Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Motorman: HILAMAYA - General cargo / 2020-06-29 - 2020-12-03 (5 months)
Electric Cadet: Maxim Litvinov - Passenger vessel / 2019-03-27 - 2019-07-14 (4 months)
Motorman: Yerupaja - Container Ship / 2020-07-17 - 2020-11-02 (4 months)
Motorman: Carnival Inspiration - Cruise Liner / 2019-11-25 - 2020-01-06 (1 month)
Motorman: Carnival Imagination - Cruise Liner / 2019-10-17 - 2019-11-24 (1 month)
Motorman: Carnival Ecstasy - Cruise Liner / 2019-09-23 - 2019-10-16 (1 month)
AB Seaman: Carnival Liberty - Cruise Liner / 2018-10-19 - 2018-12-20 (2 months)
Motorman: IOSIF SHMELKIN - Fishing vessel / 2020-04-22 - 2020-10-22 (6 months)
Motorman: Polyarnyy - Tug boat / 2018-05-13 - 2018-11-22 (6 months)
Motorman: Polyarnyy - Tug boat / 2017-05-12 - 2017-11-12 (6 months)
Motorman: Polyarnyy - Tug boat / 2016-05-11 - 2016-11-12 (6 months)
AB / Motorman: Polyarnyy - Tug boat / 2015-05-25 - 2015-11-12 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: Н.Дмитриев - Tug boat / 2020-08-01 - 2020-10-11 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: Н.Дмитриев - Tug boat / 2019-08-24 - 2019-09-11 (1 month)
Engine Cadet: Олимпиада - RO-RO / 2018-06-01 - 2018-08-10 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: Седов - Sailing Vessel / 2017-04-13 - 2017-08-11 (4 months)
Ref. Machinist: CCL MAGIC - Cruise Liner / 2020-01-26 - 2020-09-25 (8 months)
Ref. Machinist: CCL MAGIC - Cruise Liner / 2019-04-14 - 2019-10-12 (6 months)
Ref. Machinist: CCL Valor - Cruise Liner / 2018-07-19 - 2019-01-21 (6 months)
Motorman: KHADZHIBEY - Passenger vessel / 2016-11-28 - 2017-01-28 (2 months)
Motorman: Greenwich Eagle - Bulk Carrier / 2019-11-24 - 2020-08-15 (9 months)
Motorman: Stonington Eagle - Bulk Carrier / 2019-02-14 - 2019-09-17 (7 months)
Motorman: Rowayton Eagle - Bulk Carrier / 2018-02-28 - 2018-09-25 (7 months)
Motorman: JS loire - Bulk Carrier / 2016-05-27 - 2017-11-03 (1 year)
Motorman: JS Mekong - Bulk Carrier / 2017-04-25 - 2017-07-03 (2 months)
Turner: WL Kirillov - Bulk Carrier / 2019-07-31 - 2020-01-26 (6 months)
Motorman: Никифор Поярко - Tug boat / 2019-01-10 - 2019-07-20 (6 months)
Motorman: Vladimir Rusanow - Chemical tanker / 2018-04-01 - 2018-11-01 (7 months)
Motorman: владимир русанов - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-03-11 - 2017-11-01 (8 months)
Motorman: Nikifor Poyarko - Tug boat / 2016-06-01 - 2016-11-23 (6 months)
Motorman: Portofino Gas - LPG / LNG / 2019-05-07 - 2019-12-25 (8 months)
Motorman: Mineral Cloudbreak - Bulk Carrier / 2018-01-07 - 2018-07-07 (6 months)
Motorman: RADOMYR - Tug boat / 2018-12-19 - 2019-12-19 (1 year)
Engine Cadet: DRAGOMYR - Tug boat / 2018-10-13 - 2018-12-16 (2 months)
Wiper : v. KHADJIBEY - Passenger vessel / 2017-10-20 - 2017-12-20 (2 months)
4th Engineer: M/V “Alexsandros I” - Bulk Carrier / 2021-09-28 - 2022-08-05 (10 months)
