Сохранить
Закрыть
Добавить моряка в избранное
Удалить моряка из избранного
3rd Officer: AG VARTHOLOMEOS - Bulk Carrier / 2014-07-24 - 2015-02-23 (7 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Stanislav Yudin - Construction vessel / 2014-12-17 - 2015-02-22 (2 месяца)
3rd Officer: Touraine - LPG / LNG / 2014-08-08 - 2014-11-27 (4 месяца)
3rd Officer: Flanders Tenacity - LPG / LNG / 2013-11-24 - 2014-04-23 (5 месяцев)
3rd Officer: MCC Seoul - Container Ship / 2013-02-19 - 2013-08-10 (6 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Stadt Hemmoor - Dry Cargo / 2012-04-06 - 2012-09-20 (5 месяцев)
Junior officer: HHL Hong Kong - Heavy lift vessel / 2011-04-28 - 2011-10-20 (6 месяцев)
AB Seaman: NS Clipper - Oil Products Tanker / 2014-02-22 - 2014-09-15 (7 месяцев)
OS: NS Challenger - Oil Products Tanker / 2013-01-26 - 2013-07-28 (6 месяцев)
OS: NS Champion - Oil Products Tanker / 2012-01-19 - 2012-08-08 (7 месяцев)
OS: Tambov - Chemical tanker / 2010-12-07 - 2011-07-11 (7 месяцев)
2nd Engineer: MAGNUM - Dry Cargo / 2014-03-08 - 2014-06-02 (3 месяца)
2nd Engineer: MEDEMBORG - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2013-03-11 - 2013-09-04 (6 месяцев)
2nd Engineer: MARKBORG - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2012-05-19 - 2012-09-14 (4 месяца)
2nd Engineer: FLINTERSTREAM - General cargo / 2011-06-20 - 2011-10-17 (4 месяца)
2nd Engineer: MAKIRI GREEN - General cargo / 2010-12-05 - 2011-03-01 (3 месяца)
Motorman-electrician: Vectis Isle - General cargo / 2013-12-27 - 2014-05-13 (5 месяцев)
Electrician: Limiless - Other vessels / 2012-11-01 - 2013-04-27 (6 месяцев)
Electrician: Donbas Voyager - Dry Cargo / 2011-08-03 - 2012-02-09 (6 месяцев)
Electrician: Front - Dry Cargo / 2009-09-04 - 2010-02-27 (6 месяцев)
Electrician: Geroi Shipki - RO-RO / 2008-06-09 - 2009-05-30 (12 месяцев)
Fitter / Welder: ENERGY CENTURION - Oil Products Tanker / 2013-10-23 - 2014-05-03 (6 месяцев)
Fitter / Welder: PARAMOUNT HALIFAX - Oil Products Tanker / 2012-12-07 - 2013-04-23 (5 месяцев)
Fitter / Welder: ENERGY CONQUEROR - Oil Products Tanker / 2012-04-03 - 2012-10-24 (7 месяцев)
Fitter / Welder: PETROVSK - Oil Products Tanker / 2011-07-13 - 2011-12-13 (5 месяцев)
Fitter / Welder: PETROZAVODSK - Oil Products Tanker / 2010-12-14 - 2011-04-28 (4 месяца)
Motorman: GREEN SEASON - Bulk Carrier / 2013-07-01 - 2014-04-10 (9 месяцев)
Motorman: Green Season - Bulk Carrier / 2013-07-01 - 2014-04-10 (9 месяцев)
Turner: Geroi Plevni - Ferry / 2012-12-03 - 2013-03-03 (3 месяца)
Turner: ISTAN BULL - Tug boat / 2011-07-12 - 2011-10-15 (3 месяца)
Turner: Capital star - Bulk Carrier / 2010-04-08 - 2010-09-22 (5 месяцев)
3rd Officer: MIR - Other vessels / 2013-04-04 - 2013-11-05 (7 месяцев)
3rd Officer: STS MIR - Other vessels / 2012-04-23 - 2012-10-08 (5 месяцев)
3rd Officer: STS MIR - Other vessels / 2011-11-07 - 2011-12-22 (1 месяц)
Boatswain: STS MIR - Other vessels / 2011-04-23 - 2011-09-07 (4 месяца)
Boatswain: STS MIR - Other vessels / 2010-03-14 - 2010-09-03 (6 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Minerva Zen - Crude Oil Tanker / 2013-03-25 - 2013-09-25 (6 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Minerva Rita - Crude Oil Tanker / 2012-01-22 - 2012-07-12 (6 месяцев)
Motorman: Grand Rus - Passenger vessel / 2013-04-27 - 2013-08-23 (4 месяца)
Motorman: Gdov - Fishing vessel / 1993-02-04 - 1993-02-27 (1 месяц)
Motorman: Gefest - Fishing vessel / 1992-09-10 - 1993-02-04 (5 месяцев)
Motorman: M.Kurgan - Fishing vessel / 1991-04-19 - 1992-08-24 (1 год)
Motorman: Tsefej - Fishing vessel / 1990-10-15 - 1991-03-25 (5 месяцев)
Master: CELINA - Bulk Carrier / 2013-05-21 - 2013-06-13 (1 месяц)
Master: FAST CHALLENGER - RO-RO / 2013-04-18 - 2013-04-30 (12 дней)
Master: REFOLA - Tug boat / 2013-02-11 - 2013-03-11 (1 месяц)
Master: SIS PIONEER - AHTS / 2011-12-10 - 2012-04-16 (4 месяца)
Master: SEABULK PLOVER - AHTS / 2011-01-07 - 2011-05-24 (5 месяцев)
Motorman: Vestimar - General cargo / 2011-11-28 - 2012-04-29 (5 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Atlantic Spirit - Oil Products Tanker / 2010-06-26 - 2010-11-13 (5 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Nordic Helsinki - Oil Products Tanker / 2009-07-10 - 2009-11-13 (4 месяца)
3rd Officer: Elbtank France - Oil Products Tanker / 2008-12-28 - 2009-02-28 (2 месяца)
Junior officer: Tuchkov Bridge - Oil Products Tanker / 2008-05-04 - 2008-09-15 (4 месяца)
Motorman: Zapravshik 6 - Tug boat / 2009-04-10 - 2009-12-30 (9 месяцев)
Oiler: Kobzar 1 - Dry Cargo / 2008-07-21 - 2008-10-24 (3 месяца)
OS: Niki - Bulk Carrier / 2007-12-08 - 2008-06-02 (6 месяцев)
OS: Niki - Bulk Carrier / 2006-08-28 - 2007-03-24 (7 месяцев)
Messman: Pilion - Bulk Carrier / 2005-05-15 - 2006-01-23 (8 месяцев)
Cook: Ground Experience not ships - Other vessels / 2001-07-24 - 2003-03-15 (1 год)
No Experience
No Experience