Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Engine Cadet: Mir - Sailing Vessel / 2021-04-01 - 2021-05-07 (1 month)
Engine Cadet: M/V Virgen De Peñafrancia - Passenger vessel / 2020-03-14 - 2021-03-17 (1 year)
Engine Cadet: Mykolayiv - Bulk Carrier / 2020-10-01 - 2021-03-07 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: Princess of the Dnieper - Cruise Liner / 2020-03-09 - 2020-07-01 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: Kapitan Khlebnikov - Icebreaker / 2020-05-01 - 2020-09-12 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: "Professor Khlyustin" - Dry Cargo / 2018-08-13 - 2018-10-12 (2 months)
4th Engineer: MT LIA - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-10-11 - 2023-05-27 (8 months)
Engine Cadet: M.T Aframax reiviera - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-05-08 - 2019-11-15 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: BULAT - Tug boat / 2019-07-01 - 2019-08-28 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: Khibiny - Passenger vessel / 2019-05-27 - 2019-08-25 (3 months)
Engine Cadet: TS Madhurika - Training Ship / 2019-01-20 - 2019-07-31 (6 months)
4th Engineer: ROZA - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-12-24 - 2023-08-16 (8 months)
Oiler: ROZA - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-04-18 - 2022-10-20 (6 months)
Motorman: ARMENAK BABAEV - Fishing vessel / 2019-06-04 - 2020-01-14 (7 months)
Engine Cadet: KRUZENSHTERN - Cruise Liner / 2018-04-24 - 2018-09-10 (5 months)
Motorman: Adventure II - Bulk Carrier / 2018-07-06 - 2018-12-01 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: Sea Discovery - General cargo / 2017-03-03 - 2017-07-30 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: Oslo Carrier 2 - General cargo / 2016-05-17 - 2016-10-26 (5 months)
Receptionist: Star - Bulk Carrier / 2017-02-01 - 2017-07-04 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: Kiliya - General cargo / 2016-05-20 - 2017-01-20 (8 months)
Engine Cadet: Бештау - Passenger vessel / 2015-05-14 - 2015-08-31 (4 months)
Fitter / Welder: Olga - Bulk Carrier / 2018-08-03 - 2018-08-30 (1 month)
Fitter / Welder: AMELIA - Fishing vessel / 2017-10-26 - 2018-03-05 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: ГЕНУЯ - Cruise Liner / 2016-02-08 - 2016-04-08 (2 months)
3rd Engineer: MARCAP SIBA - Platform Supply vessel / 2014-02-04 - 2014-06-22 (5 months)
3rd Engineer: MARCAP SIBA - Platform Supply vessel / 2013-04-25 - 2013-12-19 (8 months)
Engine Cadet: CAPE BUZZARD - Bulk Carrier / 2012-06-10 - 2012-09-22 (3 months)
Engine Cadet: IRFON - Bulk Carrier / 2011-08-24 - 2011-12-30 (4 months)
Motorman: Svir - General cargo / 2013-11-07 - 2014-03-24 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: BT-426 - Tug boat / 2012-03-20 - 2012-05-27 (2 months)
3rd Engineer: abubakar - General cargo / 2018-05-22 - 2018-09-22 (4 months)
Motorman: Alnilam - General cargo / 2017-11-19 - 2018-04-19 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: porada - Dry Cargo / 2010-05-15 - 2011-01-07 (8 months)
Engine Cadet: MV Bai Hua - General cargo / 0031-08-25 - 0024-11-25 (6 years)
Engine Cadet: MV Worldera-3 - Bulk Carrier / 0028-11-24 - 0007-05-25 (21 year)
No Experience
No Experience