Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
AB Seaman: Emre Kose - General cargo / 2019-01-15 - 2019-08-02 (7 months)
OS: Mandarin - Bulk Carrier / 2018-07-10 - 2018-09-14 (2 months)
OS: Vega - General cargo / 2017-08-22 - 2018-03-30 (7 months)
OS: Cerencan - General cargo / 2017-02-15 - 2017-08-08 (6 months)
AB Seaman: First Brother - Bulk Carrier / 2021-11-18 - 2022-08-05 (9 months)
AB Seaman: First Brother - Bulk Carrier / 2020-12-11 - 2021-05-28 (6 months)
AB Seaman: First Brother - Bulk Carrier / 2019-06-30 - 2020-07-16 (1 year)
AB Seaman: First Brother - Bulk Carrier / 2018-08-11 - 2019-02-11 (6 months)
OS: First Brother - Bulk Carrier / 2018-04-20 - 2018-08-10 (4 months)
AB Seaman: Grumant - Bunkering Vessel / 2019-11-18 - 2024-01-04 (4 years)
OS: STI HACKNEY - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-02-07 - 2018-08-09 (6 months)
OS: MESDAR - Crude Oil Tanker / 2017-07-16 - 2017-11-19 (4 months)
OS: Sichem Amethyst - Chemical tanker / 2016-11-02 - 2017-01-06 (2 months)
OS: Ernst Hagedorn - General cargo / 2015-10-02 - 2015-12-30 (3 months)
2nd Officer: Pacific Fortitude - General cargo / 2022-09-14 - 2022-11-08 (2 months)
3rd Officer: Pacific Fortitude - General cargo / 2022-02-22 - 2022-09-13 (7 months)
3rd Officer: UHL FOCUS - General cargo / 2020-06-22 - 2021-03-12 (9 months)
3rd Officer: THESEUS - Coaster / 2019-03-11 - 2019-09-10 (6 months)
OS: BBC FLORIDA - General cargo / 2018-01-20 - 2018-07-19 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Nordic Vega - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-10-02 - 2019-11-12 (1 month)
Painter: Ugo Ocha - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-11-30 - 2019-07-14 (7 months)
OS: CHESHIRE - Bulk Carrier / 2018-01-02 - 2018-04-19 (4 months)
AB Seaman: JILDA - General cargo / 2017-05-29 - 2017-10-14 (4 months)
AB Seaman: NIKA FORTUNE - General cargo / 2016-07-26 - 2017-01-28 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Dakota - Bulk Carrier / 2021-05-30 - 2021-12-13 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Izmail - General cargo / 2020-05-23 - 2021-01-07 (7 months)
AB Seaman: MED SURVEY - Research vessel / 2019-03-21 - 2019-09-13 (6 months)
AB Seaman: VICTORIA I - Bulk Carrier / 2018-04-26 - 2018-08-25 (4 months)
OS: POLESTAR - Bulk Carrier / 2017-04-01 - 2018-02-12 (10 months)
3rd Officer: CHAMPLAIN - LPG / LNG / 2021-06-07 - 2021-07-27 (2 months)
3rd Officer: POINTIS - LPG / LNG / 2020-08-15 - 2020-12-20 (4 months)
3rd Officer: ORCA M - LPG / LNG / 2019-03-10 - 2019-07-07 (4 months)
AB Seaman: ORCA M - LPG / LNG / 2019-02-05 - 2019-03-09 (1 month)
OS: CAMDEN - Chemical tanker / 2017-03-07 - 2017-10-22 (7 months)
AB Seaman: SPOB KELLY BAID - Bunkering Vessel / 2020-02-22 - 2021-04-09 (1 year)
AB Seaman: LCT. MERANTI 09 - Landing Craft / 2019-02-20 - 2020-02-21 (1 year)
OS: MT. AKRA 20 - Oil Products Tanker / 2016-09-30 - 2017-04-23 (7 months)
OS: MT. LINTAS IX - Oil Products Tanker / 2015-02-20 - 2016-09-18 (1 year)
AB / Welder: m/v Sepano - General cargo / 2018-01-05 - 2018-10-25 (10 months)
OS: m/v Daisy - General cargo / 2016-12-11 - 2017-04-17 (4 months)
OS: m/v Usl - Container Ship / 2016-05-11 - 2016-09-20 (4 months)
OS: m/v Vela - Bulk Carrier / 2015-09-09 - 2016-02-14 (5 months)
3rd Officer: M/V Mercury - Container Ship / 2019-08-07 - 2020-01-11 (5 months)
3rd Officer: m/v Majd - Container Ship / 2018-11-07 - 2019-06-06 (7 months)
AB Seaman: m/v Max Limit - Container Ship / 2017-08-22 - 2018-04-21 (8 months)
OS: m/v Max Venture - Container Ship / 2016-06-21 - 2017-03-20 (9 months)
OS: m/v Carolina Star - Container Ship / 2014-11-14 - 2015-08-09 (9 months)
AB Seaman: Jascon39 - AHTS / 2018-07-21 - 2018-08-27 (1 month)
AB Seaman: Banda Sea - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-03-05 - 2018-07-14 (4 months)
