Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Engine Cadet: Novator - Repair Vessel / 2017-06-07 - 2017-12-31 (7 months)
Oiler: SCF PRIMORYE - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-12-15 - 2022-06-26 (6 months)
Oiler: NS CLIPPER - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-12-10 - 2021-07-12 (7 months)
Motorman: YUZHMORGEOLOGIA - Research vessel / 2019-06-07 - 2019-11-28 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: INZHENER CHITANAVA - Crude Oil Tanker / 2017-11-10 - 2017-12-30 (2 months)
Motorman: ASPRO - General cargo / 2018-02-18 - 2018-09-16 (7 months)
Engine Cadet: ERNA - General cargo / 2017-11-08 - 2017-12-22 (1 month)
Motorman: Slavutich-16 - General cargo / 2010-04-02 - 2011-06-03 (1 year)
Trainee Engineer: JOHN ERNEST AIDOO - Tug boat / 2016-12-30 - 2017-08-31 (8 months)
Mechanic: Ankobra River - Tug boat / 2016-09-01 - 2016-12-09 (3 months)
Engine Cadet: CMA CGM MUSSET - Container Ship / 2017-06-20 - 2017-07-23 (1 month)
Motorman: Lady Amna - Bulk Carrier / 2016-07-05 - 2017-01-08 (6 months)
Motorman: Stony Lake - Bulk Carrier / 2015-06-14 - 2015-12-18 (6 months)
Wiper: MV WIN SHUEN SHING - Reefer / 2019-09-03 - 2019-12-27 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: MV EMPRESS AMY - General cargo / 2016-07-01 - 2017-07-08 (1 year)
Engine Cadet: Belomorskiy 11 - Dry Cargo / 2016-05-16 - 2016-12-16 (7 months)
Electric Cadet: m/t Energy Pioneer - Chemical tanker / 2016-07-10 - 2016-12-01 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: MT PATEA - Chemical tanker / 2016-05-26 - 2016-12-01 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: MV INNWA STAR - Container Ship / 2016-01-16 - 2016-10-17 (9 months)
Engine Cadet: Caspian Leader - Chemical tanker / 2016-02-21 - 2016-05-20 (3 months)
Engine Cadet: Fariz Ismailkhanov - Chemical tanker / 2015-06-03 - 2015-08-17 (2 months)
3rd Engineer: Martyn Latsis - Dry Cargo / 2016-10-10 - 2017-04-13 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: Piano - General cargo / 2015-10-23 - 2016-01-30 (3 months)
Engine Cadet: Aqua Line - General cargo / 2015-05-24 - 2015-10-23 (5 months)
4th Engineer: boffa - Fishing vessel / 2017-07-25 - 2018-01-27 (6 months)
3rd Engineer: ELISA - Other vessels / 2017-01-03 - 2017-02-26 (2 months)
Motorman: Cape stork - Bulk Carrier / 2016-01-30 - 2016-08-19 (7 months)
Engine Cadet: omskiy143 - General cargo / 2014-10-20 - 2015-05-27 (7 months)
Engine Cadet: Анатолий Пономарев - Fishing vessel / 2014-07-06 - 2014-10-06 (3 months)
OS: Sormovskiy-45 - Bulk Carrier / 2016-12-16 - 2017-05-28 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: Maxal Seed - Bulk Carrier / 2016-02-15 - 2016-09-15 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: Captain Michalis - Tug boat / 2015-07-31 - 2015-09-30 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: Rowangarth - Tug boat / 2015-02-02 - 2015-04-04 (2 months)
Motorman: Delta Reefer - Reefer / 2016-09-27 - 2017-04-26 (7 months)
Motorman: Delta Reefer - Reefer / 2015-05-19 - 2015-12-03 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: Nikolay Konarev - RO-RO / 2012-12-17 - 2012-12-29 (12 days)
Engine Cadet: Apollonia - RO-RO / 2012-12-17 - 2012-12-29 (12 days)
Engine Cadet: palencia - Container Ship / 2009-09-19 - 2010-03-19 (6 months)
No Experience
No Experience
No Experience
No Experience