Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
2nd Engineer: Mv Lucky - General cargo / 2023-12-15 - 2024-08-29 (8 months)
2nd Engineer: Mv Lucky - General cargo / 2023-04-14 - 2023-12-03 (8 months)
3rd Engineer: Mt Atlantis - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-11-27 - 2022-05-31 (6 months)
4th Engineer: Mt Atlantis - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-05-15 - 2021-11-26 (6 months)
Motorman: Mt Fairway - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-01-18 - 2020-08-31 (7 months)
Motorman: Topaz Tobol - General cargo / 2020-06-07 - 2020-08-03 (2 months)
Motorman: Topaz Svir - General cargo / 2020-02-01 - 2020-04-25 (3 months)
Motorman: Topaz Tobol - General cargo / 2019-10-23 - 2019-12-21 (2 months)
Motorman: Topaz Svir - General cargo / 2019-07-19 - 2019-09-26 (2 months)
Motorman: Topaz Tobol - General cargo / 2019-04-19 - 2019-06-19 (2 months)
Motorman-welder: v/v Wec Mondriaan - Container Ship / 2023-03-29 - 2023-10-06 (6 months)
Motorman-welder: m/v Alicia - Bulk Carrier / 2022-10-31 - 2023-02-12 (3 months)
Motorman-welder: m/v Word Virtue - Bulk Carrier / 2021-08-31 - 2022-08-04 (11 months)
Oiler: m/v Viking Sea - RO-RO / 2020-11-11 - 2021-04-27 (6 months)
Motorman: m/v Ann Maria - Bulk Carrier / 2020-02-29 - 2020-07-25 (5 months)
Motorman: Yue Gong pao 5 - Construction vessel / 2019-08-05 - 2020-07-01 (11 months)
Oiler: Odin - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2019-01-26 - 2019-07-05 (5 months)
Mechanic: Si Han Zhan Jiang Hao - Heavy lift vessel / 2018-02-01 - 2018-05-04 (3 months)
Oiler: AMANDI JACK 1 - Jack-up Platform / 2016-07-12 - 2017-05-06 (10 months)
Wiper: Delta 3 - Tug boat / 2021-09-17 - 2021-12-06 (3 months)
Wiper: Sandra - Bulk Carrier / 2020-10-30 - 2021-05-18 (7 months)
Motorman: Кентавр - Tug boat / 2020-04-06 - 2020-06-07 (2 months)
4th Engineer: Aegean Spire - Bulk Carrier / 2021-12-01 - 2022-09-08 (9 months)
4th Engineer: Ivory Gull - Dry Cargo / 2021-04-14 - 2021-08-01 (4 months)
4th Engineer: Ivory Gull - Dry Cargo / 2020-06-29 - 2021-01-18 (7 months)
Motorman: Al-WAHSH - Tug boat / 2019-12-05 - 2020-03-04 (3 months)
Motorman: Captain Rolando - Tug boat / 2019-08-03 - 2019-12-04 (4 months)
Motorman-electrician: RIX EMERALD - General cargo / 2019-09-15 - 2020-01-08 (4 months)
Motorman-electrician: RIX STAR - General cargo / 2019-02-21 - 2019-07-19 (5 months)
Motorman-electrician: RIX Plato - General cargo / 2018-05-29 - 2018-10-10 (4 months)
Motorman: Atlantic Lady - Reefer / 2016-12-03 - 2017-08-03 (8 months)
Motorman: Atlantic Lady - Reefer / 2016-04-05 - 2016-08-07 (4 months)
3rd Engineer: Sergey Bulk - Tug boat / 2023-03-07 - 2024-02-01 (11 months)
4th Engineer: Ivan Bubnov - Bunkering Vessel / 2020-05-22 - 2021-02-16 (9 months)
Motorman: Ivan Bubnov - Bunkering Vessel / 2019-06-28 - 2020-01-04 (6 months)
Motorman: PLB Fortyna - Pipe laying vessel / 2019-05-03 - 2019-09-10 (4 months)
Motorman: PLB Fortyna - Pipe laying vessel / 2019-02-01 - 2019-04-03 (2 months)
Motorman: PLB Fortyna - Pipe laying vessel / 2018-04-13 - 2018-10-04 (6 months)
Oiler: MONARCH PRINCESS IMO7725374 - RO-RO / 2019-12-20 - 2021-02-07 (1 year)
