Сохранить
Закрыть
Добавить моряка в избранное
Удалить моряка из избранного
Chief Officer: Halul 24 - AHTS / 2016-07-20 - 2016-11-23 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Halul 24 - AHTS / 2016-01-10 - 2016-04-04 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Al Huwaila - DSV (Diving Support) / 2015-08-29 - 2015-12-03 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Al Huwailla - DSV (Diving Support) / 2015-03-05 - 2015-06-07 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Al Huwailla - DSV (Diving Support) / 2014-11-05 - 2015-01-30 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Simone - VLCC / 2015-12-03 - 2016-02-29 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Felicity - Crude Oil Tanker / 2015-03-13 - 2015-07-25 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Neptun - VLCC / 2014-09-23 - 2015-01-05 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Nectar - VLCC / 2014-07-03 - 2014-07-28 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: Maersk Nectar - VLCC / 2014-05-10 - 2014-07-02 (2 месяца)
2nd Officer: BEAM - Reefer / 2015-07-01 - 2015-11-22 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Tavria - Reefer / 2014-11-01 - 2015-02-12 (3 месяца)
2nd Officer: Poltava - Reefer / 2014-03-30 - 2014-06-18 (3 месяца)
3rd Officer: Polaris - Oil Products Tanker / 2012-02-28 - 2013-07-06 (1 год)
3rd Officer: Polaris - Oil Products Tanker / 2012-02-29 - 2012-07-05 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Cristina - General cargo / 2015-06-10 - 2015-09-03 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Zheng Yang - General cargo / 2014-12-21 - 2015-04-23 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Triple S - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2014-04-01 - 2014-10-10 (6 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Rekefjord Stone - General cargo / 2013-09-13 - 2013-11-28 (2 месяца)
2nd Officer: Rekefjord Stone - General cargo / 2013-04-24 - 2013-07-12 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Zamil-55 - AHTS / 2014-09-19 - 2015-01-16 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Zamil-58 - AHTS / 2014-04-04 - 2014-08-12 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Zamil-54 - AHTS / 2013-09-30 - 2014-01-30 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Zamil-56 - AHTS / 2013-05-24 - 2013-08-25 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Zamil-52 - AHTS / 2013-01-03 - 2013-03-19 (3 месяца)
Master: Northern Valence - Container Ship / 2014-10-02 - 2015-01-23 (4 месяца)
Master: Northern Valence - Container Ship / 2014-04-27 - 2014-08-01 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Northern Valence - Container Ship / 2014-04-01 - 2014-04-27 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: Northern Diamond - Container Ship / 2013-08-28 - 2014-01-15 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: NORTHERN VALENCE - Container Ship / 2013-02-16 - 2013-07-11 (5 месяцев)
Barge Master: Catarina - Semi-submersible platform / 2019-12-05 - 2021-02-26 (1 год)
Master: Brava Star - Drilling vessel / 2014-03-21 - 2019-03-19 (4 года)
Chief Officer: Lewek Crusader - Construction vessel / 2013-07-26 - 2014-03-11 (7 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Sapura 3000 - Pipe laying vessel / 2012-08-22 - 2013-07-04 (10 месяцев)
Chief Officer: ODN II - Drilling vessel / 2011-09-23 - 2012-08-08 (11 месяцев)
Master: African Vision - MRSV / 2014-12-14 - 2017-11-21 (2 года)
Superintendant: - - AHTS / 2014-06-30 - 2014-09-30 (3 месяца)
Master: Rem Supplier - Offshore Supply vessel / 2014-03-12 - 2014-05-11 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: African Vision - MRSV / 2013-06-01 - 2013-07-04 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: African Vision - MRSV / 2013-03-23 - 2013-04-27 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: A.H.Paraggi - AHTS / 2013-03-01 - 2013-05-31 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: A.H.Paraggi - AHTS / 2012-11-02 - 2013-01-08 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: A.H.Paraggi - AHTS / 2012-08-02 - 2012-10-10 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Bonassola - Offshore Supply vessel / 2011-12-04 - 2012-02-18 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Bonassola - Offshore Supply vessel / 2011-08-22 - 2011-10-28 (2 месяца)
2nd Officer: Aviona - Bulk Carrier / 2012-09-11 - 2013-01-26 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: L. Karastoyanova - Bulk Carrier / 2012-02-07 - 2012-06-27 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: San Marini - Coaster / 2011-04-23 - 2011-08-08 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Don Star - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2010-10-11 - 2011-01-15 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: S. Rudnev - Bulk Carrier / 2009-12-25 - 2010-07-06 (6 месяцев)
