Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Motorman: Aleksandr Ksenofontov - Fishing vessel / 2018-04-19 - 2018-05-12 (1 month)
Motorman: Kruzenstern - Training Ship / 2017-04-06 - 2017-06-06 (2 months)
Motorman: ALYOSHA POPOVICH - General cargo / 2017-10-31 - 2018-04-19 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: VOLGO BALT 242 - Dry Cargo / 2016-09-19 - 2017-02-22 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: Dmitry donskoy - Dry Cargo / 2016-03-22 - 2016-06-16 (3 months)
Motorman: Mt asphalt princess - Crude Oil Tanker / 2017-05-21 - 2018-03-09 (10 months)
Motorman: Mt Najdiah - Oil Products Tanker / 2016-09-14 - 2017-03-20 (6 months)
Wiper : Mt King Rich - Chemical tanker / 2014-11-21 - 2015-09-05 (9 months)
Motorman: Volga-4011 - General cargo / 2017-12-04 - 2018-03-04 (3 months)
Motorman: Professor Khljustin - General cargo / 2016-03-29 - 2016-05-29 (2 months)
Motorman: m/v "Tatarbunary" - General cargo / 2017-10-20 - 2017-12-15 (2 months)
Motorman: Fanku - General cargo / 2017-03-25 - 2017-10-30 (7 months)
Motorman: EFA - General cargo / 2015-08-12 - 2016-07-11 (11 months)
Motorman: NIKITA BESPALYY - Tug boat / 2016-08-18 - 2017-09-09 (1 year)
Motorman: Scf Alpine - Crude Oil Tanker / 2017-02-23 - 2017-08-27 (6 months)
Motorman: Scf Pacifica - Crude Oil Tanker / 2016-02-11 - 2016-09-12 (7 months)
Motorman: Scf Pacifica - Crude Oil Tanker / 2016-02-11 - 2016-09-12 (7 months)
Motorman-electrician: РК"КОНКВЕСТ" п.Усть-Дунайськ - Bulk Carrier / 2017-02-16 - 2017-04-28 (2 months)
Motorman: Brigadir - Tug boat / 2016-09-02 - 2016-11-03 (2 months)
3rd Engineer: Slavyanka - Dry Cargo / 2019-04-30 - 2019-07-09 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: Clipper Talent - Bulk Carrier / 2018-07-16 - 2018-12-20 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: Clipper Tenacious - Bulk Carrier / 2017-11-29 - 2018-04-25 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: Clipper Lasco - Bulk Carrier / 2017-02-02 - 2017-06-26 (5 months)
Motorman: SGV Flot - Bulk Carrier / 2016-03-01 - 2016-10-31 (8 months)
Motorman: Kuyalnitskaye - Dry Cargo / 2014-09-08 - 2015-08-10 (11 months)
3rd Engineer: Artabaz - Container Ship / 2016-09-09 - 2017-02-22 (5 months)
4th Engineer: artavaz - Bulk Carrier / 2016-02-08 - 2016-08-11 (6 months)
Motorman: Crested Eagle - Bulk Carrier / 2015-01-15 - 2015-08-04 (7 months)
4th Engineer: Amanda - Bulk Carrier / 2014-07-28 - 2015-02-04 (6 months)
4th Engineer: Alpena - Bulk Carrier / 2013-09-13 - 2014-05-08 (8 months)
Motorman: Iron Kovdor - Bulk Carrier / 2012-08-13 - 2013-03-01 (7 months)
Motorman: Arnica - Bulk Carrier / 2011-10-15 - 2012-04-22 (6 months)
Motorman: Astana - Bulk Carrier / 2011-03-20 - 2011-08-04 (4 months)
Motorman: Atlas - Container Ship / 2011-08-28 - 2013-01-14 (1 year)
3rd Engineer: m/v `Veles` - Dry Cargo / 2009-10-24 - 2010-04-23 (6 months)
Motorman: m/v `Kamari` - Bulk Carrier / 2008-10-16 - 2009-05-13 (7 months)
Motorman: `Danapris 2` - Dry Cargo / 2007-08-25 - 2008-02-28 (6 months)
Wiper: ZULU - Oil Products Tanker / 2023-05-09 - 2024-10-22 (1 year)
Motorman: NVL Sirius - Bulk Carrier / 2023-09-12 - 2024-03-23 (6 months)
Wiper: Lyuda - Bulk Carrier / 2022-12-13 - 2023-05-24 (5 months)
Motorman: Koubia - Fishing vessel / 2021-08-12 - 2022-01-12 (5 months)
Wiper: M/V ROZIE 7 - General cargo / 2022-09-01 - 2023-07-25 (11 months)
Engine Cadet: Trustee - Heavy lift vessel / 2023-02-06 - 2023-05-22 (4 months)