Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
AB / Motorman: Joseph Schulte - Container Ship / 2023-06-28 - 2023-10-02 (3 months)
AB / Motorman: Christina Selmer - Bulk Carrier / 2021-09-04 - 2022-06-10 (9 months)
AB / Motorman: Thomas Selmer - Bulk Carrier / 2020-07-28 - 2021-01-27 (6 months)
Motorman: Clipper Apollonia - Bulk Carrier / 2023-06-24 - 2023-09-14 (3 months)
Motorman: Clipper Nassau - Bulk Carrier / 2022-06-25 - 2022-12-25 (6 months)
Motorman: Inzhener Plavinskiv - General cargo / 2020-07-30 - 2020-10-10 (2 months)
Motorman: Mekhanik Pustoshnyy - General cargo / 2020-07-17 - 2020-07-28 (11 days)
Motorman: Dikson - Icebreaker / 2019-05-28 - 2019-09-30 (4 months)
Motorman: Raven - Crude Oil Tanker / 2023-03-14 - 2023-08-08 (5 months)
Motorman: Ares - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-04-17 - 2022-10-23 (6 months)
Motorman: Kil-498 - Crane vessel / 2020-12-01 - 2023-07-13 (2 years)
Motorman: solidarity - Fishing vessel / 2023-01-07 - 2023-05-06 (4 months)
Motorman: AVRORA POLARIS - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-12-26 - 2023-04-10 (3 months)
Motorman: Волгонефть-237 - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-08-25 - 2022-12-09 (3 months)
Engine Cadet: Омский-118 - Dry Cargo / 2021-07-15 - 2022-01-26 (6 months)
Motorman: BORIS SYROMYATNIKOV - Fishing vessel / 2022-06-17 - 2022-11-17 (5 months)
Motorman: M/v TIKSI - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-05-05 - 2022-11-06 (6 months)
Motorman: Aleksey Kartashov - Tug boat / 2019-04-16 - 2019-07-01 (2 months)
Motorman: Kapitan Bogaterov - Bulk Carrier / 2017-05-06 - 2017-10-18 (5 months)
Motorman: Greendale - Bulk Carrier / 2022-06-25 - 2022-08-25 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: СБ-742 - Tug boat / 2019-12-24 - 2020-05-30 (5 months)
Motorman: Профессор Николай Муру - Tug boat / 2019-01-23 - 2019-06-30 (5 months)
Motorman: Svetlamor 2 - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2018-04-18 - 2022-04-18 (4 years)
Engine Cadet: BOGOTYR-4 - Crane vessel / 2021-10-21 - 2022-03-22 (5 months)
OS: ALINA - Fishing vessel / 2021-12-01 - 2022-02-09 (2 months)
Motorman: Станислав Стребко - Tug boat / 2019-07-07 - 2020-02-02 (7 months)
Motorman: Sioux - General cargo / 2021-03-25 - 2021-09-08 (5 months)
Motorman: Mehmet bay - General cargo / 2021-02-05 - 2021-08-21 (7 months)
Engine Cadet: Pindushi - Dry Cargo / 2021-02-08 - 2021-07-28 (6 months)
Motorman: Energy 6503 - Bunkering Vessel / 2020-11-06 - 2021-06-10 (7 months)
Motorman: TAMARA 1 - Other vessels / 2020-09-01 - 2021-04-01 (7 months)
Motorman: Капитан Маркин - Tug boat / 2021-01-11 - 2021-03-16 (2 months)
Motorman: m/v Zherekh - Chemical tanker / 2020-06-04 - 2020-09-17 (3 months)
Oiler: Ice Eagle - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-09-07 - 2020-02-28 (6 months)
Single Engineer: Ice Eagle - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-05-27 - 2017-11-15 (6 months)
Single Engineer: Vyacheslav Pankov - Oil Products Tanker / 2016-06-02 - 2016-08-16 (2 months)