Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Chief Officer: Laganborg - General cargo / 2024-07-11 - 2024-10-11 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Ohioborg - General cargo / 2023-07-14 - 2024-04-30 (10 months)
Chief Officer: Ohioborg - General cargo / 2022-11-04 - 2023-05-01 (6 months)
Chief Officer: Lady Anna - General cargo / 2021-12-16 - 2022-02-01 (2 months)
Chief Officer: Sylvia - General cargo / 2021-04-04 - 2021-08-29 (5 months)
Chief Officer: Istra Ace - RO-RO / 2024-04-25 - 2024-09-10 (5 months)
Chief Officer: RCC Tianjin - RO-RO / 2023-05-14 - 2023-09-30 (5 months)
Chief Officer: Crystal Ray - RO-RO / 2022-09-15 - 2023-02-15 (5 months)
Chief Officer: Garnet Leader - RO-RO / 2021-08-05 - 2021-12-20 (4 months)
Chief Officer: RCC Europe - RO-RO / 2020-12-08 - 2021-05-07 (5 months)
Chief Officer: Seaways 10 - AHT / 2024-05-05 - 2024-09-10 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Sea Latch - AHTS / 2023-10-23 - 2023-11-22 (1 month)
Chief Officer: Odissey - Tug boat / 2023-06-09 - 2023-09-09 (3 months)
Chief Officer: EEMS WARRIOR - AHTS / 2022-08-18 - 2022-10-27 (2 months)
Chief Officer: Socotra Dream - Passenger vessel / 2021-05-16 - 2021-06-17 (1 month)
Chief Officer: Aila - Container Ship / 2024-07-24 - 2024-09-04 (1 month)
Chief Officer: Linda - Container Ship / 2024-05-17 - 2024-06-28 (1 month)
Chief Officer: Arkadia - Bulk Carrier / 2024-03-25 - 2024-05-13 (2 months)
Chief Officer: Arkadia - Bulk Carrier / 2023-08-04 - 2023-11-19 (3 months)
Master: George - Construction vessel / 2023-05-15 - 2023-07-27 (2 months)
Chief Officer: BOS Rincess - Platform Supply vessel / 2024-05-09 - 2024-08-09 (3 months)
Chief Officer: BOS Rincess - Platform Supply vessel / 2023-11-10 - 2024-03-10 (4 months)
Chief Officer: VOS Princess - Platform Supply vessel / 2023-05-25 - 2023-09-01 (3 months)
Chief Officer: VOS Princess - Platform Supply vessel / 2023-01-25 - 2023-03-25 (2 months)
Senior DPO: VOS Principle - Platform Supply vessel / 2022-08-06 - 2022-11-18 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Belgravia V - LPG / LNG / 2024-04-12 - 2024-07-30 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Pazifik - LPG / LNG / 2020-12-29 - 2021-04-16 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Yara Sela - LPG / LNG / 2020-02-08 - 2020-08-03 (6 months)
Chief Officer: Polar - LPG / LNG / 2019-01-09 - 2019-05-09 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Yara Aesa - LPG / LNG / 2018-03-15 - 2018-08-22 (5 months)
Chief Officer: Oslo Bulk 2 - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2023-12-15 - 2024-07-28 (7 months)
Chief Officer: Oslo Bulk 1 - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2023-01-31 - 2023-08-20 (7 months)
Chief Officer: Oslo Bulk 1 - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2022-02-20 - 2022-09-22 (7 months)
Chief Officer: Oslo Bulk 2 - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2021-07-16 - 2021-11-28 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Oslo Bulk 9 - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2020-10-25 - 2021-03-13 (5 months)
Chief Officer: EVONA - Bulk Carrier / 2024-02-22 - 2024-07-27 (5 months)
Chief Officer: Elati - Bulk Carrier / 2022-10-18 - 2023-06-27 (8 months)
Chief Officer: Navios Fantastiks - Bulk Carrier / 2021-02-18 - 2021-08-15 (6 months)
Chief Officer: Navios Fantastiks - Bulk Carrier / 2019-10-19 - 2020-07-11 (9 months)
Chief Officer: Navios Antares - Bulk Carrier / 2018-09-16 - 2019-04-10 (7 months)
Chief Officer: Elong Elong - Bulk Carrier / 2024-02-16 - 2024-07-18 (5 months)
2nd Officer: Elias - Bulk Carrier / 2023-07-02 - 2023-10-16 (3 months)
2nd Officer: Maria L - Bulk Carrier / 2021-03-14 - 2022-08-03 (1 year)
2nd Officer: Serenada - General cargo / 2018-12-13 - 2019-05-13 (5 months)
2nd Officer: Serenada - General cargo / 2018-04-13 - 2018-08-18 (4 months)
Chief Officer: BGP Dragon - Seismic vessel / 2024-04-17 - 2024-07-15 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Atlantic Tonjer - Construction vessel / 2024-02-02 - 2024-03-15 (1 month)
Chief Officer: Atlantic Tonjer - DSV (Diving Support) / 2023-12-01 - 2024-01-05 (1 month)
Chief Officer: Atlantic Tonjer - DSV (Diving Support) / 2023-07-29 - 2023-11-01 (3 months)
