Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Junior officer: Colombian Star - Reefer / 2023-09-19 - 2024-02-07 (5 months)
Junior officer: Colombian Star - Reefer / 2023-01-19 - 2023-05-04 (3 months)
OS: Colombian Star - Reefer / 2022-11-22 - 2023-01-18 (2 months)
OS: Amethyst - Bulk Carrier / 2021-11-28 - 2022-05-25 (6 months)
OS: Lake Ontario - Bulk Carrier / 2021-01-19 - 2021-05-16 (4 months)
AB Seaman: Nordic Luna - Crude Oil Tanker / 2023-12-07 - 2024-06-19 (6 months)
AB Seaman: FLAGSHIP ORCHID - Oil Products Tanker / 2023-04-14 - 2023-10-03 (6 months)
OS: FLAGSHIP ORCHID - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-08-13 - 2023-01-14 (5 months)
OS: FSL Hong Kong - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-11-19 - 2022-06-17 (7 months)
OS: ПОРТ ОЛЯ - Floating Hotel / 2020-03-16 - 2022-12-27 (2 years)
OS: Сормовский 3063 - General cargo / 2019-11-09 - 2019-12-27 (2 months)
OS: ULAN-UDE - General cargo / 2019-01-28 - 2019-07-03 (5 months)
OS: Сормовский 32 - General cargo / 2017-12-19 - 2018-02-20 (2 months)
OS: Буми Нарьян Мар - Mining Vessel / 2016-06-08 - 2016-08-17 (2 months)
OS: Leonid Khotkin - General cargo / 2022-11-07 - 2022-12-26 (2 months)
OS: M/v Apache - General cargo / 2022-01-25 - 2022-08-20 (7 months)
OS: Mohican - Bulk Carrier / 2021-07-07 - 2021-11-20 (4 months)
OS: M/v Apache - General cargo / 2021-02-01 - 2021-04-24 (3 months)
OS: M/v Rainbow - General cargo / 2020-02-03 - 2020-08-07 (6 months)
2nd Officer: Pola Harita - General cargo / 2024-02-22 - 2024-06-28 (4 months)
2nd Officer: Pola Anastasia - General cargo / 2023-04-03 - 2023-08-05 (4 months)
OS: Pola Agata - General cargo / 2022-08-01 - 2022-12-03 (4 months)
OS: Pola Anastasia - General cargo / 2021-04-28 - 2021-08-27 (4 months)
OS: Pola Agata - General cargo / 2020-07-20 - 2020-10-25 (3 months)
3rd Officer: AL MAHBOOBAH - Chemical tanker / 2023-06-27 - 2023-11-10 (4 months)
OS: CARPE DIEM II - Chemical tanker / 2022-08-07 - 2022-11-08 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: OCEAN WINTER - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-02-05 - 2021-09-26 (8 months)
Deck Cadet: CADET - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-01-10 - 2018-07-10 (6 months)
AB Seaman: MARLIN - Oil Products Tanker / 2023-05-21 - 2023-12-11 (7 months)
OS: BALTIC PROSPERITY - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-03-30 - 2022-10-29 (7 months)
OS: ’Kapitan Pashnin - General cargo / 2021-05-17 - 2021-11-13 (6 months)
OS: Minka C - General cargo / 2022-03-24 - 2022-10-25 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: Karla C - General cargo / 2020-08-26 - 2021-01-26 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: Kelly C - General cargo / 2019-05-27 - 2019-11-14 (6 months)
OS: Gaschem Atlantic - LPG / LNG / 2022-06-12 - 2022-10-19 (4 months)
OS: Gaschem Antarctic - LPG / LNG / 2021-08-27 - 2022-04-13 (8 months)
OS: Asclepius LNG - LPG / LNG / 2020-12-16 - 2021-05-18 (5 months)
OS: NileDutch Lion - Container Ship / 2020-01-23 - 2020-09-20 (8 months)
Deck Cadet: CMA CGM Samson - Container Ship / 2019-04-16 - 2019-10-11 (6 months)
3rd Officer: Борис Сыромятников - Fishing vessel / 2023-05-03 - 2023-11-21 (7 months)
AB Seaman: F/V "ESTER" - Fishing vessel / 2022-10-09 - 2023-01-21 (3 months)
OS: MV KURSHSKAYA KOSA - Fishing vessel / 2022-08-26 - 2022-10-08 (1 month)
Deck Cadet: SVEABORG - Fishing vessel / 2021-06-03 - 2022-01-10 (7 months)
2nd Officer: Nefterudovoz-51M - OBO / 2023-07-09 - 2024-01-11 (6 months)
