09 (6 months)
Stewardess: Vestland Cygnus - Seismic vessel / 2017-05-07 - 2021-05-11 (4 years)
Stewardess: Ocean Europe - Seismic vessel / 2016-12-16 - 2017-03-03 (2 months)
Stewardess: Bergen Surveyour - Seismic vessel / 2014-04-01 - 2015-08-01 (1 year)
Engine Cadet: Meteor - Bulk Carrier / 2021-12-05 - 2022-05-07 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: Sider Amy - Bulk Carrier / 2020-05-16 - 2020-12-15 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: MV Arimbi Baruna - Bulk Carrier / 2021-04-26 - 2022-04-26 (1 year)
2nd Officer: RIVER TRADER - General cargo / 2021-12-31 - 2022-04-25 (4 months)
2nd Officer: ALEVTIN SHEKOVNIKOV - General cargo / 2021-03-11 - 2021-07-16 (4 months)
2nd Officer: BAYKAL - General cargo / 2020-06-10 - 2020-10-26 (5 months)
2nd Officer: BEREZOVETS - General cargo / 2019-06-12 - 2019-10-08 (4 months)
OS: Midvolga-2 - Chemical tanker / 2021-10-19 - 2022-04-24 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Торопливый - Tug boat / 2021-02-08 - 2021-04-08 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: Торопливый - Tug boat / 2020-10-26 - 2020-12-24 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: Khersones - Sailing Vessel / 2019-08-01 - 2019-10-01 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: Morskaya - Dredger / 2021-10-18 - 2022-04-20 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: Adis - Pilot boat / 2020-01-20 - 2020-07-24 (6 months)
Master: ATLANTIC OCEAN - Bulk Carrier / 2022-01-22 - 2022-04-19 (3 months)
Master: BIC CLARE - Bulk Carrier / 2010-10-01 - 2011-06-13 (8 months)
OS: MT Desh samman - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-07-03 - 2022-04-16 (9 months)
OS: New levant - Bulk Carrier / 2019-04-01 - 2020-01-07 (9 months)
OS: Frebrikshamn - Fishing vessel / 2022-01-12 - 2022-04-13 (3 months)
OS: Piotr - Fishing vessel / 2020-11-25 - 2021-01-14 (2 months)
Oiler: POSEIDON EXPRESS - RO-RO / 2022-01-20 - 2022-04-12 (3 months)
Oiler: GUBAL TRADER - RO-RO / 2021-11-14 - 2022-01-17 (2 months)
Oiler: POSEIDON EXPRESS - RO-RO / 2021-05-12 - 2021-09-04 (4 months)
Trainee Engineer: FRONT CLIPPER - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-10-06 - 2022-04-09 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: FRONT CLASSIC - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-06-27 - 2020-12-03 (5 months)
AB / Welder: Rodion Oslyabya - General cargo / 2022-02-08 - 2022-04-08 (2 months)
AB / Welder: Vinogradnoye - Fishing vessel / 2021-11-20 - 2022-01-28 (2 months)
AB / Welder: Galan - General cargo / 2021-09-20 - 2021-10-30 (1 month)
Second Cook: Akademic Cherskiy - Pipe laying vessel / 2021-04-16 - 2021-08-16 (4 months)
Welder: Van Gogh - General cargo / 2021-02-07 - 2021-04-07 (2 months)
Chief Officer: KUMUL - LPG / LNG / 2022-01-19 - 2022-04-06 (3 months)
Chief Officer: SOUTHERN CROSS - LPG / LNG / 2021-07-07 - 2021-10-12 (3 months)
Chief Officer: KUMUL - LPG / LNG / 2020-10-18 - 2021-02-10 (4 months)
Chief Officer: POINT FORTIN - LPG / LNG / 2020-02-06 - 2020-03-24 (2 months)
Chief Officer: DUKHAN - LPG / LNG / 2019-10-22 - 2019-11-12 (1 month)
Chief Engineer: Ocean Spirit - Chemical tanker / 2021-11-18 - 2022-04-01 (4 months)
Chief Engineer: Ocean Spirit - Chemical tanker / 2021-01-24 - 2021-07-15 (6 months)
Chief Engineer: Ocean Spirit - Chemical tanker / 2020-03-11 - 2020-10-19 (7 months)
Chief Engineer: Ocean Spirit - Chemical tanker / 2019-05-25 - 2019-10-14 (5 months)
2nd Engineer: Oceon spirit - Chemical tanker / 2018-01-16 - 2018-06-08 (5 months)
3rd Engineer: Ct Rotterdam - Container Ship / 2021-10-04 - 2022-03-25 (6 months)
Motorman: Elbsailor - Container Ship / 2020-11-23 - 2021-06-13 (7 months)
Motorman: Maris - Container Ship / 2019-11-29 - 2020-07-21 (8 months)
Motorman-welder: Elbcarrier - Container Ship / 2018-11-30 - 2019-07-07 (7 months)
Wiper: Elbcarrier - Container Ship / 2018-01-26 - 2018-07-07 (5 months)
AB Seaman: SUNPOWER - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-09-24 - 2022-03-23 (6 months)
AB Seaman: SUNPOWER - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-09-21 - 2021-03-13 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Vemaoil XXV - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-02-10 - 2019-11-20 (9 months)
Deck Cadet: Vemaoil XXIII - Chemical tanker / 2017-07-25 - 2017-10-25 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: Socar (Ex.Boa Master) - Tug boat / 2016-06-05 - 2016-08-25 (3 months)
Motorman: Gardenia Seaways - RO-RO / 2022-01-14 - 2022-03-21 (2 months)
Motorman: FFS ATLAS - Tug boat / 2021-10-10 - 2022-01-10 (3 months)
Motorman: Helen Mary - Fishing vessel / 2021-04-03 - 2021-07-16 (3 months)
Motorman: Shearwater - Dredger / 2021-02-04 - 2021-03-19 (1 month)
Motorman: Helen Mary - Fishing vessel / 2020-09-09 - 2020-12-06 (3 months)
AB Seaman: Gefest - Fishing vessel / 2022-02-15 - 2022-03-15 (1 month)
AB Seaman: Кристалл - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-09-30 - 2021-12-02 (2 months)
AB Seaman: Geroyi Sheronentsy - Fishing vessel / 2020-06-06 - 2021-05-06 (11 months)
Deck Cadet: NADEZHDA - Training Ship / 2014-01-20 - 2014-06-02 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: Vladimir Babich - Fishing vessel / 2013-04-12 - 2013-09-05 (5 months)
Electrician: Hizir - General cargo / 2021-10-04 - 2022-03-10 (5 months)
Electrician: gemma gane - Fishing vessel / 2020-08-01 - 2020-09-15 (1 month)
El. Engineer: Сормовский 29 - General cargo / 2019-11-07 - 2020-05-24 (7 months)
Electrician: AGNES - General cargo / 2018-10-02 - 2019-04-24 (7 months)
Electric Cadet: Лиман - Lash / Barge carrier / 2016-07-10 - 2017-12-27 (1 year)
Chief Officer: Normand Sitella - Platform Supply vessel / 2022-01-12 - 2022-03-05 (2 months)
Chief Officer: Normand Sitella - Platform Supply vessel / 2021-06-25 - 2021-10-20 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Normand Sitella - Platform Supply vessel / 2021-03-11 - 2021-05-20 (2 months)
Chief Officer: Sea Spear - Platform Supply vessel / 2020-10-15 - 2020-12-15 (2 months)
Chief Officer: Normand Titus - Platform Supply vessel / 2020-02-27 - 2020-05-04 (2 months)