Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Master: Green Spinel - Oil Products Tanker / 2023-01-18 - 2023-04-19 (3 months)
Master: Red Opal - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-07-17 - 2022-11-04 (4 months)
Master: Red Opal - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-11-28 - 2022-04-13 (5 months)
Master: AXIOS - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-06-26 - 2021-08-10 (1 month)
Master: Bougainville - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-07-25 - 2021-01-19 (6 months)
Master: Northern Jamboree - Container Ship / 2022-01-18 - 2022-07-22 (6 months)
Master: Northern Jamboree - Container Ship / 2021-05-16 - 2021-09-29 (4 months)
Master: Northern Jamboree - Container Ship / 2020-10-26 - 2021-02-14 (4 months)
Master: Northern Jamboree - Container Ship / 2019-12-02 - 2020-06-18 (7 months)
Master: Northern Jamboree - Container Ship / 2019-05-04 - 2019-08-29 (4 months)
Master: ARDAVAN - Bulk Carrier / 2021-08-12 - 2021-12-02 (4 months)
Master: ATLANTIC BULKER - Bulk Carrier / 2021-04-06 - 2021-10-11 (6 months)
Chief Officer: PORTLAND - Bulk Carrier / 2020-06-18 - 2020-10-19 (4 months)
Chief Officer: NEPTUNE - Bulk Carrier / 2019-10-24 - 2020-04-06 (5 months)
Master: Chemtrans Oceanic - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-10-22 - 2021-03-12 (5 months)
Master: Chemtrans Oceanic - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-12-26 - 2020-06-27 (6 months)
Master: London Star - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-05-18 - 2019-09-17 (4 months)
Master: MS Sophie - Chemical tanker / 2018-10-30 - 2019-02-22 (4 months)
Master: MS Simon - Chemical tanker / 2018-01-30 - 2018-06-17 (5 months)
Master: Cabo San Antonio - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-10-14 - 2020-02-04 (4 months)
Master: Cabo San Antonio - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-01-26 - 2019-06-06 (4 months)
Master: Cabo San Vicente - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-05-04 - 2018-10-01 (5 months)
Master: Politisa Lady - Chemical tanker / 2017-07-28 - 2017-12-24 (5 months)
Master: Horizon Thetis - Chemical tanker / 2016-07-10 - 2016-12-13 (5 months)
Master: WEM 1 - Crew boat / 2019-09-17 - 2019-10-15 (1 month)
Master: WEM 1 - Crew boat / 2019-07-03 - 2019-08-01 (1 month)
Master: Green Isle - Tug boat / 2019-05-22 - 2019-06-18 (1 month)
Chief Officer: Sol Viking - Platform Supply vessel / 2018-08-04 - 2018-11-21 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Kaunas Seaways - Ferry / 2018-06-05 - 2018-07-04 (1 month)
Master: London Star - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-05-18 - 2019-09-17 (4 months)
Master: MS SOPHIE - Chemical tanker / 2018-10-30 - 2019-02-22 (4 months)
Master: MS SIMON - Chemical tanker / 2018-01-30 - 2018-06-17 (5 months)
Master: Chemtrans Elbe - Chemical tanker / 2017-05-29 - 2017-09-27 (4 months)
Master: Chemtrans Havel - Chemical tanker / 2016-09-27 - 2017-03-13 (5 months)
Master: Vasi Sun - Container Ship / 2018-08-02 - 2018-12-11 (4 months)
Master: MOUNT CAMERON - Container Ship / 2017-05-29 - 2017-10-18 (5 months)
Master: CALA PINGUINO - Container Ship / 2016-02-02 - 2016-08-31 (7 months)
