Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Master: CHOLA QUEEN - Crude Oil Tanker / 2023-05-09 - 2023-09-16 (4 months)
Master: MARTINA - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-04-10 - 2022-09-30 (6 months)
Master: Victor 1 - Chemical tanker / 2021-04-11 - 2021-09-29 (6 months)
Master: SOL - Chemical tanker / 2020-09-16 - 2021-01-19 (4 months)
Master: Ozichukwu - Chemical tanker / 2019-03-06 - 2019-11-21 (8 months)
Master: Clara - General cargo / 2023-04-27 - 2023-08-27 (4 months)
Master: Wilson Lista - General cargo / 2022-06-26 - 2022-09-29 (3 months)
Master: Wilson Lista - General cargo / 2021-09-17 - 2022-02-08 (5 months)
Master: Wilson Lista - General cargo / 2021-01-20 - 2021-05-24 (4 months)
Master: Wilson Lista - General cargo / 2020-05-13 - 2020-09-11 (4 months)
Master: C. GENUINE - VLCC / 2023-01-25 - 2023-07-01 (5 months)
Master: PACIFIC OPAL - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-12-06 - 2022-08-10 (8 months)
Master: C. EMPEROR - VLCC / 2020-12-12 - 2021-02-06 (2 months)
Master: PRO ONYX - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-03-15 - 2020-11-19 (8 months)
Master: PRO ALLIANCE - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-06-16 - 2019-12-25 (6 months)
Master: Amurborg - General cargo / 2022-09-22 - 2023-01-15 (4 months)
Master: Arneborg - General cargo / 2022-03-14 - 2022-06-24 (3 months)
Master: Diezeborg - Container Ship / 2021-09-28 - 2022-01-15 (4 months)
Master: Amurborg - General cargo / 2021-02-20 - 2021-06-17 (4 months)
Master: Lauwersborg - General cargo / 2020-11-28 - 2021-01-05 (1 month)
Master: Don Reefer - Reefer / 2021-09-05 - 2022-03-17 (6 months)
Chief Officer: Wele Nzas (ex Savior) - Research vessel / 2019-12-24 - 2020-07-04 (6 months)
Chief Officer: Nestos Reefer - Reefer / 2018-10-10 - 2019-03-03 (5 months)
Chief Officer: Nestos Reefer - Reefer / 2017-07-29 - 2018-03-29 (8 months)
Chief Officer: Nestos Reefer - Reefer / 2016-12-12 - 2017-03-21 (3 months)
Master: HELEN H - Container Ship / 2021-07-25 - 2021-10-18 (3 months)
Master: HELEN H - General cargo / 2020-03-10 - 2020-12-28 (10 months)
Master: HELEN H - General cargo / 2019-12-05 - 2020-01-19 (1 month)
Master: HELEN H - Container Ship / 2018-08-16 - 2019-07-05 (11 months)
Master: HELEN H - Container Ship / 2017-03-31 - 2018-02-20 (11 months)
Master: Mount Olympus - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-05-22 - 2021-10-18 (5 months)
Master: Mount Olympus - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-09-12 - 2020-12-24 (3 months)
Master: Rhaeo Rapid - Chemical tanker / 2020-02-08 - 2020-07-11 (5 months)
Master: White Shark - Chemical tanker / 2018-12-20 - 2019-03-21 (3 months)
Master: Jag Prabha - Crude Oil Tanker / 2017-03-20 - 2017-04-05 (1 month)
Master: Virgo - VLCC / 2021-04-12 - 2021-10-06 (6 months)
Chief Officer: Athinea - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-08-24 - 2020-11-21 (3 months)
Chief Officer: ELLINIS - VLCC / 2020-02-05 - 2020-07-27 (6 months)
Master: Gaz Imperial - LPG / LNG / 2021-02-27 - 2021-07-10 (4 months)
Master: Gaz Imperial - LPG / LNG / 2020-02-14 - 2020-09-17 (7 months)
Master: Gaz Imperial - LPG / LNG / 2019-04-12 - 2019-09-28 (6 months)
Master: Gaz Imperial - LPG / LNG / 2018-07-27 - 2018-11-20 (4 months)
Master: Gaz Imperial - LPG / LNG / 2017-12-05 - 2018-04-10 (4 months)
Master: Yun Der - Reefer / 2021-03-21 - 2021-06-20 (3 months)
