Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Boatswain: Atlantic bridge - Container Ship / 2018-06-09 - 2018-11-28 (6 months)
OS: Max sun - Container Ship / 2018-03-31 - 2018-06-08 (2 months)
Boatswain: Amsel - Bulk Carrier / 2017-02-26 - 2017-11-25 (9 months)
Boatswain: Com R - Standby-safety vessel / 2015-11-25 - 2016-08-09 (8 months)
AB Seaman: Athens - Cement Carrier / 2015-05-09 - 2015-09-26 (5 months)
AB Seaman: Mt tigris - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-01-20 - 2018-10-06 (9 months)
AB Seaman: Mt blue crystal - Oil Products Tanker / 2016-08-05 - 2017-05-30 (10 months)
AB Seaman: Mt thayer - Crude Oil Tanker / 2015-04-25 - 2016-01-14 (9 months)
AB Seaman: Mt ocean spirit - Oil Products Tanker / 2014-03-07 - 2014-12-29 (10 months)
AB Seaman: OLTENITSA - General cargo / 2017-12-28 - 2018-06-03 (5 months)
AB Seaman: Gerda - Dry Cargo / 2016-12-28 - 2017-08-16 (8 months)
AB / Welder: Pearl - Dry Cargo / 2016-09-21 - 2016-11-24 (2 months)
OS: A.Karastayanov - Dry Cargo / 2012-10-08 - 2013-02-09 (4 months)
AB Seaman: ICE CONDOR - Crude Oil Tanker / 2017-12-09 - 2018-05-20 (5 months)
AB Seaman: ICE CONDOR - Crude Oil Tanker / 2016-12-07 - 2017-06-02 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Ice Condor - Crude Oil Tanker / 2016-04-28 - 2016-08-21 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: Ice Eagle - Crude Oil Tanker / 2015-08-22 - 2015-11-09 (3 months)
AB Seaman: ZIRCON - Chemical tanker / 2018-03-04 - 2018-04-06 (1 month)
AB Seaman: Vitta Theresa - Chemical tanker / 2009-02-03 - 2016-04-18 (7 years)
AB Seaman: Vitta Theresa - Chemical tanker / 2009-02-03 - 2009-06-18 (4 months)
AB Seaman: Annelise Theresa - Oil Products Tanker / 2008-04-30 - 2008-06-05 (1 month)
AB Seaman: Luca Ievoli - Chemical tanker / 2006-08-15 - 2006-12-24 (4 months)
AB-Cook: SEA HUNTER - Standby-safety vessel / 2017-09-14 - 2018-01-30 (5 months)
AB Seaman: THORCO SKY - General cargo / 2017-05-04 - 2017-08-20 (4 months)
AB Seaman: DILESI - Chemical tanker / 2016-04-28 - 2016-09-17 (5 months)
AB Seaman: DILESI - Chemical tanker / 2015-06-01 - 2015-10-02 (4 months)
AB Seaman: PHOBUS - General cargo / 2013-12-14 - 2014-04-16 (4 months)
AB Seaman: АК-0657 "КАПЕЛАН" - Fishing vessel / 2017-08-05 - 2017-11-03 (3 months)
AB Seaman: МК-0188 "Комарно" - Fishing vessel / 2017-05-04 - 2017-07-12 (2 months)
OS: "Академик Немчинов" - Seismic vessel / 2017-03-02 - 2017-03-27 (1 month)
OS: М-0178 "Светлана" - Fishing vessel / 2016-07-09 - 2017-02-03 (7 months)
AB Seaman: STK-1031 - Dry Cargo / 2016-08-11 - 2016-11-18 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: Nevsky - 31 - Dry Cargo / 2015-04-13 - 2015-06-27 (2 months)
AB Seaman: Volgoneft-254 - Oil Products Tanker / 2016-04-18 - 2016-08-31 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: Lensk - Oil Products Tanker / 2015-06-23 - 2015-08-25 (2 months)
AB Seaman: G.B.ATLANTIC - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2016-02-09 - 2016-05-11 (3 months)
AB Seaman: MORNING MIRACLE - RO-RO / 2013-12-20 - 2014-08-11 (8 months)
AB Seaman: WUGANG ASIA - Dry Cargo / 2012-11-13 - 2013-07-20 (8 months)
AB Seaman: SEAGATE - Dry Cargo / 2011-11-15 - 2012-03-14 (4 months)
AB Seaman: WUGANG ORIENT - Dry Cargo / 2010-08-01 - 2011-07-02 (11 months)
AB Seaman: Bade - General cargo / 2015-09-02 - 2016-03-19 (7 months)
2nd Officer: Temixrov 3 - General cargo / 2010-10-12 - 2014-06-17 (3 years)