Master: ACX PEARL - Container Ship / 2014-11-24 - 2015-04-07 (4 months)
Chief Officer: ACX PEARL - Container Ship / 2014-10-05 - 2014-11-23 (2 months)
Master: Охотск - General cargo / 2007-05-05 - 2009-11-20 (2 years)
Chief Officer: Astana - Crude Oil Tanker / 2006-05-05 - 2006-12-20 (7 months)
Chief Officer: Almaty - Crude Oil Tanker / 2005-03-03 - 2005-11-15 (8 months)
Chief Officer: Cara - General cargo / 2016-07-26 - 2017-03-04 (7 months)
Chief Officer: Dornum - Coaster / 2015-09-14 - 2016-02-22 (5 months)
Chief Officer: ISIS - Bulk Carrier / 2014-10-21 - 2015-04-24 (6 months)
Chief Officer: MUSE - General cargo / 2013-06-13 - 2014-07-04 (1 year)
Chief Officer: MUSE - General cargo / 2012-08-21 - 2013-04-01 (7 months)
Chief Officer: Zakher Alpha - ROV Support vessel / 2014-02-01 - 2014-05-28 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Nautilus - Survey vessel / 2013-08-18 - 2014-01-01 (4 months)
Chief Officer: VM Supporter - MRSV / 2013-04-06 - 2013-07-04 (3 months)
Master: LPG Enigmagas - LPG / LNG / 2011-07-12 - 2011-12-25 (5 months)
Master: LPG Anbutane - LPG / LNG / 2010-10-25 - 2011-05-10 (6 months)
Master: Sormovskiy 3006 - Bulk Carrier / 2009-09-06 - 2010-04-21 (7 months)
Master: Cigdem S - Dry Cargo / 2008-10-12 - 2009-05-15 (7 months)
Master: A.P.Sky - Dry Cargo / 2007-12-03 - 2008-04-02 (4 months)
Master: MED Surveyor - Survey vessel / 2023-06-06 - 2023-09-13 (3 months)
Master: Geo Ocean IV - Survey vessel / 2020-10-01 - 2022-10-17 (2 years)
Master: Allianz Titanium - AHTS / 2019-10-23 - 2020-02-07 (3 months)
Master: Allianz Titanium - AHTS / 2018-12-29 - 2019-04-12 (3 months)
Master: Jana 41/Jana 42 - Tug boat / 2018-04-18 - 2018-09-07 (5 months)
Master: PUSAN C - Container Ship / 2022-06-16 - 2022-11-04 (5 months)
Master: EUROPE - Container Ship / 2021-06-16 - 2021-11-26 (5 months)
Master: NILEDUTCH LION - Container Ship / 2020-09-16 - 2021-02-02 (5 months)
Master: CMA CGM NERVAL - Container Ship / 2019-10-21 - 2020-06-04 (7 months)
Master: AMERICA - Container Ship / 2019-01-31 - 2019-07-07 (5 months)
Chief Officer: Delta Star - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-06-21 - 2022-08-18 (2 months)
Chief Officer: Delta Eurydice - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-12-01 - 2022-06-20 (7 months)
Master: IRBIS - Tug boat / 2021-01-30 - 2022-06-01 (1 year)
Master: Dirax - Tug boat / 2017-04-20 - 2021-01-29 (3 years)
Chief Officer: Sormovskiy-3066 - General cargo / 2021-04-19 - 2021-11-05 (7 months)
Chief Officer: Sormovskiy-3066 - General cargo / 2020-06-09 - 2020-11-08 (5 months)
Master: TEGEN - Tug boat / 2016-05-02 - 2020-05-01 (3 years)
Master: TEGEN - Tug boat / 2011-05-02 - 2016-05-01 (4 years)
Master: TEGEN - Tug boat / 2007-01-10 - 2011-05-01 (4 years)
Chief Officer: Arkticheskaya - Jack-up Platform / 2018-06-01 - 2020-03-01 (1 year)
Master: Tam Dao 2 - Jack-up Platform / 2017-01-01 - 2018-05-01 (1 year)
Chief Officer: Sarbas - Offshore Supply vessel / 2007-08-20 - 2008-07-20 (11 months)
Master: Caspian Seal - Tug boat / 2015-11-02 - 2018-10-01 (2 years)
Master: SM Supporter - ROV Support vessel / 2012-03-15 - 2015-08-28 (3 years)