Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
AB Seaman: IRON BARON V - Bulk Carrier / 2017-12-31 - 2018-06-16 (6 months)
OS: PERFECT - General cargo / 2017-04-08 - 2017-09-17 (5 months)
AB Seaman: CUERA - General cargo / 2016-07-08 - 2016-12-10 (5 months)
OS: Irkutsk - Dry Cargo / 2018-02-01 - 2018-06-05 (4 months)
OS: Irkutsk - Dry Cargo / 2017-01-09 - 2017-08-02 (7 months)
OS: Luka Kapikrayan - Dry Cargo / 2015-11-20 - 2016-06-15 (7 months)
OS: Nikifor Sholudenko - General cargo / 2015-04-17 - 2015-10-20 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Евгений Косяков - Cruise Liner / 2014-03-10 - 2014-04-09 (1 month)
Deck Cadet: Викинг - Fishing vessel / 2018-02-09 - 2018-04-18 (2 months)
AB Seaman: Drait - General cargo / 2017-03-14 - 2018-01-16 (10 months)
AB Seaman: Drait - General cargo / 2017-03-11 - 2017-07-05 (4 months)
AB Seaman: Drait - General cargo / 2016-08-13 - 2016-11-25 (3 months)
AB Seaman: Australia - Tug boat / 2017-10-03 - 2017-12-30 (3 months)
OS: Kuttabul - Tug boat / 2016-09-15 - 2017-07-01 (10 months)
OS: Melwill - Coaster / 2016-07-01 - 2016-09-09 (2 months)
OS: Melwill - Coaster / 2015-10-01 - 2016-05-13 (7 months)
OS: Cpt Marko - Passenger vessel / 2017-06-03 - 2017-10-31 (5 months)
AB Seaman: Crimea - Fishing vessel / 2017-07-16 - 2017-08-04 (1 month)
AB Seaman: Alexander Mironenko - Fishing vessel / 2016-07-12 - 2016-11-29 (5 months)
1st Officer: Sea Dove - Bulk Carrier / 2022-03-16 - 2022-10-08 (7 months)
2nd Officer: Sea dove - Bulk Carrier / 2020-02-16 - 2022-03-15 (2 years)
3rd Officer: Ibrahim bey - General cargo / 2018-11-12 - 2019-09-09 (10 months)
AB Seaman: Ibrahim bey - General cargo / 2016-10-09 - 2017-07-06 (9 months)
AB Seaman: Ahmad prince - General cargo / 2014-11-16 - 2015-10-21 (11 months)
Boatswain: tecoil pokaris - Chemical tanker / 2017-08-29 - 2017-12-22 (4 months)
AB Seaman: vilesh river - Chemical tanker / 2016-12-11 - 2017-05-05 (5 months)
AB Seaman: nasiba zeynalova - Chemical tanker / 2016-03-03 - 2016-08-02 (5 months)
AB Seaman: palflot 5 - Oil Products Tanker / 2015-10-03 - 2015-11-27 (2 months)
AB Seaman: palflot 5 - Oil Products Tanker / 2015-02-07 - 2015-06-14 (4 months)
Boatswain: Oriole - Chemical tanker / 2023-06-01 - 2024-04-01 (10 months)
AB Seaman: РН Самара - Bunkering Vessel / 2016-11-22 - 2017-03-20 (4 months)
AB Seaman: РН Самара - Oil Products Tanker / 2016-03-16 - 2016-09-18 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Юлий Макаренков - Oil Products Tanker / 2015-09-11 - 2016-02-08 (5 months)
AB Seaman: Дмитрий Покровский - Oil Products Tanker / 2015-03-10 - 2015-08-12 (5 months)
AB Seaman: ANNA - Coaster / 2016-08-28 - 2017-03-17 (7 months)
OS: Volgo Balt 244 - General cargo / 2014-10-31 - 2015-03-19 (5 months)
2nd Officer: m/v ANGARA - Other vessels / 2022-01-21 - 2022-10-22 (9 months)
