Сохранить
Закрыть
Добавить моряка в избранное
Удалить моряка из избранного
Master: NORMA - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2016-09-05 - 2016-12-07 (3 месяца)
Master: FIONA - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2016-01-27 - 2016-06-20 (5 месяцев)
Master: EMRE KOSE - General cargo / 2015-08-20 - 2015-12-04 (3 месяца)
Master: EMRE KOSE - General cargo / 2015-03-08 - 2015-06-29 (4 месяца)
Master: West Scent - Container Ship / 2014-09-06 - 2014-12-20 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: ARKAIM-7 - General cargo / 2016-08-05 - 2016-12-01 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: ARKAIM-4 - General cargo / 2016-01-28 - 2016-04-28 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: ARKAIM-4 - General cargo / 2015-03-28 - 2015-06-21 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: WIZARD - Dry Cargo / 2013-02-22 - 2014-09-04 (1 год)
Chief Officer: Arkaim-5 - General cargo / 2013-04-29 - 2013-08-12 (3 месяца)
3rd Engineer: Stephen Wallace Dick - Platform Supply vessel / 2016-01-07 - 2016-11-30 (11 месяцев)
3rd Engineer: Carr Tide - Platform Supply vessel / 2015-04-28 - 2015-10-04 (5 месяцев)
3rd Engineer: Stricklin Tide - AHTS / 2014-05-02 - 2015-08-10 (1 год)
3rd Engineer: Melton Tide - Platform Supply vessel / 2014-11-22 - 2015-02-20 (3 месяца)
3rd Engineer: Vin/nice - DSV (Diving Support) / 2014-09-23 - 2014-11-04 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: Halul 24 - AHTS / 2016-07-20 - 2016-11-23 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Halul 24 - AHTS / 2016-01-10 - 2016-04-04 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Al Huwaila - DSV (Diving Support) / 2015-08-29 - 2015-12-03 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Al Huwailla - DSV (Diving Support) / 2015-03-05 - 2015-06-07 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Al Huwailla - DSV (Diving Support) / 2014-11-05 - 2015-01-30 (3 месяца)
Master: E.R.Amsterdam - Container Ship / 2016-07-05 - 2016-11-19 (4 месяца)
Master: E.R.Seoul - Container Ship / 2015-11-28 - 2016-04-14 (5 месяцев)
Master: CMA CGM Lavender - Container Ship / 2015-05-08 - 2015-08-31 (4 месяца)
Master: MSC Mira - Container Ship / 2014-07-31 - 2015-01-11 (5 месяцев)
Master: Maersk Delmont - Container Ship / 2013-06-23 - 2013-10-31 (4 месяца)
3rd Officer: HHL Kobe - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2016-07-25 - 2016-11-14 (4 месяца)
3rd Officer: HHL Kobe - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2015-08-03 - 2015-12-23 (5 месяцев)
3rd Officer: HHL Lisbon - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2015-04-15 - 2015-07-22 (3 месяца)
3rd Officer: HHL Lisbon - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2014-03-22 - 2014-10-22 (7 месяцев)
OS: HHL Fremantle - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2013-05-13 - 2013-11-05 (6 месяцев)
Master: Varada Buzios - AHTS / 2016-10-07 - 2016-11-10 (1 месяц)
Master: Varada Buzios - AHTS / 2016-02-20 - 2016-07-09 (5 месяцев)
Master: Varada Buzios - AHTS / 2015-07-15 - 2015-10-08 (3 месяца)
Master: Vara da Buzios - AHTS / 2015-03-05 - 2015-04-12 (1 месяц)
Master: Varada Buzios - AHTS / 2014-09-07 - 2014-11-07 (2 месяца)
3rd Engineer: Eval nolom - RO-RO / 2016-08-28 - 2016-11-09 (2 месяца)
Motorman: Avonmoor - Container Ship / 2015-08-26 - 2016-04-27 (8 месяцев)
