Сохранить
Закрыть
Добавить моряка в избранное
Удалить моряка из избранного
2nd Officer: BBC Brisbane - General cargo / 2012-09-17 - 2013-02-01 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: BBC Iceland - General cargo / 2011-12-24 - 2012-06-03 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: BBC Brisbane - General cargo / 2011-05-30 - 2011-10-08 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Wilson Trent - Bulk Carrier / 2010-12-08 - 2011-03-16 (3 месяца)
3rd Officer: Wilson Lahn - General cargo / 2010-05-23 - 2010-10-12 (5 месяцев)
OS: GENCO PICARDY V.SHIPS BULKER MAN B - Bulk Carrier / 2012-05-12 - 2013-01-21 (8 месяцев)
OS: GENCO NORMANDY - Bulk Carrier / 2011-02-07 - 2011-08-05 (6 месяцев)
OS: GENCO PYRENEES - Bulk Carrier / 2010-06-10 - 2010-11-17 (5 месяцев)
OS: MAJOR - Bulk Carrier / 2009-07-15 - 2010-02-04 (7 месяцев)
OS: DALIOR - Bulk Carrier / 2008-09-01 - 2009-02-11 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Halliburton 301 - Well-stimulation vessel / 2012-09-10 - 2012-12-31 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Halliburton 301 - Well-stimulation vessel / 2012-02-24 - 2012-07-06 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Halliburton 301 - Well-stimulation vessel / 2011-08-18 - 2011-12-20 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Morning Champion - RO-RO / 2010-12-28 - 2011-06-03 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Galaxy Leader - RO-RO / 2010-03-27 - 2010-08-31 (5 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Ice Beam - Oil Products Tanker / 2012-07-28 - 2012-12-28 (5 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Mykola Slavov - General cargo / 2011-07-25 - 2011-11-17 (4 месяца)
OS: Sichem Pandora - Chemical tanker / 2008-05-07 - 2008-11-20 (6 месяцев)
Deck Cadet: Toulon - Bulk Carrier / 2007-06-04 - 2007-10-08 (4 месяца)
Deck Cadet: Bulta - Cable laying vessel / 2006-05-09 - 2006-09-25 (5 месяцев)
Chief Cook: Linda - General cargo / 2012-11-05 - 2012-11-28 (1 месяц)
Chief Cook: Linda - General cargo / 2012-06-29 - 2012-08-31 (2 месяца)
Chief Cook: Linda - General cargo / 2012-02-22 - 2012-04-22 (2 месяца)
Chief Cook: Linda - General cargo / 2011-10-17 - 2011-12-22 (2 месяца)
Chief Cook: Linda - General cargo / 2011-06-14 - 2011-08-10 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: DORIS - Bulk Carrier / 2012-03-13 - 2012-09-10 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Bright Eagle - Bulk Carrier / 2011-06-10 - 2011-11-26 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Sealord - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2010-09-23 - 2011-03-05 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Lena - General cargo / 2010-05-15 - 2010-08-12 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Captain Kang - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2009-06-17 - 2009-11-01 (4 месяца)
3rd Officer: Santa Rosanna - Container Ship / 2012-04-09 - 2012-08-08 (4 месяца)
3rd Officer: Santa Giuliana - Container Ship / 2011-06-16 - 2011-10-21 (4 месяца)
3rd Officer: San Alessio - Container Ship / 2010-09-06 - 2011-01-10 (4 месяца)
3rd Officer: Niledutch Asia - Container Ship / 2010-02-05 - 2010-07-15 (5 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Hansa Catalina - Container Ship / 2009-06-12 - 2009-10-21 (4 месяца)
Motorman: Siroko - Tug boat / 2012-04-09 - 2012-07-20 (3 месяца)
Motorman: Siroko - Tug boat / 2010-12-28 - 2012-01-28 (1 год)
Motorman: MS-4 - Tug boat / 2010-06-07 - 2010-12-20 (6 месяцев)
Motorman: MS-4 - Tug boat / 2009-12-02 - 2010-05-15 (5 месяцев)
Motorman: Chelsea-2 - Dry Cargo / 2009-09-07 - 2009-11-13 (2 месяца)
2nd Engineer: SWAN DIANA - General cargo / 2011-12-08 - 2012-01-14 (1 месяц)
2nd Engineer: SWAN DIANA - General cargo / 2011-05-08 - 2011-09-23 (4 месяца)
2nd Engineer: SWAN DIANA - General cargo / 2010-08-24 - 2010-12-18 (4 месяца)
3rd Engineer: Swanland - General cargo / 2009-11-15 - 2010-03-17 (4 месяца)
3rd Engineer: Swanland - General cargo / 2009-03-17 - 2009-07-27 (4 месяца)
2nd Engineer: RAINBOW QUEST - Bulk Carrier / 2011-11-11 - 2011-11-23 (12 дней)
2nd Engineer: SAXONIA EXPRESS - Container Ship / 2010-06-12 - 2010-12-06 (6 месяцев)
2nd Engineer: MONDENA - Container Ship / 2009-11-16 - 2010-03-20 (4 месяца)
2nd Engineer: AL IHSA`A - Container Ship / 2009-02-17 - 2009-07-28 (5 месяцев)
2nd Engineer: SEA DRAGON - Bulk Carrier / 2008-08-08 - 2008-10-21 (2 месяца)
2nd Officer: Arctic Breeze - Oil Products Tanker / 2011-07-08 - 2011-11-18 (4 месяца)
3rd Officer: Baltic Freedom - Oil Products Tanker / 2010-10-01 - 2011-02-20 (5 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Baltic Freedom - Oil Products Tanker / 2010-01-19 - 2010-05-12 (4 месяца)
3rd Officer: Baltic Commodore - Oil Products Tanker / 2009-03-31 - 2009-08-17 (5 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Balti Favour - Oil Products Tanker / 2008-05-25 - 2008-10-16 (5 месяцев)
OS: Inya - AHTS / 2011-02-21 - 2011-11-01 (8 месяцев)
Engine Cadet: akademia - Dry Cargo / 2011-03-10 - 2011-09-10 (6 месяцев)
AB Seaman: KING BASS - Fishing vessel / 2011-06-01 - 2011-08-20 (3 месяца)
Boatswain: LIVADIA - Reefer / 2010-03-04 - 2010-08-20 (6 месяцев)
Boatswain: RIALTO - Container Ship / 2008-07-24 - 2009-03-01 (7 месяцев)
Boatswain: LADO - General cargo / 2007-10-08 - 2008-04-10 (6 месяцев)
Boatswain: BRIGHT STAR-1 - General cargo / 2006-08-30 - 2007-05-25 (9 месяцев)
2nd Officer: BRIDGE - RO-RO / 2008-11-08 - 2009-01-01 (2 месяца)
Deck Cadet: MT Progress - Crude Oil Tanker / 2008-02-06 - 2008-04-11 (2 месяца)
2nd Officer: Baltiyskiy-54 - General cargo / 1987-11-11 - 1991-02-12 (3 года)
2nd Officer: Volgo-Balt 216 - General cargo / 1990-05-10 - 1990-12-28 (8 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Volgo-Balt 236 - General cargo / 1989-04-15 - 1989-11-15 (7 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Volgo-Balt 236 - General cargo / 1988-04-10 - 1988-11-10 (7 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Volgo-Balt 232 - General cargo / 1986-09-20 - 1987-05-10 (8 месяцев)
Electric Cadet: - - Container Ship / 1973-09-01 - 1973-09-02 (1 день)
No Experience
No Experience