Сохранить
Закрыть
Добавить моряка в избранное
Удалить моряка из избранного
Chief Officer: Nestor - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2017-12-04 - 2018-04-10 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Posen - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2017-01-29 - 2017-05-31 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Melas - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2016-02-22 - 2016-07-14 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Melas - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2015-05-24 - 2015-09-22 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Melas - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2014-07-20 - 2014-12-14 (5 месяцев)
Motorman: AKUA - General cargo / 2017-09-19 - 2018-03-22 (6 месяцев)
Chief Engineer: NSO Crusader - AHTS / 2018-01-16 - 2018-03-15 (2 месяца)
Chief Engineer: NSO Crusader - AHTS / 2017-08-01 - 2017-09-28 (2 месяца)
Chief Engineer: Arkonia - General cargo / 2017-01-17 - 2017-06-10 (5 месяцев)
Chief Engineer: Arkonia - General cargo / 2016-04-23 - 2016-10-07 (5 месяцев)
Chief Engineer: NSO Crusader - AHTS / 2017-11-01 - 2007-12-15 (9 лет)
1st Engineer: NAVE SPHERICAL - VLCC / 2017-09-25 - 2018-03-15 (6 месяцев)
2nd Engineer: AURORA N - Chemical tanker / 2016-11-25 - 2017-06-23 (7 месяцев)
2nd Engineer: NAVE VELOCITY - Chemical tanker / 2015-10-01 - 2016-05-03 (7 месяцев)
2nd Engineer: NAVE VELOCITY - Chemical tanker / 2015-01-20 - 2015-06-11 (5 месяцев)
2nd Engineer: MOUNT OLYMPUS - Oil Products Tanker / 2014-07-28 - 2014-09-20 (2 месяца)
OS: Oland - Container Ship / 2017-06-08 - 2018-03-12 (9 месяцев)
Deck Cadet: Max Carrier - Container Ship / 2015-12-10 - 2016-08-16 (8 месяцев)
Deck Cadet: BBC Africa - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2015-02-28 - 2015-05-03 (2 месяца)
Motorman: ANDEAN - Bulk Carrier / 2017-09-04 - 2018-03-07 (6 месяцев)
AB Seaman: Orient Alliance - Bulk Carrier / 2017-05-14 - 2018-02-26 (9 месяцев)
AB Seaman: Orient Adventure - Bulk Carrier / 2016-07-21 - 2017-03-15 (8 месяцев)
AB Seaman: Orient Alliance - Bulk Carrier / 2015-08-25 - 2016-03-29 (7 месяцев)
AB Seaman: Orient Adventure - Bulk Carrier / 2014-12-05 - 2015-04-14 (4 месяца)
AB Seaman: Orient Defender - Bulk Carrier / 2013-12-31 - 2014-07-19 (7 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Ipanema Street - Crude Oil Tanker / 2017-09-15 - 2018-02-23 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Abbey Road - Oil Products Tanker / 2016-09-29 - 2017-02-11 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Bastille Street - Oil Products Tanker / 2015-10-12 - 2016-03-03 (5 месяцев)
Cargo Superintendent: San padre pio - Bunkering Vessel / 2014-10-15 - 2015-01-10 (3 месяца)
Cargo Superintendent: SP Athens - Bunkering Vessel / 2014-03-05 - 2014-07-25 (5 месяцев)
Master: Ocean Coral - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-08-27 - 2018-02-19 (6 месяцев)
Master: SW Julia 1 - Oil Products Tanker / 2016-12-09 - 2017-03-20 (3 месяца)
Master: Gener8 Phoenix - Crude Oil Tanker / 2015-12-06 - 2016-01-20 (1 месяц)
Master: DS Progress - Crude Oil Tanker / 2014-10-25 - 2015-04-05 (5 месяцев)
Master: Drepanos - Crude Oil Tanker / 2013-11-18 - 2014-03-20 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Swakop - Bulk Carrier / 2017-09-26 - 2018-02-17 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Swakop - Bulk Carrier / 2017-01-27 - 2017-06-04 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Swakop - Bulk Carrier / 2016-05-18 - 2016-09-25 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Zambesi - Bulk Carrier / 2015-06-24 - 2015-10-30 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Selinda - Bulk Carrier / 2014-04-15 - 2014-09-06 (5 месяцев)