Master: Yun Der - Reefer / 2020-06-12 - 2020-10-22 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Prince of seas - Reefer / 2019-12-14 - 2020-01-29 (1 month)
Chief Officer: YUN DER - Reefer / 2019-02-23 - 2019-07-17 (5 months)
Chief Officer: Polarlight - Reefer / 2018-07-07 - 2018-10-17 (3 months)
Master: Serenity ZG - General cargo / 2020-12-21 - 2021-05-19 (5 months)
Master: West - Tug boat / 2018-09-03 - 2020-12-01 (2 years)
Master: JSP Levante - Container Ship / 2017-11-21 - 2018-04-17 (5 months)
Master: JSP Levante - Container Ship / 2017-02-24 - 2017-07-12 (5 months)
Master: Alk - Container Ship / 2016-12-08 - 2017-01-16 (1 month)
Master: Wilson Brugge - General cargo / 2020-02-13 - 2020-06-25 (4 months)
Master: Lianne - General cargo / 2019-08-06 - 2019-11-22 (4 months)
Master: RMS Ratingen - General cargo / 2018-12-04 - 2019-04-27 (5 months)
Master: Wilson Algeciras - General cargo / 2018-03-28 - 2018-08-03 (4 months)
Master: Wilson Algeciras - General cargo / 2017-07-27 - 2017-11-26 (4 months)
Master: A2B INDEPENDENT - Container Ship / 2019-09-11 - 2019-11-28 (3 months)
Master: ZILLERTAL - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2018-12-04 - 2019-04-28 (5 months)
Master: PITZTAL - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2018-07-11 - 2018-09-30 (3 months)
Master: ZILLERTAL - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2018-05-20 - 2018-06-18 (1 month)
Master: PITZTAL - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2018-01-04 - 2018-03-15 (2 months)
Master: RUNA - Container Ship / 2019-05-24 - 2019-09-20 (4 months)
Master: RUNA - Container Ship / 2018-09-16 - 2019-01-24 (4 months)
Master: RUNA - Container Ship / 2018-02-09 - 2018-06-16 (4 months)
Master: RUNA - Container Ship / 2017-07-03 - 2017-10-02 (3 months)
Master: RUNA - Container Ship / 2016-11-17 - 2017-03-06 (4 months)
Master: PHILIPP OLDENDORFF - Bulk Carrier / 2019-02-11 - 2019-07-12 (5 months)
Master: EVELYN SCHULTE - Bulk Carrier / 2018-07-21 - 2018-11-19 (4 months)
Master: STAR EPSILON - Bulk Carrier / 2017-09-22 - 2018-05-14 (8 months)
Master: STAR AQUARIUS - Bulk Carrier / 2017-05-20 - 2017-07-07 (2 months)
Master: SERENDIPITY - Bulk Carrier / 2016-12-19 - 2017-04-21 (4 months)
Master: Sea bridle - Bulk Carrier / 2018-01-10 - 2018-11-10 (10 months)
Master: Sea bridle - Bulk Carrier / 2016-09-25 - 2017-11-25 (1 year)
Master: Aristimo - Bulk Carrier / 2015-04-15 - 2016-05-20 (1 year)
Master: Selecta - General cargo / 2018-01-19 - 2018-05-29 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Selecta - General cargo / 2017-11-20 - 2018-01-18 (2 months)
Chief Officer: CSL Acadian - Bulk Carrier / 2017-01-16 - 2017-04-20 (3 months)
Chief Officer: CSL Metis - Bulk Carrier / 2016-03-21 - 2016-07-23 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Rt. Hon. Paul E. Martin - Bulk Carrier / 2015-06-22 - 2015-10-27 (4 months)
Master: Delta22 - Jack-up Platform / 2017-11-20 - 2018-02-11 (3 months)
Chief Officer: ALGOSAIBI 42 - DSV (Diving Support) / 2017-04-03 - 2017-07-06 (3 months)
Chief Officer: NOR SEA - AHTS / 2016-04-08 - 2016-06-22 (2 months)
Master: DENEB - Tug boat / 2016-01-20 - 2016-04-07 (3 months)
Chief Officer: BRODOSPAS MOON - AHTS / 2015-11-19 - 2015-12-21 (1 month)
Master: BRODOSPAS MOON - AHTS / 2015-08-16 - 2015-09-18 (1 month)
Deck Cadet: BBS SEA - Dry Cargo / 2012-12-07 - 2013-06-22 (6 months)
OS: Tor Dania - RO-RO / 2012-01-10 - 2012-12-22 (11 months)
AB Seaman: Tolmin - Dry Cargo / 2012-05-13 - 2012-11-24 (6 months)