Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Chief Officer: Rade - AHT / 2022-12-07 - 2023-02-28 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Dixie Patriot - Jack-up Platform / 2022-08-10 - 2022-09-21 (1 month)
Chief Officer: Afon Cadnant - AHTS / 2021-06-20 - 2021-12-08 (6 months)
Chief Officer: Teras Conquest 1 - Jack-up Platform / 2020-02-04 - 2020-06-07 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Teras Conquest 1 - Jack-up Platform / 2019-10-01 - 2019-12-05 (2 months)
2nd Officer: Tulip - Livestock / 2022-04-08 - 2023-02-24 (11 months)
2nd Officer: Prince Farouk - Bulk Carrier / 2020-10-21 - 2021-05-28 (7 months)
3rd Officer: Nadalina - Container Ship / 2018-08-25 - 2019-01-31 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: Sunny Maria - Reefer / 2016-01-14 - 2017-05-24 (1 year)
Deck Cadet: Sarah F - General cargo / 2014-10-11 - 2015-07-16 (9 months)
Chief Officer: MS Sophie - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-07-29 - 2022-12-11 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Seychelles Patriot - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-05-24 - 2021-09-03 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Seychelles Patriot - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-10-03 - 2021-02-03 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Seychelles Patriot - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-01-22 - 2020-05-30 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Seychelles Patriot - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-05-12 - 2019-08-30 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Gas Sagittarius - LPG / LNG / 2022-04-01 - 2022-10-28 (7 months)
Chief Officer: BW Volans - LPG / LNG / 2020-11-11 - 2021-08-04 (9 months)
Chief Officer: Address Gas - LPG / LNG / 2019-04-16 - 2019-11-19 (7 months)
Chief Officer: Gas Diana - LPG / LNG / 2019-03-13 - 2019-04-15 (1 month)
Chief Officer: Ramagas - LPG / LNG / 2018-03-20 - 2018-11-09 (8 months)
Chief Officer: Montpellier - Container Ship / 2022-07-16 - 2022-10-19 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Spirit of Mumbai - Container Ship / 2022-06-05 - 2022-07-15 (1 month)
Chief Officer: Spirit Of Capetown - Container Ship / 2022-05-02 - 2022-05-28 (1 month)
Chief Officer: Pacific Dalian - Container Ship / 2021-09-06 - 2022-01-15 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Pacific Beijing - Container Ship / 2021-01-29 - 2021-06-09 (4 months)
Master: Novik Maria - Container Ship / 2024-03-10 - 2024-07-18 (4 months)
Master: Elbwater - Container Ship / 2023-05-04 - 2023-09-06 (4 months)
Master: Elbwater - Container Ship / 2022-10-12 - 2023-01-08 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Elbwater - Container Ship / 2022-06-28 - 2022-10-11 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Elbwater - Container Ship / 2021-09-26 - 2022-02-18 (5 months)
Chief Officer: BOZAT - General cargo / 2022-02-17 - 2022-06-17 (4 months)
Chief Officer: ANASTASIA - General cargo / 2021-07-17 - 2021-12-31 (5 months)
Chief Officer: NEW GEMINI - General cargo / 2021-01-14 - 2021-06-22 (5 months)
Chief Officer: IREM - General cargo / 2020-06-25 - 2020-12-21 (6 months)
Chief Officer: CATHERINE BRIGHT - Bulk Carrier / 2019-03-20 - 2019-12-21 (9 months)
Chief Officer: Mykonos - Bulk Carrier / 2021-10-03 - 2022-05-28 (8 months)
Chief Officer: Arnica - Bulk Carrier / 2020-09-23 - 2021-04-11 (7 months)
2nd Officer: Arnica - Bulk Carrier / 2019-04-29 - 2019-11-14 (7 months)
2nd Officer: Arvika - Bulk Carrier / 2018-03-16 - 2019-01-01 (10 months)
Chief Officer: OCEAN WINTER - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-10-20 - 2022-03-21 (5 months)
Chief Officer: OCEAN VOYAGER - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-02-16 - 2021-05-23 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Pyxis Theta - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-02-18 - 2020-06-28 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Pyxis Delta - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-12-07 - 2020-01-13 (1 month)
Chief Officer: Pyxis Delta - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-11-16 - 2019-07-07 (8 months)
Chief Officer: Scout - General cargo / 2021-09-02 - 2022-02-10 (5 months)
2nd Officer: Scout - General cargo / 2020-08-30 - 2021-02-25 (6 months)