OS: Lavrion - General cargo / 2022-05-20 - 2022-09-08 (4 months)
OS: Penelope - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-03-03 - 2021-07-06 (4 months)
OS: Kniaz Vladimir - Passenger vessel / 2020-07-23 - 2020-08-21 (1 month)
OS: Climene - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-04-14 - 2019-08-18 (4 months)
AB Seaman: WIDE HOTEL - Container Ship / 2023-10-27 - 2024-06-15 (8 months)
OS: EXPRESS FRANCE - Container Ship / 2021-09-15 - 2022-09-04 (12 months)
OS: GENOA - Container Ship / 2020-08-30 - 2021-03-21 (7 months)
OS: ZOGRAFIA - Bulk Carrier / 2021-11-24 - 2022-08-20 (9 months)
Deck Cadet: DUNAY - Dredger / 2020-09-09 - 2021-03-24 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: DUNAY - Dredger / 2020-05-25 - 2020-09-06 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: KENTAVR - Tug boat / 2019-06-03 - 2019-08-12 (2 months)
OS: Marlin Shikoku - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-02-23 - 2022-08-07 (5 months)
OS: Lithuania - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-06-04 - 2021-12-21 (7 months)
OS: Davis Sea - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-04-03 - 2020-11-03 (7 months)
OS: "Севастополь" - Passenger vessel / 2017-08-23 - 2017-10-23 (2 months)
OS: Marshal Vasilevskiy - LPG / LNG / 2022-03-15 - 2022-08-02 (5 months)
OS: Marshal Vasilevskiy - LPG / LNG / 2021-07-30 - 2021-11-14 (3 months)
OS: Marshal Vasilevskiy - LPG / LNG / 2020-11-25 - 2021-05-01 (5 months)
OS: MSC Shannon - Container Ship / 2018-05-09 - 2018-10-04 (5 months)
OS: LENINGRADSKIY 1 - Dredger / 2016-09-01 - 2016-11-24 (3 months)
2nd Officer: Supernova B - Bulk Carrier / 2023-12-26 - 2024-01-11 (1 month)
3rd Officer: Supernova B - Bulk Carrier / 2023-06-30 - 2023-12-25 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Supernova B - Bulk Carrier / 2022-11-14 - 2023-04-06 (5 months)
OS: Jasmina D - Bulk Carrier / 2022-06-25 - 2022-08-02 (1 month)
OS: Luca - General cargo / 2022-02-20 - 2022-03-13 (1 month)
OS: Clipper Hong Kong - Bulk Carrier / 2022-02-23 - 2022-07-23 (5 months)
OS: Clipper Talent - Bulk Carrier / 2021-01-07 - 2021-06-24 (6 months)
OS: Clipper Kalavryta - Bulk Carrier / 2019-11-06 - 2020-07-25 (9 months)
OS: Clipper Lis - Bulk Carrier / 2019-02-07 - 2019-07-07 (5 months)
Cook: Clipper Tarpon - Bulk Carrier / 2018-09-26 - 2018-11-24 (2 months)
3rd Officer: Ursa major - General cargo / 2023-08-01 - 2024-01-26 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Sparta 2 - Heavy lift vessel / 2022-09-03 - 2023-05-01 (8 months)
OS: Sparta 2 - Heavy lift vessel / 2022-01-10 - 2022-06-30 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Sparta - RO-RO / 2021-08-19 - 2021-12-19 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: Kapitan Reutov - Other vessels / 2018-06-03 - 2018-11-05 (5 months)
OS: w kyrenia - Container Ship / 2021-08-09 - 2022-05-28 (10 months)
OS: kavo alkyon - Bulk Carrier / 2020-09-08 - 2021-06-06 (9 months)
AB Seaman: aifanorious - Bulk Carrier / 2019-08-19 - 2020-06-20 (10 months)
OS: Mt respect - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-09-05 - 2019-08-08 (11 months)
2nd Officer: BLUE NOTE - General cargo / 2024-02-26 - 2024-06-28 (4 months)
2nd Officer: TOPAZ ISHIM - General cargo / 2023-05-29 - 2023-09-28 (4 months)
2nd Officer: TOPAZ ISHIM - General cargo / 2022-10-14 - 2023-03-06 (5 months)
OS: NS BORA - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-10-28 - 2022-05-23 (7 months)
3rd Officer: Dmitry Pokrovsky - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-08-18 - 2021-01-30 (5 months)