Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Engine Cadet: Maersk Hanoi - Container Ship / 2019-08-05 - 2020-02-04 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: Sorø Maersk - Container Ship / 2018-09-25 - 2019-04-05 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: MT Diddi - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-02-27 - 2019-10-19 (8 months)
Engine Cadet: MV SF ENTERPRISE - General cargo / 2018-09-17 - 2019-09-20 (1 year)
Engine Cadet: MIR - Training Ship / 2019-07-09 - 2019-09-08 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: Knyaz Vladimir - Cruise Liner / 2019-01-05 - 2019-09-02 (8 months)
Engine Cadet: M/V Magnolia kubos - General cargo / 2018-07-06 - 2019-07-24 (1 year)
Engine Cadet: MV LAGOONS - Passenger vessel / 2019-03-24 - 2019-05-26 (2 months)
Trainee Engineer: Harbour Pioneer - Chemical tanker / 2021-05-17 - 2021-10-15 (5 months)
3rd Engineer: Else Marie Theresa - Chemical tanker / 2020-12-08 - 2021-02-08 (2 months)
Motorman: karina theresa - Chemical tanker / 2020-06-11 - 2020-10-25 (4 months)
Motorman: skyFrost - Reefer / 2019-11-03 - 2020-03-16 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: Great Eastern - Chemical tanker / 2018-12-02 - 2019-04-10 (4 months)
Oiler: DSV RYAN - DSV (Diving Support) / 2019-08-07 - 2019-12-08 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: VEGA STAR - Bulk Carrier / 2018-04-07 - 2018-11-30 (8 months)
Engine Cadet: GP FERRY 2 - Passenger vessel / 2017-10-24 - 2018-10-25 (1 year)
Engine Cadet: M/V GRAND MARAIS - Bulk Carrier / 2017-03-08 - 2017-11-11 (8 months)
Motorman: mv “MASTER AHMAD N.Y.” - General cargo / 2018-03-13 - 2018-11-28 (8 months)
Motorman: mv BELLATRIX" - General cargo / 2017-05-20 - 2017-09-26 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: KONKVEST - Dry Cargo / 2017-01-05 - 2017-03-07 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: Wadi elkarm - Bulk Carrier / 2016-06-20 - 2017-01-07 (7 months)
Oiler: MT WV UNO - Tug boat / 2017-05-16 - 2018-07-20 (1 year)
Engine Cadet: General Cargo - General cargo / 2015-07-07 - 2016-07-09 (1 year)
4th Engineer: MV LONE STAR - Bulk Carrier / 2018-09-16 - 2019-03-19 (6 months)
4th Engineer: MV TRAMONTANA - Bulk Carrier / 2017-10-30 - 2018-06-09 (7 months)
Engine Cadet: mv orion leader - RO-RO / 2015-04-10 - 2015-12-24 (8 months)
Engine Cadet: mv sct vietnam - Container Ship / 2012-06-27 - 2013-04-20 (10 months)
3rd Engineer: Hizir - General cargo / 2020-07-21 - 2020-12-21 (5 months)
3rd Engineer: Amur-2506 - General cargo / 2019-07-04 - 2020-01-16 (6 months)
Motorman: Akua - General cargo / 2018-06-15 - 2019-01-21 (7 months)
Motorman: Akua - General cargo / 2017-01-26 - 2017-12-20 (11 months)
Engine Cadet: Bislan - Dry Cargo / 2015-04-19 - 2015-07-20 (3 months)
Engine Cadet: M/V Princess Jerlyn - General cargo / 2014-04-10 - 2015-04-21 (1 year)
Engine Cadet: Modulus 2 - General cargo / 2014-01-16 - 2014-06-28 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: Modulu-2 - General cargo / 2014-01-19 - 2014-06-24 (5 months)
Oiler: BOMAR REBECCA - Container Ship / 2018-03-19 - 2018-09-19 (6 months)
Wiper : LONGFJELL - General cargo / 2017-04-05 - 2017-09-28 (6 months)
Wiper : AHS HAMBURG - Container Ship / 2016-04-23 - 2016-10-12 (6 months)
Wiper : WILSON ASTAKOS - General cargo / 2014-11-19 - 2015-06-08 (7 months)
Engine Cadet: FOKKO UKENA - General cargo / 2013-07-13 - 2014-01-12 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: m/v Irida - General cargo / 2013-07-10 - 2014-01-11 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: m/v Bislan - General cargo / 2013-05-28 - 2013-07-02 (1 month)