Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Motorman: ELITA - Training Ship / 2022-07-25 - 2023-01-27 (6 months)
Wiper: Kamelot - Crude Oil Tanker / 2023-11-01 - 2024-05-09 (6 months)
Motorman: Salgir - Reefer / 2022-07-04 - 2023-01-25 (7 months)
Motorman: Sedov - Training Ship / 2022-09-15 - 2022-11-15 (2 months)
Oiler: Carnival dream - Passenger vessel / 2022-04-03 - 2022-10-02 (6 months)
Oiler: Carnival imagination - Passenger vessel / 2019-11-10 - 2020-09-17 (10 months)
Oiler: Carnival dream - Passenger vessel / 2019-02-24 - 2019-09-07 (6 months)
Oiler: Carnival paradise - Passenger vessel / 2018-06-18 - 2018-11-24 (5 months)
Oiler: Carnival pride - Passenger vessel / 2017-09-17 - 2018-03-18 (6 months)
Motorman: FSRU "Marshal Vasilevskiy" - LPG / LNG / 2022-04-01 - 2022-08-02 (4 months)
Motorman: FSRU "Marshal Vasilevskiy" - LPG / LNG / 2021-07-24 - 2021-11-14 (4 months)
Motorman: SCF Mitre - LPG / LNG / 2020-08-02 - 2021-01-24 (6 months)
Motorman: Pskov - LPG / LNG / 2019-07-31 - 2020-01-31 (6 months)
Motorman: Pskov - LPG / LNG / 2018-07-29 - 2019-01-29 (6 months)
Oiler: COOL GIRL - Reefer / 2022-01-12 - 2022-07-03 (6 months)
Motorman: SB-5 - Tug boat / 2021-12-11 - 2021-12-25 (14 days)
Motorman: KIL-25 - Standby-safety vessel / 2021-04-10 - 2021-07-10 (3 months)
Motorman: General Skobelev - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-11-17 - 2022-06-19 (7 months)
Motorman: Agsu - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-01-30 - 2021-06-19 (5 months)
Motorman: Agsu - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-01-29 - 2020-08-16 (7 months)
Motorman: Agsu - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-02-17 - 2019-07-06 (5 months)
Motorman: Agsu - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-05-19 - 2018-09-27 (4 months)
Motorman: т/х "Богатырь" - Tug boat / 2021-12-15 - 2022-05-31 (6 months)
Motorman: Мгс "Анатолий Гужвин" - Dredger / 2019-04-11 - 2019-12-30 (9 months)
Motorman: Merton 1 - General cargo / 2021-11-09 - 2022-04-24 (5 months)
Motorman: Slavutych 15 - Bulk Carrier / 2021-03-20 - 2021-06-30 (3 months)
Engine Cadet: Bislan - General cargo / 2020-06-22 - 2020-12-15 (6 months)
Motorman: RODNIK - Training Ship / 2021-12-18 - 2022-02-21 (2 months)
4th Engineer: Orange Link - Bulk Carrier / 2023-03-16 - 2023-08-16 (5 months)
4th Engineer: mercury - Reefer / 2022-08-01 - 2022-12-20 (5 months)
Motorman: msc santya - Container Ship / 2021-07-08 - 2022-02-20 (7 months)
4th Engineer: Danidin - Reefer / 2020-12-05 - 2021-03-20 (3 months)
Motorman: Liubomyr - Crew boat / 2021-08-16 - 2022-01-24 (5 months)
Motorman: OC - 10 - Tug boat / 2020-12-08 - 2021-02-10 (2 months)
Motorman: Gidrobiolog - Other vessels / 2020-10-08 - 2021-12-31 (1 year)
Motorman-welder: DENIZ - General cargo / 2017-06-13 - 2017-12-26 (6 months)
Motorman: Shlyakhovoy -301 - Tug boat / 2007-07-12 - 2007-10-28 (4 months)
Motorman: Nikopol - Dry Cargo / 2006-08-23 - 2006-11-27 (3 months)
Motorman: Uzhgorod - Dry Cargo / 2006-06-25 - 2006-08-23 (2 months)
Motorman: Zapadnyy - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-07-12 - 2021-12-19 (5 months)
Motorman: OBAN - General cargo / 2020-08-13 - 2021-04-25 (8 months)
Motorman: смолин-2 - Tug boat / 2019-10-14 - 2020-05-01 (7 months)
Motorman: ULFAT - RO-RO / 2018-09-14 - 2019-03-06 (6 months)
Motorman: Vadim Klyuev - Tug boat / 2021-05-19 - 2021-11-04 (6 months)
Motorman: Патриот - Tug boat / 2021-07-28 - 2021-09-30 (2 months)
Fitter / Welder: Forsa - Fishing vessel / 2021-12-10 - 2022-07-14 (7 months)
Motorman: FORSA - Fishing vessel / 2020-09-26 - 2021-05-14 (8 months)
Motorman: BORNHOLM - Fishing vessel / 2019-09-24 - 2020-04-25 (7 months)
Motorman: BORNHOLM - Fishing vessel / 2018-10-03 - 2019-02-05 (4 months)
Motorman: BORNHOLM - Fishing vessel / 2017-06-19 - 2018-03-03 (8 months)
Oiler: Violet 1 - Chemical tanker / 2022-01-05 - 2022-08-18 (7 months)
Motorman: PETRA STAR - Bulk Carrier / 2021-01-14 - 2021-04-25 (3 months)
Motorman: PETRA II - Bulk Carrier / 2020-07-20 - 2020-11-10 (4 months)
4th Engineer: Aleksey Anichkin - Fishing vessel / 2023-04-18 - 2023-09-15 (5 months)
Motorman: Andromeda - NAVY / 2020-06-01 - 2021-04-09 (10 months)
Engine Cadet: Kruzenshtern - Training Ship / 2019-07-07 - 2019-09-13 (2 months)
Motorman: ОИС "Адмирал Владимирский" - Research vessel / 2020-12-02 - 2021-04-04 (4 months)
Motorman: Вадим Клюев - Tug boat / 2020-05-17 - 2020-11-18 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: Невский 35 - Dry Cargo / 2019-06-05 - 2019-08-06 (2 months)