AB Seaman: m/v SALGIR - Other vessels / 2016-02-28 - 2016-09-29 (7 months)
AB Seaman: m/v SALGIR - Other vessels / 2015-01-08 - 2015-08-21 (7 months)
OS: m/v SALGIR - Other vessels / 2013-12-03 - 2014-07-08 (7 months)
OS: m/v SALGIR - Other vessels / 2012-08-21 - 2013-05-09 (9 months)
Deck Cadet: [Alexander Zhytnykk - Dry Cargo / 2015-08-25 - 2015-10-26 (2 months)
OS: [Alexander Zhytnykk - Dry Cargo / 2015-08-25 - 2015-10-26 (2 months)
OS: Pacific Future - Dry Cargo / 2014-08-20 - 2014-11-20 (3 months)
AB Seaman: Rawabi19 - Platform Supply vessel / 2014-02-12 - 2014-08-08 (6 months)
OS: Danapris 4 - Dry Cargo / 2012-10-12 - 2014-02-04 (1 year)
OS: m/v - Passenger vessel / 2012-07-09 - 2012-09-07 (2 months)
AB Seaman: Nederland - Container Ship / 2013-07-20 - 2014-03-14 (8 months)
AB Seaman: Nederland - Container Ship / 2013-07-20 - 2014-03-14 (8 months)
AB Seaman: Nederland - Container Ship / 2013-07-20 - 2014-03-14 (8 months)
Boatswain: Zaliv Amursky - Crude Oil Tanker / 2015-08-24 - 2016-02-24 (6 months)
Boatswain: Prisco Irina - Crude Oil Tanker / 2014-08-02 - 2015-03-05 (7 months)
AB Seaman: Zaliv Amerika - Crude Oil Tanker / 2013-05-08 - 2013-10-22 (5 months)
AB Seaman: Prisco Elena - Crude Oil Tanker / 2012-02-24 - 2012-09-16 (7 months)
AB Seaman: Zaliv Vostok - Crude Oil Tanker / 2011-03-26 - 2011-10-24 (7 months)
AB Seaman: Luke - LPG / LNG / 2013-01-28 - 2013-08-18 (7 months)
AB Seaman: Ngol Cassai - LPG / LNG / 2010-03-29 - 2010-10-01 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Ngol Cassai - LPG / LNG / 2009-02-28 - 2009-10-28 (8 months)
OS: Front Lady - VLCC / 2007-11-21 - 2008-06-29 (7 months)
OS: The IRIS - Passenger vessel / 2007-03-13 - 2007-08-26 (5 months)
AB Seaman: Victoria - Reefer / 2012-07-19 - 2013-01-08 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Victoria - Reefer / 2012-07-19 - 2013-01-08 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Blue Wave - Reefer / 2008-06-04 - 2009-02-08 (8 months)
AB Seaman: Blue Wave - Reefer / 2007-08-20 - 2008-04-12 (8 months)
Boatswain: UMD HERCULES - Dredger / 2017-08-01 - 2017-11-01 (3 months)
AB / Crane Operator: H/D SEVERODVINSKIY / Moldova - Dredger / 2015-08-09 - 2016-04-13 (8 months)
Boatswain: YUZHNYY - Oil Products Tanker / 2013-08-05 - 2013-12-31 (5 months)
Boatswain: Anatoly Churinov - Coaster / 2012-10-01 - 2013-03-20 (6 months)
AB Seaman: ASTRA - Other vessels / 2011-05-01 - 2012-09-01 (1 year)
Cook: Хампбаквал - Fishing vessel / 2013-10-31 - 2014-01-20 (3 months)
Cook: Antlantic Lady - Reefer / 2012-09-23 - 2013-03-10 (5 months)
AB Seaman: Polar One - Fishing vessel / 2009-10-20 - 2010-02-03 (3 months)
AB-Cook: Nordic - Fishing vessel / 2008-12-15 - 2009-05-07 (5 months)
AB-Cook: Nordic - Fishing vessel / 2007-01-25 - 2007-08-25 (7 months)