Сохранить
Закрыть
Добавить моряка в избранное
Удалить моряка из избранного
3rd Engineer: Soc Endeavour - Construction vessel / 2015-11-27 - 2016-01-24 (2 месяца)
Motorman: Soc Endeavour - Construction vessel / 2015-08-12 - 2015-10-24 (2 месяца)
Motorman: Soc Endeavour - Construction vessel / 2015-08-12 - 2015-10-24 (2 месяца)
Motorman: Soc Endeavour - Construction vessel / 2015-02-19 - 2015-06-14 (4 месяца)
Motorman: Soc Endeavour - DSV (Diving Support) / 2014-10-01 - 2014-12-16 (2 месяца)
Motorman: Alors - Oil Products Tanker / 2015-08-14 - 2015-10-07 (2 месяца)
Motorman: Stolt Strength - Chemical tanker / 2015-04-25 - 2015-05-30 (1 месяц)
Motorman: Stolt Strength - Chemical tanker / 2014-09-29 - 2015-01-15 (4 месяца)
Motorman: Seychelles Prelude - Oil Products Tanker / 2013-11-22 - 2014-06-16 (7 месяцев)
Motorman: Seychelles Pioneer - Oil Products Tanker / 2013-01-07 - 2013-08-03 (7 месяцев)
3rd Engineer: Lily-Ha - General cargo / 2018-05-28 - 2018-12-05 (6 месяцев)
3rd Engineer: Juliana - General cargo / 2017-10-10 - 2018-03-09 (5 месяцев)
Motorman: Sabrina - Bulk Carrier / 2015-01-31 - 2015-10-05 (8 месяцев)
Motorman: CMA Inchor - Container Ship / 2014-02-01 - 2014-08-11 (6 месяцев)
3rd Engineer: PADOSA - Bunkering Vessel / 2018-04-18 - 2018-11-14 (7 месяцев)
3rd Engineer: PADOSA - Bunkering Vessel / 2017-03-14 - 2017-11-12 (8 месяцев)
3rd Engineer: STAR FIGHTER - Passenger vessel / 2016-08-05 - 2016-09-30 (2 месяца)
3rd Engineer: SABARIMALA GAS - LPG / LNG / 2015-10-25 - 2016-03-03 (4 месяца)
Motorman: CHAMTANG - Chemical tanker / 2015-07-15 - 2015-10-01 (3 месяца)
3rd Engineer: M/T Patagonia - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-06-17 - 2017-12-17 (6 месяцев)
Fitter / Welder: M/V Pafilia - Container Ship / 2016-04-22 - 2016-12-29 (8 месяцев)
Motorman: M/V VikingSineus - Passenger vessel / 2015-06-01 - 2015-10-01 (4 месяца)
Motorman: m/v VikingSineus - Passenger vessel / 2014-08-30 - 2015-03-02 (6 месяцев)
Motorman: m/v MikhailLomonosov - Passenger vessel / 2013-04-16 - 2013-11-17 (7 месяцев)
4th Engineer: MSC Marylena - Container Ship / 2016-05-03 - 2016-11-08 (6 месяцев)
Motorman: MSC Marylena - Container Ship / 2015-03-24 - 2015-09-25 (6 месяцев)
Motorman: MSC Maria - Container Ship / 2014-05-07 - 2014-11-22 (6 месяцев)
Engine Cadet: MSC Jasmine - Container Ship / 2013-01-14 - 2013-08-03 (7 месяцев)
Engine Cadet: MSC Giovanna - Container Ship / 2011-07-19 - 2012-02-24 (7 месяцев)
4th Engineer: m/t Sierra - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-01-31 - 2019-06-16 (5 месяцев)
4th Engineer: DARYABORD - Crude Oil Tanker / 2017-07-19 - 2017-10-14 (3 месяца)
4th Engineer: Absheron - Crude Oil Tanker / 2016-07-15 - 2016-12-08 (5 месяцев)
4th Engineer: Absheron - Crude Oil Tanker / 2015-09-15 - 2016-01-28 (4 месяца)
Motorman: Absheron - Crude Oil Tanker / 2015-06-12 - 2015-09-15 (3 месяца)
4th Engineer: Noble Breeze - Container Ship / 2017-07-19 - 2018-03-13 (8 месяцев)
4th Engineer: Noble Breeze - Container Ship / 2016-06-16 - 2017-02-28 (8 месяцев)
3rd Engineer: Bella J - Container Ship / 2016-02-23 - 2016-05-31 (3 месяца)
4th Engineer: Bella J - Container Ship / 2015-12-15 - 2016-02-23 (2 месяца)
Motorman: Princess of luck - Container Ship / 2015-07-29 - 2015-09-15 (2 месяца)
3rd Engineer: Front Thor - Crude Oil Tanker / 2017-11-18 - 2018-04-25 (5 месяцев)
3rd Engineer: Christina - Crude Oil Tanker / 2017-03-30 - 2017-06-19 (3 месяца)
3rd Engineer: Gema - Oil Products Tanker / 2016-07-21 - 2017-02-02 (6 месяцев)
Motorman: Sea Landsort - Crude Oil Tanker / 2015-02-10 - 2015-08-03 (6 месяцев)
Motorman: Gas Camellia - LPG / LNG / 2014-02-02 - 2014-08-07 (6 месяцев)
2nd Engineer: Mehmet Bey - General cargo / 2018-09-05 - 2019-05-27 (9 месяцев)
3rd Engineer: Navigator B - Bulk Carrier / 2017-08-10 - 2018-02-12 (6 месяцев)
