Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Engine Cadet: Rowangarth - Tug boat / 2018-08-27 - 2019-03-03 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: OM-106 - Passenger vessel / 2018-12-23 - 2019-02-02 (1 month)
Engine Cadet: Tug - Other vessels / 2018-05-28 - 2019-02-01 (8 months)
Engine Cadet: SYNERGY 1 - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-08-18 - 2018-11-11 (3 months)
OS: PARAMOUNT HELSINKI - Crude Oil Tanker / 2015-06-28 - 2015-12-13 (5 months)
OS: ENERGY PROTECTOR - Chemical tanker / 2014-06-05 - 2014-11-14 (5 months)
Trainee Engineer: Argus - Tug boat / 2018-07-23 - 2018-10-27 (3 months)
Trainee Engineer: Druzhba - Passenger vessel / 2017-06-12 - 2017-07-23 (1 month)
Engine Cadet: Kruzenshtern - Training Ship / 2018-07-02 - 2018-09-07 (2 months)
AB / Motorman : Хаджибей - Other vessels / 2018-05-01 - 2018-07-30 (3 months)
Engine Cadet: Jadran - Passenger vessel / 2018-05-05 - 2018-05-15 (10 days)
Engine Cadet: MV BARRA - Bulk Carrier / 2017-04-20 - 2018-04-28 (1 year)
Engine Cadet: Best success - Bulk Carrier / 2017-08-08 - 2018-04-22 (8 months)
Engine Cadet: AIDA 4 - Passenger vessel / 2017-08-26 - 2018-03-13 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: AIDA4 - Training Ship / 2016-08-14 - 2017-02-21 (6 months)
4th Engineer: Bedford Castle - Bulk Carrier / 2020-02-29 - 2020-08-08 (5 months)
4th Engineer: Bedford Castle - Bulk Carrier / 2019-05-11 - 2019-08-30 (4 months)
Oiler: Bedford Castle - Bulk Carrier / 2018-10-18 - 2019-05-10 (7 months)
Engine Cadet: Crowned Eagle - Bulk Carrier / 2016-07-20 - 2017-02-05 (7 months)
Engine Cadet: ENERGY CHEMPION - Crude Oil Tanker / 2016-02-18 - 2016-09-06 (7 months)
Engine Cadet: Ruzgar Bey - General cargo / 2016-04-07 - 2016-07-05 (3 months)
Motorman: LAUREN C - Dry Cargo / 2018-10-16 - 2019-01-18 (3 months)
Motorman: LAUREN C - Dry Cargo / 2018-03-26 - 2018-07-05 (3 months)
Motorman: LAUREN C - General cargo / 2017-12-05 - 2018-01-22 (2 months)
Motorman: HEATHER SEA - Seismic vessel / 2017-05-31 - 2017-10-13 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: Zeus - General cargo / 2015-12-10 - 2016-06-27 (7 months)
Engine Cadet: OMSKIY-125 - Dry Cargo / 2015-07-10 - 2015-08-21 (1 month)
Motorman: RIGHT STEP - General cargo / 2020-12-20 - 2021-08-17 (8 months)
Motorman: ALEXO - RO-RO / 2019-05-17 - 2019-11-22 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: KENTAVR - Tug boat / 2014-05-12 - 2014-11-12 (6 months)
Junior officer: Panagia Armata - Crude Oil Tanker / 2016-10-19 - 2017-04-04 (6 months)
Junior officer: Pserimos - Oil Products Tanker / 2016-07-29 - 2016-09-28 (2 months)
Junior officer: Moritz Schulte - LPG / LNG / 2015-10-09 - 2015-11-21 (1 month)
Engine Cadet: Chamtang - Chemical tanker / 2014-02-14 - 2014-08-08 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: Vikki - General cargo / 2013-06-19 - 2013-09-09 (3 months)
3rd Engineer: Eval nolom - RO-RO / 2016-08-28 - 2016-11-09 (2 months)
Motorman: Avonmoor - Container Ship / 2015-08-26 - 2016-04-27 (8 months)
Motorman: Sanad - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2013-05-17 - 2014-01-10 (8 months)
Engine Cadet: GULF CITY - General cargo / 2012-07-26 - 2013-02-01 (6 months)
3rd Engineer: Vlas Chubar - Dry Cargo / 2010-11-05 - 2011-07-08 (8 months)