Motorman: Sanad - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2013-05-17 - 2014-01-10 (8 месяцев)
Engine Cadet: GULF CITY - General cargo / 2012-07-26 - 2013-02-01 (6 месяцев)
3rd Engineer: Vlas Chubar - Dry Cargo / 2010-11-05 - 2011-07-08 (8 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Glovis Maple - Bulk Carrier / 2016-04-18 - 2016-10-21 (6 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Cerafina - Bulk Carrier / 2014-12-27 - 2015-07-30 (7 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Cymbeline - Bulk Carrier / 2014-03-11 - 2014-09-11 (6 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Cerafina - Bulk Carrier / 2013-04-25 - 2013-10-24 (6 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Clare - Bulk Carrier / 2012-03-10 - 2012-11-09 (8 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Arctic Bridge - Chemical tanker / 2016-05-08 - 2016-10-06 (5 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Norient Solar - Chemical tanker / 2015-11-04 - 2016-03-04 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: ARAL - Chemical tanker / 2014-06-03 - 2014-11-15 (5 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Noble Breeze - Container Ship / 2013-08-08 - 2013-12-12 (4 месяца)
3rd Officer: Selma - Container Ship / 2013-02-23 - 2013-05-05 (2 месяца)
Deck Cadet: Diamond river - Other vessels / 2016-08-01 - 2016-10-01 (2 месяца)
Motorman: Vesalius - Dredger / 2016-08-13 - 2016-09-24 (1 месяц)
Motorman: Baklanovo - Fishing vessel / 2014-07-28 - 2015-01-09 (5 месяцев)
4th Engineer: Golsar - Dry Cargo / 2016-03-02 - 2016-09-22 (7 месяцев)
4th Engineer: Warta - Bulk Carrier / 2015-06-19 - 2015-12-28 (6 месяцев)
Motorman: Petra - RO-RO / 2012-05-23 - 2013-02-13 (9 месяцев)
Master: Shchilplatte - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2016-05-09 - 2016-09-18 (4 месяца)
Master: Acuum - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2015-10-02 - 2016-02-04 (4 месяца)
Master: Richelieu - General cargo / 2015-04-19 - 2015-07-22 (3 месяца)
Master: Inema - Oil Products Tanker / 2014-10-06 - 2015-02-06 (4 месяца)
Master: Accum - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2014-03-14 - 2014-07-20 (4 месяца)
Engine Cadet: ENERGY CHEMPION - Crude Oil Tanker / 2016-02-18 - 2016-09-06 (7 месяцев)
Oiler: Porada - General cargo / 2016-07-05 - 2016-09-05 (2 месяца)
2nd Officer: BORKUM - Heavy lift vessel / 2016-03-13 - 2016-07-07 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: BORKUM - Heavy lift vessel / 2014-12-24 - 2015-07-15 (7 месяцев)
2nd Officer: JUIST - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2014-04-27 - 2014-09-05 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: ARKONIA - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2012-12-16 - 2013-06-04 (6 месяцев)
2nd Officer: ALESSIA - General cargo / 2011-12-23 - 2012-06-27 (6 месяцев)
3rd Engineer: MV Paradise Bay - Bulk Carrier / 2016-01-20 - 2016-07-05 (5 месяцев)
3rd Engineer: MV Indus Fortune - Bulk Carrier / 2013-09-29 - 2014-03-04 (5 месяцев)
3rd Engineer: MV Ocean Prefect - Bulk Carrier / 2012-10-28 - 2013-04-29 (6 месяцев)
4th Engineer: MV Ocean Prefect - Bulk Carrier / 2011-11-29 - 2012-06-24 (7 месяцев)
4th Engineer: MV Desert Hawk - Bulk Carrier / 2010-09-09 - 2011-04-12 (7 месяцев)
Engine Cadet: Ruzgar Bey - General cargo / 2016-04-07 - 2016-07-05 (3 месяца)
Motorman: Carnival Magic - Cruise Liner / 2015-11-29 - 2016-05-21 (6 месяцев)