3rd Engineer: Cygnus - Bulk Carrier / 2016-07-11 - 2017-01-11 (6 месяцев)
4th Engineer: Cygnus - Bulk Carrier / 2015-10-03 - 2016-04-27 (7 месяцев)
Motorman: Corvus - Bulk Carrier / 2014-12-24 - 2015-07-11 (7 месяцев)
4th Engineer: Beatris Gas - LPG / LNG / 2019-02-23 - 2019-07-21 (5 месяцев)
3rd Engineer: Alexander Nevskiy - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-07-31 - 2018-09-30 (2 месяца)
Motorman: AL SAFLIYA - LPG / LNG / 2014-12-23 - 2015-07-02 (6 месяцев)
Motorman: RIO 2016 - Crude Oil Tanker / 2013-12-16 - 2014-04-09 (4 месяца)
Motorman: SOCRATES - Crude Oil Tanker / 2013-03-18 - 2013-09-02 (5 месяцев)
Oiler: PITHAGORAS - Bulk Carrier / 2017-12-07 - 2018-07-27 (8 месяцев)
Oiler: VATHY - Dry Cargo / 2016-12-30 - 2017-06-14 (5 месяцев)
Oiler: KARVOUNIS - Oil Products Tanker / 2016-03-03 - 2016-08-31 (6 месяцев)
Motorman: BUTTERFLY - Oil Products Tanker / 2015-01-29 - 2015-06-29 (5 месяцев)
Motorman: MARIPOSA - Chemical tanker / 2014-02-01 - 2014-07-15 (5 месяцев)
3rd Engineer: Mb-1217 - Tug boat / 2023-10-26 - 2024-02-24 (4 месяца)
2nd Engineer: Berkut - Tug boat / 2018-07-13 - 2021-05-21 (2 года)
3rd Engineer: euronike - Crude Oil Tanker / 2017-10-29 - 2017-12-26 (2 месяца)
3rd Engineer: aliakmon - Crude Oil Tanker / 2016-01-21 - 2016-07-19 (6 месяцев)
Motorman: asopos - Crude Oil Tanker / 2014-11-25 - 2015-06-12 (7 месяцев)
3rd Engineer: Sabina A - General cargo / 2017-04-03 - 2017-11-18 (7 месяцев)
3rd Engineer: Tripolie - Bulk Carrier / 2016-01-05 - 2016-07-14 (6 месяцев)
Motorman: Kaliakra - Bulk Carrier / 2014-09-17 - 2015-05-26 (8 месяцев)
Motorman: Kaliakra - Bulk Carrier / 2013-05-02 - 2014-01-04 (8 месяцев)
Oiler: Limnionas - Bulk Carrier / 2020-02-22 - 2020-10-17 (8 месяцев)
Oiler: Butterfly - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-08-31 - 2019-10-20 (2 месяца)
Oiler: NGOL ZAIRE - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-10-09 - 2018-07-26 (10 месяцев)
Motorman: BITUMA 1 - Crude Oil Tanker / 2014-11-11 - 2015-05-25 (6 месяцев)
Motorman: BITUMA 1 - Crude Oil Tanker / 2014-03-04 - 2014-10-08 (7 месяцев)
4th Engineer: m/v Saronic Breeze - Reefer / 2018-02-26 - 2018-09-28 (7 месяцев)
4th Engineer: FRIO CHIKUMA - Reefer / 2017-02-04 - 2017-08-22 (7 месяцев)
4th Engineer: m/v Frio Athens - Reefer / 2015-09-15 - 2016-03-11 (6 месяцев)
Motorman: Frio Pacific - Reefer / 2014-08-28 - 2015-05-07 (8 месяцев)
3rd Engineer: sultan bey - Bulk Carrier / 2016-02-10 - 2016-07-29 (6 месяцев)
4th Engineer: Shipoolsea - General cargo / 2015-08-04 - 2015-12-04 (4 месяца)
Motorman: Nargol - General cargo / 2014-08-03 - 2015-03-16 (7 месяцев)
Motorman: Sania - General cargo / 2014-03-21 - 2014-07-23 (4 месяца)
Motorman: Roubini K - Bulk Carrier / 2013-09-05 - 2014-03-06 (6 месяцев)
3rd Engineer: AMUR 2505 - General cargo / 2018-03-19 - 2018-10-24 (7 месяцев)
3rd Engineer: Tiyam - General cargo / 2016-07-19 - 2017-03-18 (8 месяцев)
3rd Engineer: NEREY - General cargo / 2015-09-23 - 2016-04-12 (7 месяцев)
Motorman: Credo - General cargo / 2014-10-04 - 2015-03-07 (5 месяцев)
Motorman: Credo - General cargo / 2013-09-02 - 2014-04-08 (7 месяцев)
Oiler: SOPHIA K - Bulk Carrier / 2019-08-29 - 2020-06-21 (10 месяцев)
Oiler: Tiziana - Bulk Carrier / 2017-12-10 - 2018-07-19 (7 месяцев)
Oiler: Floriana - Bulk Carrier / 2016-11-16 - 2017-07-09 (8 месяцев)
Oiler: Zina - Bulk Carrier / 2016-03-01 - 2016-08-14 (5 месяцев)
Motorman: Agata M - RO-RO / 2014-10-11 - 2015-03-06 (5 месяцев)
Motorman: Fanja - General cargo / 2014-06-12 - 2015-03-05 (9 месяцев)
Motorman: Fanja - General cargo / 2013-07-07 - 2014-04-29 (10 месяцев)
Motorman: Thorco Celebration - General cargo / 2012-10-28 - 2013-03-09 (4 месяца)
Motorman: Rouen - General cargo / 2012-01-04 - 2012-07-08 (6 месяцев)
Motorman: Rouen - General cargo / 2011-03-17 - 2011-11-12 (8 месяцев)