4th Engineer: M/V “Aegea” - Bulk Carrier / 2020-08-22 - 2021-02-20 (6 months)
Motorman: M/V “Naess Absolute” - Bulk Carrier / 2019-10-17 - 2019-12-18 (2 months)
Motorman: M/V “Sider Mykonos” - Bulk Carrier / 2018-10-01 - 2019-04-28 (7 months)
Motorman: M/V “Naess-Courageous” - Bulk Carrier / 2017-05-20 - 2018-03-12 (10 months)
AB / Motorman : Нет - General cargo / 2019-11-26 - 2019-11-26 (0 days)
Motorman: Vatha - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-05-10 - 2019-11-14 (6 months)
4th Engineer: BMRT "Nikolay Chepik" - Fishing vessel / 2020-10-28 - 2021-11-15 (1 year)
4th Engineer: BMRT "Mekhanik Bryzgalin" - Fishing vessel / 2020-08-11 - 2020-10-19 (2 months)
Motorman: BMRT "Mekhanik Bryzgalin" - Fishing vessel / 2018-11-07 - 2019-11-06 (12 months)
Fitter / Welder: Queen Zenobia - LPG / LNG / 2019-08-30 - 2019-10-19 (2 months)
Fitter / Welder: SURVILLE - LPG / LNG / 2019-03-19 - 2019-07-13 (4 months)
Fitter / Welder: VERRAZANE - LPG / LNG / 2018-10-06 - 2019-01-15 (3 months)
Motorman: BLUEFORT - Passenger vessel / 2017-01-20 - 2017-04-13 (3 months)
Fitter / Welder: WIND SOLUTION - Accommodation barge / 2016-11-09 - 2017-01-11 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: ZIM Dalian - Container Ship / 2019-02-06 - 2019-08-20 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: MOL Performance - Container Ship / 2018-02-19 - 2018-09-08 (7 months)
Oiler: IRENA - General cargo / 2020-08-14 - 2020-12-10 (4 months)
Oiler: GRACE 1 - General cargo / 2020-01-11 - 2020-07-04 (6 months)
Motorman: IRENA - General cargo / 2019-01-20 - 2019-08-16 (7 months)
Motorman: RIMONA - Bulk Carrier / 2018-05-26 - 2018-12-13 (7 months)
Motorman: ALEKSANDR ZHYTNIK - General cargo / 2017-03-14 - 2017-10-03 (7 months)
Motorman: M/v Barguzin - General cargo / 2018-12-29 - 2019-05-05 (4 months)
Motorman: UBC Santa Marta - Bulk Carrier / 2016-10-06 - 2017-04-28 (7 months)
Motorman: M/v ABBA - Bulk Carrier / 2015-10-02 - 2016-05-01 (7 months)
Oiler: Tiger - Container Ship / 2020-11-21 - 2021-04-12 (5 months)
Motorman: First Bridge - Dry Cargo / 2018-10-14 - 2019-04-05 (6 months)
Motorman: First Bridge - Dry Cargo / 2017-11-24 - 2018-04-30 (5 months)
Fitter / Welder: Power Star - Dry Cargo / 2017-02-03 - 2017-06-21 (5 months)
Fitter / Welder: Nana Leen - Dry Cargo / 2016-05-08 - 2016-11-11 (6 months)
Motorman: Zuid - Other vessels / 2018-11-15 - 2019-02-21 (3 months)
Motorman: ВМ-86 - NAVY / 2017-04-12 - 2018-10-31 (1 year)
AB / Motorman : D.SKALKEAS - Bulk Carrier / 2018-04-27 - 2018-11-27 (7 months)
AB / Motorman : 4 Sofia - Bulk Carrier / 2016-12-07 - 2017-10-19 (10 months)
AB / Motorman : Trammo Baumann - Bulk Carrier / 2015-10-11 - 2016-06-08 (8 months)
AB / Motorman : Vadibel - Bulk Carrier / 2014-12-11 - 2015-07-08 (7 months)
AB / Motorman : Bereket - Bulk Carrier / 2013-07-23 - 2013-12-28 (5 months)