3rd Engineer: Berna (Tolunay) - Bulk Carrier / 2017-07-17 - 2018-02-12 (7 месяцев)
Motorman: Jaohar Express - General cargo / 2016-04-14 - 2016-12-17 (8 месяцев)
Engine Cadet: Om 106 - Passenger vessel / 2009-09-28 - 2010-01-19 (4 месяца)
Engine Cadet: Amrum Trader - Container Ship / 2009-03-31 - 2009-08-03 (4 месяца)
OS: Green Glacier - Reefer / 2017-08-10 - 2018-02-02 (6 месяцев)
Deck Cadet: Alamak - Tug boat / 2015-08-31 - 2015-10-30 (2 месяца)
2nd Officer: Queen of Luck - Container Ship / 2017-07-24 - 2018-01-28 (6 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Princess of lcuk - Container Ship / 2016-10-05 - 2017-04-09 (6 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Princess of lcuk - Container Ship / 2015-09-15 - 2016-04-09 (7 месяцев)
OS: Belmopan - Bulk Carrier / 2011-06-25 - 2011-09-25 (3 месяца)
OS: Tobago - Bulk Carrier / 2011-04-27 - 2011-06-10 (1 месяц)
2nd Officer: Queen B - Container Ship / 2017-04-11 - 2018-09-02 (1 год)
2nd Officer: Maersk Flensburg - Container Ship / 2017-11-14 - 2018-01-27 (2 месяца)
3rd Officer: Warnow Merkur - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2016-09-21 - 2017-02-11 (5 месяцев)
3rd Officer: DP Legacy - Container Ship / 2015-12-28 - 2016-06-26 (6 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Lettland - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2015-01-20 - 2015-08-01 (6 месяцев)
ETO: SBM Installer - DSV (Diving Support) / 2017-03-01 - 2018-01-27 (11 месяцев)
ETO: SBM Installer - DSV (Diving Support) / 2016-10-09 - 2016-11-30 (2 месяца)
ETO: Bourbon Evolution 807 - MRSV / 2016-04-10 - 2016-06-24 (2 месяца)
ETO: Bourbon Evolution 807 - MRSV / 2015-11-17 - 2016-01-19 (2 месяца)
ETO: Bourbon Evolution 807 - MRSV / 2015-07-06 - 2015-09-18 (2 месяца)
3rd Engineer: Golafruz - Bulk Carrier / 2017-08-07 - 2018-01-19 (5 месяцев)
3rd Engineer: Baltic Pilgrim - Reefer / 2016-11-03 - 2017-01-20 (3 месяца)
3rd Engineer: Baltic Prime - Reefer / 2016-02-11 - 2016-04-01 (2 месяца)
3rd Engineer: Baltic Pride - Reefer / 2015-12-04 - 2016-01-22 (2 месяца)
3rd Engineer: Baltic Pride - Reefer / 2015-03-29 - 2015-07-31 (4 месяца)
3rd Engineer: Credo - Dry Cargo / 2017-09-16 - 2018-01-18 (4 месяца)
3rd Engineer: Lizori - Dry Cargo / 2016-11-24 - 2017-05-26 (6 месяцев)
3rd Engineer: Persian Pearl - General cargo / 2005-10-14 - 2006-05-10 (7 месяцев)
3rd Engineer: Abouzar 1200 - Pipe laying vessel / 2004-06-10 - 2005-03-09 (9 месяцев)
3rd Engineer: Romny - Dry Cargo / 1997-11-14 - 1998-05-06 (6 месяцев)
Superintendant: Darina - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2017-11-26 - 2018-01-15 (2 месяца)
Master: Iron Baron V - Bulk Carrier / 2015-12-26 - 2016-07-07 (6 месяцев)
Master: Iron Baron V - Bulk Carrier / 2014-08-15 - 2015-05-23 (9 месяцев)
Master: Infinity V - Bulk Carrier / 2013-08-06 - 2014-05-15 (9 месяцев)
Master: Giannis - Bulk Carrier / 2012-05-01 - 2013-01-21 (9 месяцев)
Oiler: GANNET BULKER - Bulk Carrier / 2017-05-23 - 2018-01-12 (8 месяцев)
Oiler: Pacific Future - Bulk Carrier / 2015-12-03 - 2016-08-06 (8 месяцев)
Oiler: ALESSANDRA I - General cargo / 2014-11-19 - 2015-05-08 (6 месяцев)
Motorman: V/M FORAR - General cargo / 2014-02-04 - 2014-07-18 (5 месяцев)
Motorman: SAMAN - General cargo / 2012-09-24 - 2013-02-20 (5 месяцев)
Engineer Assistant: MT Valrossa - Crude Oil Tanker / 2017-04-02 - 2018-01-03 (9 месяцев)