Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Oiler: MARVIN FAITH - Chemical tanker / 2018-07-21 - 2019-02-08 (7 months)
Motorman: United Kalavryta - Oil Products Tanker / 2016-12-12 - 2017-06-21 (6 months)
Motorman: Kapitan Schemilkin - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-03-10 - 2017-05-17 (2 months)
Motorman: Kapitan Pshhenitsin - Oil Products Tanker / 2016-06-30 - 2016-10-27 (4 months)
Motorman: Volgoneft-147 - Oil Products Tanker / 2013-05-26 - 2014-11-29 (1 year)
Motorman: Volgoneft-217 - Oil Products Tanker / 2012-05-25 - 2012-08-28 (3 months)
4th Engineer: YM Seattle - Container Ship / 2019-06-06 - 2019-10-18 (4 months)
4th Engineer: Zim Kingston - Container Ship / 2018-07-02 - 2018-12-05 (5 months)
4th Engineer: Priority - Container Ship / 2017-06-13 - 2017-12-06 (6 months)
Motorman: YM Seattle - Container Ship / 2016-08-08 - 2017-02-02 (6 months)
Motorman: Azeri Gas - LPG / LNG / 2016-06-10 - 2016-11-25 (5 months)
Motorman: Shusha - Chemical tanker / 2014-12-17 - 2015-05-23 (5 months)
Mess Boy: Shusha - Chemical tanker / 2014-05-29 - 2014-09-20 (4 months)
Mess Boy: Shusha - Chemical tanker / 2013-06-07 - 2013-10-18 (4 months)
Mess Boy: Shusha - Chemical tanker / 2012-11-14 - 2013-02-05 (3 months)
Electrician: A Plus-1 - General cargo / 2017-09-12 - 2017-12-11 (3 months)
Electrician: A PLUS-1 - General cargo / 2017-03-19 - 2017-08-27 (5 months)
Motorman-electrician: Blacksmith - General cargo / 2016-09-09 - 2017-02-07 (5 months)
Motorman-electrician: Blacksmith - General cargo / 2016-02-27 - 2016-08-16 (6 months)
Motorman: Tatarbunary - Dry Cargo / 2015-11-19 - 2015-12-21 (1 month)
Motorman: m/vAtlantic Action - RO-RO / 2015-06-22 - 2015-12-10 (6 months)
Motorman: m/v COSTIS A - General cargo / 2003-12-08 - 2004-06-20 (6 months)
Motorman: m/v Beverly - General cargo / 2001-06-27 - 2001-12-27 (6 months)
Motorman: m/v Dakota - General cargo / 2000-07-06 - 2000-11-15 (4 months)
Motorman: Udarnik - Other vessels / 1996-03-01 - 1997-02-08 (11 months)
Motorman: Atlantic Action - General cargo / 2012-12-10 - 2013-06-07 (6 months)
Motorman: Julia Schulte - Container Ship / 2010-10-15 - 2011-02-19 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: Laura Schulte - Container Ship / 2009-11-29 - 2010-06-03 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: APL Shenzhen - Container Ship / 2009-04-14 - 2009-09-08 (5 months)
Wiper: Marco Polo - Passenger vessel / 2013-12-18 - 2014-07-28 (7 months)
Utility: Marco Polo - Passenger vessel / 2013-08-24 - 2013-12-17 (4 months)
Motorman: Slavutich 2 - General cargo / 2012-09-20 - 2013-02-24 (5 months)
Motorman: Arriscar - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2024-01-26 - 2024-07-31 (6 months)
Motorman: Vesper - Cement Carrier / 2023-10-20 - 2024-01-21 (3 months)
Motorman: Trinidad pearl - Bulk Carrier / 2023-06-09 - 2023-09-22 (3 months)
Motorman: TS Vesper - Cement Carrier / 2023-03-04 - 2023-06-08 (3 months)
Mechanic: Nordanvik - Cement Carrier / 2021-04-30 - 2022-02-05 (9 months)
Motorman: Nimba-3 - General cargo / 2024-03-09 - 2024-06-25 (4 months)