Motorman: ARTARIA - Bulk Carrier / 2018-11-20 - 2019-05-27 (6 months)
Motorman: ROSHAK - Bulk Carrier / 2017-07-07 - 2018-04-04 (9 months)
Motorman: ARTAVAND - Bulk Carrier / 2016-08-20 - 2017-03-01 (6 months)
Motorman: Кубань - AHTS / 2018-12-18 - 2019-04-01 (3 months)
Motorman: Кендрик - AHTS / 2018-07-19 - 2018-12-01 (4 months)
Motorman: Кендрик - AHTS / 2017-06-05 - 2017-12-20 (6 months)
Trainee Engineer: АЛЕКСАНДР УВАРОВ - Dredger / 2017-01-20 - 2017-03-22 (2 months)
4th Engineer: m/t Tethis 7 - Chemical tanker / 2020-07-12 - 2021-01-27 (6 months)
4th Engineer: m/t Violet 1 - Chemical tanker / 2019-09-22 - 2020-03-27 (6 months)
Motorman: m/t Violet 1 - Chemical tanker / 2018-06-28 - 2019-03-16 (9 months)
Motorman: m/t Peterpaul - Chemical tanker / 2017-06-21 - 2018-03-14 (9 months)
Wiper: m/t Chamtang - Chemical tanker / 2016-07-07 - 2017-01-10 (6 months)
OOW Engine: KATRIN - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2019-05-03 - 2019-08-20 (4 months)
Motorman: KLARA - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2018-08-16 - 2018-12-17 (4 months)
Motorman: KRISTELLA - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2018-01-25 - 2018-05-30 (4 months)
Motorman: KATRE - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2017-06-02 - 2017-10-20 (5 months)
Motorman: Ленанефть 2011 - Bunkering Vessel / 2018-05-08 - 2018-12-15 (7 months)
Motorman: Александр Радищев - Cruise Liner / 2017-08-07 - 2017-09-21 (1 month)
Motorman: Cerencan - General cargo / 2018-01-12 - 2018-08-02 (7 months)
Motorman: Leonardo - General cargo / 2016-05-18 - 2016-11-30 (6 months)
Motorman: Oriental Dragin - Passenger vessel / 2017-09-22 - 2018-05-28 (8 months)
Motorman: Rex Fortune - Passenger vessel / 2015-09-06 - 2016-02-26 (6 months)
Motorman: Rex Fortune - Passenger vessel / 2014-08-20 - 2015-06-17 (10 months)
Motorman: Macau Success - Passenger vessel / 2013-03-19 - 2014-03-04 (11 months)
Motorman: Macau Success - Passenger vessel / 2011-08-22 - 2012-04-20 (8 months)
Motorman: A PLUS 1 - Bulk Carrier / 2017-08-18 - 2018-05-04 (9 months)
Motorman: MV TEMPO - Bulk Carrier / 2016-09-20 - 2017-02-15 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: Ocean Brother - Bulk Carrier / 2017-10-11 - 2018-03-06 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: Glikofilous III - RO-RO / 2015-01-31 - 2015-05-25 (4 months)
Motorman: FEHN LIGHT - General cargo / 2017-07-14 - 2018-01-26 (6 months)
Motorman: SUNNY - RO-RO / 2016-08-30 - 2017-02-18 (6 months)
Chief Cook: CHAMTANG - Chemical tanker / 2013-08-25 - 2014-03-14 (7 months)
Wiper : Lucie Delmas - RO-RO / 2012-05-13 - 2012-11-19 (6 months)
Cook: MEKONG RIVER - Container Ship / 2011-06-07 - 2011-10-29 (5 months)
Motorman: m/v "Rodion Oslyablya" - General cargo / 2017-03-24 - 2017-10-10 (7 months)
Motorman: Isadora - Fishing vessel / 2016-01-01 - 2016-04-15 (3 months)
Motorman: Isadora - Fishing vessel / 2015-06-17 - 2015-12-31 (6 months)
Motorman: FV "Stark" - Fishing vessel / 2015-04-26 - 2015-06-16 (2 months)
Motorman: Sviatoi Nikolai - Bulk Carrier / 2013-11-11 - 2014-01-16 (2 months)