AB Seaman: Vlogobalt 214 - General cargo / 2013-02-20 - 2013-07-08 (5 months)
AB Seaman: Mauritz - Bulk Carrier / 2010-10-12 - 2011-06-15 (8 months)
2nd Officer: Petr Hamitov - General cargo / 2017-11-29 - 2018-06-20 (7 months)
AB Seaman: Gb Pacific - General cargo / 2015-05-30 - 2015-09-22 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: Ambrosia - Crude Oil Tanker / 2013-09-30 - 2014-03-07 (5 months)
Motorman: Tundra - Bulk Carrier / 2016-12-24 - 2017-07-25 (7 months)
Motorman: Thebe - Bulk Carrier / 2015-11-07 - 2016-07-03 (8 months)
AB Seaman: Zeus I - Bulk Carrier / 2014-09-29 - 2015-05-27 (8 months)
AB Seaman: Maccoa - Bulk Carrier / 2013-11-13 - 2014-05-26 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Labrador - Bulk Carrier / 2013-02-04 - 2013-08-12 (6 months)
OS: Viana Do Castelo - General cargo / 2016-06-17 - 2017-01-05 (7 months)
OS: Viana Do Castelo - General cargo / 2015-12-18 - 2016-05-30 (5 months)
OS: Geros - Dry Cargo / 2015-02-26 - 2015-07-20 (5 months)
AB Seaman: Kazakh - Dry Cargo / 2014-11-01 - 2014-12-23 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: BURUN - Tug boat / 2014-03-21 - 2014-05-24 (2 months)
AB Seaman: Cheyenne - General cargo / 2014-04-01 - 2014-06-18 (3 months)
3rd Officer: Altrany - General cargo / 2012-11-29 - 2013-03-16 (3 months)
OS: Iron Queen - Bulk Carrier / 2009-11-22 - 2010-06-05 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Argus - Tug boat / 2007-05-22 - 2007-09-05 (3 months)
3rd Officer: Sky power - Chemical tanker / 2017-02-25 - 2017-06-29 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Oralynn - Crude Oil Tanker / 2016-06-26 - 2016-10-26 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Oraluna - Crude Oil Tanker / 2014-12-17 - 2015-07-19 (7 months)
3rd Officer: Leon Herc - Crude Oil Tanker / 2013-10-23 - 2014-06-17 (8 months)
AB Seaman: EKOLE - LPG / LNG / 2012-10-20 - 2013-04-22 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Heinrich G - Dry Cargo / 2012-09-09 - 2013-03-09 (6 months)
AB Seaman: BBC Elbe - General cargo / 2012-01-25 - 2012-06-09 (4 months)
AB Seaman: BBC Oder - Heavy lift vessel / 2011-06-06 - 2011-12-03 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Sjard - General cargo / 2010-08-13 - 2011-02-02 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Petkum - Container Ship / 2009-10-17 - 2010-04-22 (6 months)
AB / Welder: m/vForte - General cargo / 2012-06-07 - 2012-09-16 (3 months)
AB / Crane Operator: Green-Atlantic - Reefer / 2011-12-19 - 2012-04-26 (4 months)
AB Seaman: Boekelnburg - Container Ship / 1994-06-25 - 1994-12-10 (5 months)
AB / Crane Operator: Uranus - Other vessels / 1994-03-02 - 1994-08-07 (5 months)
AB / Crane Operator: m/vFIONIA - Container Ship / 1993-12-25 - 1994-05-14 (5 months)
AB Seaman: baltic monarch - Chemical tanker / 2012-03-07 - 2012-09-07 (6 months)
AB Seaman: giannutri - Chemical tanker / 2010-05-07 - 2011-10-19 (1 year)
AB Seaman: baltic favour - Chemical tanker / 2010-05-14 - 2010-12-21 (7 months)
OS: Arctic bay - Chemical tanker / 2009-02-02 - 2009-08-15 (6 months)
OS: baltic force - Chemical tanker / 2008-06-10 - 2008-10-04 (4 months)
AB Seaman: Sky Pegasus - Reefer / 2010-01-12 - 2011-06-30 (1 year)
AB Seaman: Bruin - Reefer / 2010-04-09 - 2010-07-15 (3 months)
AB Seaman: Fedra - General cargo / 2009-04-10 - 2009-11-07 (7 months)
AB Seaman: Seagull - Reefer / 2008-07-10 - 2009-02-21 (7 months)