Motorman: Anatoliy Larin - Reefer / 2022-10-10 - 2023-05-03 (7 months)
Engine Cadet: Baltic Patriot - Reefer / 2020-01-12 - 2020-03-28 (3 months)
Motorman: Robon - Crude Oil Tanker / 2023-10-15 - 2024-03-22 (5 months)
Motorman: Tayga - General cargo / 2021-06-24 - 2021-11-11 (5 months)
Motorman: Sapphire - General cargo / 2020-07-31 - 2020-09-22 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: GELMOND 2 - General cargo / 2023-10-09 - 2024-03-13 (5 months)
Motorman: Taurus - Crude Oil Tanker / 2023-09-16 - 2024-01-09 (4 months)
Motorman: Senator - General cargo / 2021-11-04 - 2021-11-10 (6 days)
Motorman: Gheba - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-05-14 - 2021-11-02 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: Gloria - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-07-01 - 2020-08-31 (2 months)
Motorman: Anuket Sapphire - Crude Oil Tanker / 2023-11-07 - 2023-12-18 (1 month)
Motorman: Poseidon I - Dredger / 2022-06-10 - 2022-10-05 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: Clipper Talent - Bulk Carrier / 2021-07-20 - 2021-12-12 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: Атлас - Fishing vessel / 2020-08-01 - 2021-01-29 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: Атлас - Fishing vessel / 2018-07-25 - 2019-01-19 (6 months)
Motorman: MSC TAVVISHI - Container Ship / 2023-04-24 - 2023-11-24 (7 months)
3rd Engineer: LEONID KHOTKIN - General cargo / 2021-07-19 - 2022-01-04 (6 months)
3rd Engineer: AFANASIY MATYUSHENKO - General cargo / 2020-10-09 - 2021-03-04 (5 months)
Motorman: Armada Leader - Oil Products Tanker / 2023-09-15 - 2023-11-22 (2 months)
Motorman: TANAIS - General cargo / 2023-03-01 - 2023-08-24 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: Omskiy-131 - General cargo / 2022-05-18 - 2022-07-30 (2 months)
Motorman: SIRIUS - Reefer / 2023-07-05 - 2023-11-08 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: Sormovskiy-3066 - General cargo / 2022-06-06 - 2022-09-30 (4 months)
Motorman: Анабар - Bunkering Vessel / 2022-05-23 - 2022-06-05 (13 days)
Motorman: Анабар - Bunkering Vessel / 2021-06-01 - 2021-10-23 (5 months)
Motorman: Волгодонск - General cargo / 2020-06-15 - 2021-01-18 (7 months)
Motorman: Lazurniy - Fishing vessel / 2023-07-02 - 2023-10-23 (4 months)
Wiper: Ogerelye - Fishing vessel / 2022-05-03 - 2022-10-30 (6 months)
OS: Polluks - Fishing vessel / 2021-03-26 - 2021-10-27 (7 months)
Oiler: Капитан Иван Викулов - General cargo / 2022-11-15 - 2023-10-10 (11 months)
Oiler: Капитан Иван Викулов - General cargo / 2022-01-18 - 2022-06-17 (5 months)
Oiler: Капитан Иван Викулов - General cargo / 2021-05-19 - 2021-09-17 (4 months)
AB / Motorman: Sergey Diaghilev - Passenger vessel / 2018-05-14 - 2018-10-31 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: Princess Anastasia - Passenger vessel / 2017-05-27 - 2017-07-30 (2 months)
Wiper: ARAMIS - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2023-04-17 - 2023-10-03 (6 months)
Trainee Wiper: CAPTAIN MICHALIS - Tug boat / 2021-11-17 - 2022-01-17 (2 months)