Master: RBD Jutlandia - Container Ship / 2013-01-27 - 2013-06-25 (5 месяцев)
Master: Jackeline-H - Container Ship / 2012-07-11 - 2012-11-19 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: RBD Esperanza - Container Ship / 2011-10-04 - 2012-03-01 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: RBD Jutlandia - Container Ship / 2011-04-17 - 2011-08-21 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: RBD Jutlandia - Container Ship / 2010-09-18 - 2010-12-15 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Seaways Montauk - Crude Oil Tanker / 2024-05-30 - 2024-10-01 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Seaways Montauk - Crude Oil Tanker / 2023-07-18 - 2023-12-14 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Seaways Montauk - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-10-09 - 2023-03-02 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Seaways Montauk - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-10-16 - 2022-04-30 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Seaways Montauk - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-10-29 - 2021-03-30 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: MV MSC JENNY II - Container Ship / 2024-07-21 - 2024-08-06 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: MV PARIN - Bulk Carrier / 2024-04-04 - 2024-05-20 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: MV BEHNAVAZ - Container Ship / 2023-06-06 - 2023-11-13 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: MV NESHAT - General cargo / 2023-04-04 - 2023-06-04 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: MV ARTIN - Bulk Carrier / 2022-07-01 - 2022-12-07 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: ONE FOREVER - Container Ship / 2024-02-20 - 2024-08-03 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: YM WISH - Container Ship / 2023-06-15 - 2023-11-07 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: COSCO MALAYSIA - Container Ship / 2022-09-02 - 2023-01-19 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: BUDAPEST BRIDGE - Container Ship / 2021-11-30 - 2022-05-23 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: GH ZEPHYR - Container Ship / 2021-03-05 - 2021-07-31 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Misje Verde - General cargo / 2024-05-22 - 2024-07-22 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Romi - Dry Cargo / 2024-01-16 - 2024-04-07 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Swe-Freighter - General cargo / 2023-05-28 - 2023-09-05 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Captain Shemilkin - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-12-25 - 2023-05-05 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Zoe Schulte - LPG / LNG / 2024-03-20 - 2024-07-12 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Irmgard Schulte - LPG / LNG / 2023-09-13 - 2024-01-10 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Clamor Schulte - LPG / LNG / 2023-03-25 - 2023-06-27 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Zita Schulte - LPG / LNG / 2022-09-25 - 2022-12-22 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Moritz Schulte - LPG / LNG / 2021-09-24 - 2022-01-25 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: SPS Seacor Amazon - Well-stimulation vessel / 2024-01-14 - 2024-06-29 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: SPS Seacor Amazon - Well-stimulation vessel / 2020-09-02 - 2024-01-09 (3 года)
Chief Officer: Aurelia - Bulk Carrier / 2023-09-02 - 2024-02-24 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Vil Atlantic - Bulk Carrier / 2022-12-01 - 2023-06-18 (7 месяцев)
Chief Officer: AP Slano - Bulk Carrier / 2022-01-30 - 2022-08-09 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: AP Sveti Vlaho - Bulk Carrier / 2021-05-22 - 2021-10-31 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: AP Astarea - Bulk Carrier / 2020-07-24 - 2021-03-11 (7 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Shturman Malygin - Crude Oil Tanker / 2023-07-26 - 2023-10-12 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Coral Medusa - LPG / LNG / 2023-07-28 - 2023-09-24 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Coral Medusa - LPG / LNG / 2023-01-22 - 2023-04-30 (3 месяца)
2nd Officer: Coral Fraseri - LPG / LNG / 2022-06-27 - 2022-09-19 (3 месяца)
2nd Officer: Coral Patula - LPG / LNG / 2021-11-28 - 2022-01-31 (2 месяца)
2nd Officer: Coral Encanto - LPG / LNG / 2021-05-21 - 2021-08-06 (3 месяца)