2nd Officer: Scout - General cargo / 2019-10-24 - 2020-03-05 (4 months)
2nd Officer: Merton 1 - General cargo / 2019-01-21 - 2019-06-24 (5 months)
2nd Officer: Merton 1 - General cargo / 2018-04-27 - 2018-09-10 (4 months)
Chief Officer: ALESSANDRA M - Bulk Carrier / 2021-02-05 - 2021-12-02 (10 months)
Chief Officer: Persey - Container Ship / 2020-05-16 - 2020-08-16 (3 months)
Chief Officer: REGION 87 - Bulk Carrier / 2019-06-19 - 2020-01-04 (7 months)
Chief Officer: REGION 87 - Bulk Carrier / 2018-10-17 - 2019-02-20 (4 months)
Chief Officer: NAYADA - Container Ship / 2018-08-09 - 2018-10-09 (2 months)
Chief Officer: Serene Jessica - Bulk Carrier / 2021-05-09 - 2021-11-21 (6 months)
Chief Officer: Serene Jessica - Bulk Carrier / 2020-03-11 - 2020-07-28 (5 months)
Chief Officer: Serene Jessica - Bulk Carrier / 2019-10-01 - 2020-02-20 (5 months)
Chief Officer: Ocean Pearl - Bulk Carrier / 2019-04-30 - 2019-08-30 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Sider Cartagena - General cargo / 2018-03-27 - 2018-10-08 (6 months)
Master: ERTEA - Bulk Carrier / 2023-10-23 - 2024-02-25 (4 months)
Master: FOUR OTELLO - Bulk Carrier / 2023-01-07 - 2023-05-16 (4 months)
Master: FOUR NABUCCO - Bulk Carrier / 2022-02-17 - 2022-07-28 (5 months)
Chief Officer: FOUR TURANDOT - Bulk Carrier / 2021-06-06 - 2021-11-19 (5 months)
Chief Officer: FOUR TURANDOT - Bulk Carrier / 2020-06-29 - 2021-01-15 (7 months)
3rd Officer: Great Kappa - Chemical tanker / 2024-04-14 - 2024-08-09 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Great Kappa - Chemical tanker / 2023-08-23 - 2023-12-31 (4 months)
Chief Officer: RHL Augsburg - Chemical tanker / 2021-06-22 - 2021-09-15 (3 months)
Chief Officer: RHL Augsburg - Chemical tanker / 2020-11-06 - 2021-02-22 (4 months)
Chief Officer: RHL Augsburg - Chemical tanker / 2020-03-12 - 2020-07-27 (4 months)
Chief Officer: MEO Galaxy - MRSV / 2021-05-08 - 2021-08-16 (3 months)
Chief Officer: MEO Galaxy - MRSV / 2020-10-07 - 2021-03-01 (5 months)
Chief Officer: Almostakshif - MRSV / 2019-10-19 - 2020-01-21 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Seamar Splendid - DSV (Diving Support) / 2019-07-25 - 2019-09-18 (2 months)
Chief Officer: Seamar Splendid - DSV (Diving Support) / 2019-03-20 - 2019-05-17 (2 months)
Master: Ocean Cod - Chemical tanker / 2021-12-07 - 2022-04-30 (5 months)
Chief Officer: Ocean Cod - Chemical tanker / 2021-04-07 - 2021-08-15 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Sichem Singapore - Chemical tanker / 2020-06-22 - 2020-10-25 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Sichem Singapore - Chemical tanker / 2019-09-18 - 2020-01-19 (4 months)
Master: La Selva - Bulk Carrier / 2022-07-19 - 2022-12-06 (5 months)
Master: Federal Tambo - Bulk Carrier / 2021-09-23 - 2022-03-17 (6 months)
Chief Officer: Federal Sable - Bulk Carrier / 2021-02-18 - 2021-07-08 (5 months)
Chief Officer: Federal Swift - Bulk Carrier / 2019-11-17 - 2020-08-01 (8 months)
Chief Officer: Lowlands Hope - Bulk Carrier / 2019-02-13 - 2019-08-06 (6 months)
Chief Officer: Ventus - General cargo / 2020-11-20 - 2021-05-13 (6 months)
Chief Officer: Steel cougar - Dry Cargo / 2019-02-27 - 2019-09-10 (6 months)
Chief Officer: Wisla - Bulk Carrier / 2017-01-11 - 2017-06-27 (6 months)
Chief Officer: Ionian sea - Bulk Carrier / 2016-04-19 - 2016-06-24 (2 months)
Chief Officer: Aristoklis K - Bulk Carrier / 2015-11-22 - 2016-04-19 (5 months)
Chief Officer: ALMI ODYSSEY - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-12-27 - 2021-04-24 (4 months)
Chief Officer: DIAMONDWAY - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-10-13 - 2020-02-17 (4 months)
Chief Officer: NOBLEWAY - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-08-19 - 2018-12-29 (4 months)
Chief Officer: NOBLEWAY - Crude Oil Tanker / 2017-10-10 - 2018-04-14 (6 months)
Chief Officer: MARITIME JEWEL - VLCC / 2017-05-12 - 2017-06-06 (1 month)
Chief Officer: FEDERAL SUTTON - Bulk Carrier / 2020-08-01 - 2021-02-07 (6 months)
Chief Officer: FEDERALSPRUCE - Bulk Carrier / 2019-05-13 - 2020-01-04 (8 months)
Chief Officer: FEDERAL TAKASE - Bulk Carrier / 2018-06-16 - 2018-10-20 (4 months)
Chief Officer: ORIENT ALLIANCE - Bulk Carrier / 2017-11-29 - 2018-03-07 (3 months)
Chief Officer: ORIENT ALLIANCE - Bulk Carrier / 2017-03-16 - 2017-08-21 (5 months)