AB Seaman: Sulu Sea - Crude Oil Tanker / 2016-11-25 - 2017-07-25 (8 months)
OS: Andaman Sea - Crude Oil Tanker / 2016-01-26 - 2016-10-13 (9 months)
AB Seaman: BODRUM - Crude Oil Tanker / 2015-06-13 - 2015-12-08 (6 months)
3rd Officer: JPO VULPECULA - Container Ship / 2018-09-28 - 2019-01-20 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: JPO ATAIR - Container Ship / 2017-12-13 - 2018-04-12 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: JPO GEMIINI - Container Ship / 2017-03-24 - 2017-09-18 (6 months)
OS: JPO AQUARIUS - Container Ship / 2016-03-19 - 2016-09-22 (6 months)
OS: JPO GEMINI - Container Ship / 2014-06-09 - 2014-12-11 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Crest Argus 1 - Platform Supply vessel / 2020-05-19 - 2020-09-10 (4 months)
AB Seaman: Crest Amethyst - AHTS / 2020-01-15 - 2020-05-18 (4 months)
AB Seaman: L.T.W. Express - General cargo / 2016-05-19 - 2016-10-05 (5 months)
OS: Excel - Jack-up Platform / 2015-04-10 - 2015-11-17 (7 months)
AB Seaman: MV Shalom 1 - Standby-safety vessel / 2013-01-10 - 2013-07-26 (7 months)
3rd Officer: Aysan - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2017-05-02 - 2017-10-15 (5 months)
3rd Officer: Karewood Brave - General cargo / 2016-10-03 - 2017-03-18 (5 months)
2nd Officer: Dmytro Kotiuzhenko - General cargo / 2016-06-21 - 2016-10-04 (3 months)
OS: Ivan Sergiyenko - Dry Cargo / 2015-06-09 - 2015-09-02 (3 months)
3rd Officer: Nestos Reefer - Reefer / 2017-04-01 - 2017-10-17 (7 months)
OS: Punto Rosso - Reefer / 2014-11-26 - 2015-07-02 (7 months)
OS: Punto Rosso - Reefer / 2013-07-05 - 2014-03-27 (9 months)
Deck Cadet: Azov - Reefer / 2010-05-01 - 2010-08-03 (3 months)
AB Seaman: Ngol Chiloanga - LPG / LNG / 2018-06-15 - 2019-02-28 (8 months)
AB Seaman: Palchem 1 - Chemical tanker / 2016-11-01 - 2017-05-07 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Palchem 1 - Chemical tanker / 2015-12-19 - 2016-04-30 (4 months)
OS: Borchali - Chemical tanker / 2014-11-25 - 2015-04-03 (4 months)
Mess Boy: Shusha - Chemical tanker / 2013-10-18 - 2014-05-28 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: Industrial Strength - Heavy lift vessel / 2020-01-15 - 2020-07-16 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Louise Borchard - Container Ship / 2018-01-31 - 2018-08-14 (6 months)
3rd Officer: ORAKAI - Chemical tanker / 2015-10-01 - 2016-03-04 (5 months)
OS: Alora - Chemical tanker / 2014-10-05 - 2015-02-05 (4 months)
OS: Alora - Chemical tanker / 2013-11-10 - 2014-03-13 (4 months)
AB Seaman: Pauline - RO-RO / 2021-03-19 - 2021-06-27 (3 months)
AB Seaman: Kaunas - RO-RO / 2020-10-30 - 2021-02-03 (3 months)
OS: BBC Adriatic - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2014-07-01 - 2015-01-17 (7 months)
OS: Barbarossa - General cargo / 2013-10-01 - 2014-03-17 (6 months)
OS: Achilles - Crude Oil Tanker / 2010-03-07 - 2010-08-21 (5 months)
Messman: MT MARIDAKI - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-10-06 - 2022-05-17 (7 months)
Messman: MV MOONDANCE 2 - Bulk Carrier / 2019-11-25 - 2020-08-21 (9 months)
Messman: MV E TRANSPORTER - Bulk Carrier / 2017-06-30 - 2018-03-22 (9 months)
Messman: MV SBI PERSEUS - Bulk Carrier / 2016-02-04 - 2016-11-12 (9 months)
OS: MV NAGATO REEFER - Reefer / 2013-10-25 - 2014-09-07 (10 months)
AB Seaman: VITORIA S - General cargo / 2019-02-19 - 2019-08-06 (6 months)
AB Seaman: VITORIA S - General cargo / 2018-03-03 - 2018-12-11 (9 months)
AB Seaman: Trani - General cargo / 2015-05-01 - 2015-07-01 (2 months)
OS: BALTIMAR ZEPHYR - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2013-12-03 - 2014-08-06 (8 months)
AB Seaman: Saint George - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2012-12-02 - 2013-06-30 (7 months)