Chief Officer: VOS Patience - Platform Supply vessel / 2023-06-01 - 2023-06-29 (1 month)
Chief Officer: M/T Hafnia Pacific - Chemical tanker / 2024-04-06 - 2024-07-07 (3 months)
Chief Officer: M/T BW Merlin - Oil Products Tanker / 2023-10-26 - 2024-02-17 (4 months)
Chief Officer: M/T Chem Stream - Chemical tanker / 2023-03-19 - 2023-08-13 (5 months)
Chief Officer: M/T UACC MANAMA - Chemical tanker / 2022-02-07 - 2022-09-03 (7 months)
Chief Officer: M/T Celsius Miami - Chemical tanker / 2021-04-16 - 2021-09-16 (5 months)
Chief Officer: IONIC PATRIS - Bulk Carrier / 2024-01-30 - 2024-06-24 (5 months)
Chief Officer: IONIC SMYRNI - Bulk Carrier / 2022-12-10 - 2023-06-19 (6 months)
Chief Officer: IONIC PRIDE - Bulk Carrier / 2022-02-03 - 2022-06-09 (4 months)
Chief Officer: IONIC HAWK - Bulk Carrier / 2021-02-10 - 2021-09-20 (7 months)
Chief Officer: SABRINA I - Bulk Carrier / 2019-12-08 - 2020-07-30 (8 months)
Chief Officer: monjasa refiner - Chemical tanker / 2024-02-03 - 2024-06-06 (4 months)
Chief Officer: monjasa refiner - Chemical tanker / 2023-09-23 - 2023-11-27 (2 months)
2nd Officer: monjasa refiner - Chemical tanker / 2023-08-15 - 2023-09-22 (1 month)
2nd Officer: hafnia almandine - Chemical tanker / 2023-03-27 - 2023-06-09 (2 months)
2nd Officer: hafnia almandine - Chemical tanker / 2022-07-27 - 2022-11-18 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Layla - Platform Supply vessel / 2023-05-12 - 2024-05-31 (1 year)
Chief Officer: ALP Forward - AHT / 2021-12-01 - 2022-01-27 (2 months)
Senior DPO: VOS Prince - Platform Supply vessel / 2017-07-14 - 2021-02-28 (3 years)
Senior DPO: Reg McNee Tide - AHTS / 2016-03-29 - 2017-04-05 (1 year)
Senior DPO: Bourbon Liberty 253 - AHTS / 2015-07-26 - 2016-01-27 (6 months)
Chief Officer: Vivienne Sheri D - Container Ship / 2023-12-11 - 2024-05-04 (5 months)
Chief Officer: Naama Borchard - Container Ship / 2023-08-23 - 2023-11-27 (3 months)
2nd Officer: Vivienne Sheri D - Container Ship / 2022-08-06 - 2023-05-09 (9 months)
2nd Officer: Naama Borchard - Container Ship / 2022-05-31 - 2022-06-22 (1 month)
2nd Officer: EKNOE - General cargo / 2021-11-14 - 2022-05-21 (6 months)
Chief Officer: CMA CGM JACQUES JOSEPH - Container Ship / 2023-12-26 - 2024-05-04 (4 months)
Chief Officer: CMA CGM VIRGINIA - Container Ship / 2023-04-08 - 2023-10-18 (6 months)
Chief Officer: CMA CGM VIRGINIA - Container Ship / 2022-06-05 - 2022-11-26 (6 months)
Chief Officer: ROBIN 4 - Container Ship / 2021-12-02 - 2022-04-19 (5 months)
Chief Officer: OOCL RAUMA - Container Ship / 2021-04-09 - 2021-08-23 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Hafnia Azurite - Chemical tanker / 2023-12-07 - 2024-04-28 (5 months)
Chief Officer: Hafnia Amazonite - Chemical tanker / 2023-04-12 - 2023-08-04 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Hafnia Amazonite - Chemical tanker / 2022-09-27 - 2023-01-02 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Navig8 Aragonite - Chemical tanker / 2022-03-16 - 2022-06-29 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Navig8 Aragonite - Chemical tanker / 2021-07-20 - 2021-11-30 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Petrotrans-5905 - General cargo / 2023-11-30 - 2024-04-18 (5 months)
Chief Officer: Petrotrans-5904 - General cargo / 2023-07-19 - 2023-11-21 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Vetluga - Dry Cargo / 2023-03-29 - 2023-06-17 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Petrotrans-5903 - Dry Cargo / 2020-07-06 - 2021-02-14 (7 months)
2nd Officer: Ievoli Orange - AHTS / 2018-07-04 - 2018-10-04 (3 months)
Chief Officer: EDT Zenon - AHT / 2023-12-12 - 2024-04-18 (4 months)
Chief Officer: EDT Zenon - AHT / 2023-07-24 - 2023-10-12 (3 months)
Chief Officer: ASD Escort Terminal Tug "Murjan 4" - Tug boat / 2021-01-19 - 2021-09-15 (8 months)
Master: Gepard - Tug boat / 2019-08-03 - 2019-10-18 (2 months)
Chief Officer: Gepard - Tug boat / 2019-05-01 - 2019-07-05 (2 months)
Chief Officer: Senara - AHTS / 2024-02-21 - 2024-04-03 (1 month)
Master: Sowena - AHTS / 2024-01-10 - 2024-02-20 (1 month)
Chief Officer: Senara - AHTS / 2023-06-10 - 2023-10-19 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Sienna - AHTS / 2023-02-06 - 2023-04-21 (2 months)
Master: Silver Lovena - AHTS / 2022-04-12 - 2022-11-19 (7 months)