Сохранить
Закрыть
Добавить моряка в избранное
Удалить моряка из избранного
4th Engineer: ODYSSEY - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-11-09 - 2022-06-06 (7 месяцев)
4th Engineer: EVER LOADING - Bulk Carrier / 2020-07-29 - 2021-03-05 (7 месяцев)
4th Engineer: EVER LOADING - Bulk Carrier / 2019-08-05 - 2019-11-24 (4 месяца)
4th Engineer: EVER LOADING - Bulk Carrier / 2018-11-13 - 2019-05-09 (6 месяцев)
Oiler: EVER LOADING - Bulk Carrier / 2018-05-08 - 2018-09-06 (4 месяца)
Trainee Wiper: MV DANUM 175 - Container Ship / 2021-05-06 - 2022-06-04 (1 год)
AB Seaman: Gaz Serenity - LPG / LNG / 2021-12-01 - 2022-06-04 (6 месяцев)
Deck Cadet: Mir - Training Ship / 2022-04-01 - 2022-06-01 (2 месяца)
Receptionist: Reise Riese Classic - Passenger vessel / 2022-04-14 - 2022-06-01 (2 месяца)
Receptionist: River Voyager - Passenger vessel / 2022-03-23 - 2022-04-13 (1 месяц)
Receptionist: Vista Sun - Passenger vessel / 2021-12-01 - 2021-12-29 (1 месяц)
Receptionist: Vista Star - Passenger vessel / 2021-07-02 - 2021-11-03 (4 месяца)
Receptionist: Katharina von Bora - Passenger vessel / 2020-06-18 - 2020-10-12 (4 месяца)
Master: Bourbon Liberty 320 - AHTS / 2022-01-21 - 2022-06-01 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Bourbon Liberty 305 - AHTS / 2021-07-29 - 2021-10-20 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Bourbon Liberty 305 - AHTS / 2021-01-13 - 2021-04-22 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Bourbon Liberty 305 - AHTS / 2020-09-24 - 2020-11-01 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: Bourbon Liberty 160 - Platform Supply vessel / 2020-07-20 - 2020-09-15 (2 месяца)
AB / Crane Operator: DIANA - Heavy lift vessel / 2021-12-28 - 2022-05-29 (5 месяцев)
AB / Crane Operator: MILENA - Heavy lift vessel / 2020-05-30 - 2020-10-22 (5 месяцев)
Chief Engineer: St. Columba - Bulk Carrier / 2022-01-09 - 2022-05-24 (4 месяца)
Chief Engineer: St, Peter - Bulk Carrier / 2021-06-30 - 2021-09-09 (2 месяца)
Chief Engineer: St Patrick - Bulk Carrier / 2021-03-18 - 2021-05-04 (2 месяца)
Chief Engineer: OMAHA - Bulk Carrier / 2020-03-15 - 2020-11-21 (8 месяцев)
Chief Engineer: Thuargau - Bulk Carrier / 2020-01-07 - 2020-02-21 (1 месяц)
2nd Engineer: Arch Gabriel - Bulk Carrier / 2022-01-31 - 2022-05-13 (3 месяца)
2nd Engineer: True Love - Bulk Carrier / 2020-08-28 - 2021-02-03 (5 месяцев)
2nd Engineer: True Love - Bulk Carrier / 2019-09-09 - 2020-04-25 (8 месяцев)
2nd Engineer: Good Luck - Bulk Carrier / 2018-12-14 - 2019-05-09 (5 месяцев)
2nd Engineer: Chestnut - Bulk Carrier / 2018-04-15 - 2018-10-05 (6 месяцев)
OS: Atlantic Pioneer - Container Ship / 2021-10-23 - 2022-05-11 (7 месяцев)
OS: m/v Panda - Bulk Carrier / 2021-03-12 - 2021-09-11 (6 месяцев)
DP Officer: Nordic prince - ROV Support vessel / 2021-07-14 - 2022-05-09 (10 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Stanford Hawk - ROV Support vessel / 2022-02-02 - 2022-05-03 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Stanford Hawk - ROV Support vessel / 2021-07-25 - 2021-11-03 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Aries - Standby-safety vessel / 2020-09-14 - 2021-05-12 (8 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Stanford Hawk - DSV (Diving Support) / 2019-11-23 - 2020-02-24 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Stanford Hawk - DSV (Diving Support) / 2019-06-01 - 2019-09-15 (3 месяца)
2nd Engineer: ORION I - Construction vessel / 2021-10-14 - 2022-04-30 (7 месяцев)
3rd Engineer: La Lama - Bulk Carrier / 2021-05-10 - 2021-08-16 (3 месяца)
3rd Engineer: Federal Swift - Bulk Carrier / 2020-07-10 - 2021-01-17 (6 месяцев)
3rd Engineer: Federal Trident - Bulk Carrier / 2019-06-09 - 2020-05-08 (11 месяцев)
3rd Engineer: Federal Swift - Bulk Carrier / 2018-10-18 - 2019-05-07 (7 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Taipei Trader - Container Ship / 2021-10-31 - 2022-04-22 (6 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Antwerp Trader - Container Ship / 2021-01-27 - 2021-06-19 (5 месяцев)
3rd Officer: CAPT. KATTLEMANN - Container Ship / 2019-12-20 - 2020-05-27 (5 месяцев)
3rd Officer: SIMA SAHBA - Container Ship / 2019-03-25 - 2019-10-15 (7 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Cherry - Container Ship / 2018-08-02 - 2019-01-28 (6 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Conmar Moon - Container Ship / 2021-10-03 - 2022-04-13 (6 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Conmar Fjord - Container Ship / 2020-12-11 - 2021-04-30 (5 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Samskip Estrella - Container Ship / 2020-02-12 - 2020-08-06 (6 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Conmar Avenue - Container Ship / 2019-06-28 - 2019-12-19 (6 месяцев)
2nd Officer: M.T. VARUNI - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-04-29 - 2022-04-12 (11 месяцев)
2nd Officer: M.T. GULF STAR-1 - Bunkering Vessel / 2019-09-05 - 2020-11-01 (1 год)
2nd Officer: M.T. SOCHIMA - Chemical tanker / 2018-03-26 - 2019-04-03 (1 год)
3rd Officer: M.T. SOCHIMA - Chemical tanker / 2017-06-01 - 2018-03-25 (10 месяцев)
Deck Supervisor: Aurelia - Passenger vessel / 2021-10-01 - 2022-04-12 (6 месяцев)
Steward: Commodor Clipper - Ferry / 2020-07-05 - 2020-09-15 (2 месяца)
Chief Steward: Leviathan Gas Platform - Drilling platform / 2020-01-19 - 2020-03-04 (1 месяц)
Waiter: Harmony G - Yacht / 2019-09-20 - 2019-10-10 (1 месяц)
Shop staff: Golden Princess - Cruise Liner / 2019-06-04 - 2019-08-13 (2 месяца)
Deck Cadet: Dunay - Bulk Carrier / 2021-11-18 - 2022-04-04 (5 месяцев)
Deck Cadet: Santana - General cargo / 2021-05-15 - 2021-11-12 (6 месяцев)
Deck Cadet: Хаджибей - Passenger vessel / 2020-07-15 - 2020-08-31 (2 месяца)
Engine Cadet: AMET JEWEL - Training Ship / 2020-12-24 - 2022-03-25 (1 год)
Deck Fitter: Scot munchen - Bunkering Vessel / 2021-11-15 - 2022-03-19 (4 месяца)
OS / Welder: Nazan - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-04-01 - 2021-08-15 (4 месяца)